District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0885 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/25/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-532 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
June 25, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency regarding the need to provide financial relief and 
other assistance to the current owners of the condominium units at the River East at 
Grandview Condominiums. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 
may be cited as the “Relief for River East at Grandview Condominium Owners Congressional 
Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On April 2, 2024, the Council passed the Relief for River East at Grandview 
Condominium Owners Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 to immediately ensure that River 
East at Grandview owners could access stable housing before their rental supports expired and 
to begin to provide an overdue solution to 46 households who have endured ongoing 
uncertainty and stress since the devastating loss of their River East at Grandview homes almost 
3 years ago.  
(b) The Relief for River East at Grandview Condominium Owners Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2024 legislation also included a provision separate from the River East at 
Grandview matter, which provides funding authority to complete the Skyland Town Center 
development.  
(c) The Relief for River East at Grandview Condominium Owners Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2024 will expire on July 14, 2024. 
(d) On May 7, 2024, the Council passed the Relief for River East at Grandview 
Condominium Owners Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, which is currently undergoing 
Congressional review and is not projected to become law until August 1, 2024. This 
emergency legislation is therefore necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration 
of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 
constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Relief for River East at 
Grandview Condominium Owners Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2024 be adopted  
after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.