District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0902 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/28/2024

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
Ju
ne 28, 2024 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of the D istrict of Columbia 
John A. Wilson 
Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Ch
airman M endelson: 
In accordance 
with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 215 of the District of Columbia Health 
Occupations Revision Act of 1985, effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official Code § 3–
1202.15), I am pleased to nominate the following individual:  
Ms. Donna M . Pavone 
L Street, NW 
Washington, DC 20037 
(Ward 2 )
 
for 
appointment as a m	assage therap	ist licensed in the District member of the Board of Massage 
Therapy, filling a vacant seat formerly held by Joseph Reo, for the remainder of an unexpired term to 
end October 29, 2025. 
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-m	entioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
Sincerely, 
Muriel B owser 
Mayor  ~ ~ 
3 	at the request 	of the Mayor 
4 
5 
6 	A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
7 
8 
9 
10 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 To confirm the appointment of Donna M. Pavone to the Board of Massage Therapy. 
16 
17 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT 	OF COLUMBIA, that this 
18 resolution may be cited as the "Board of Massage Therapy Donna 	M. Pavone Confirmation 
19 Resolution of 2024". 
20 Sec. 
2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment 	of: 
21 
22 	Ms. Donna M. Pavone 
23 	L Street, NW 
24 	Washington, DC 2003 7 
25 	(Ward 2) 
26 
27 
as a massage therapist licensed in the District member 	of the Board of Massage Therapy, 
28 established by section 215 	of the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act 	of 1985, 
29 effective March 25, 1986 
(D.C. Law 6-99;_D.C. Official Code§ 3-1202.15), filling a vacant seat 
30 formerly held by Joseph Reo, for the remainder 	of an unexpired term to end October 29, 2025. 
31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and 	to the Office of the Mayor. 
33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.   DonnaMPavone
 
‘WORKEXPERIENCE
TheSpa@Equinox—MasterAesthetician&LicensedMassageTherapist
05/2021toPr
 
ent,WashingtonDC
Facials,Hydrafacial
‘SwedishDeepTissueandPrenatalMassage
Reflexology
WTSInternational—Aesthetician.LicensedMassageTherapist
tonDC
 
‘2021,AlexandriaVA/W:
 
TheSpa@LorienHotel
Esthetician
TheSpabyIvankaTrump
LicensedMassageTherapist
MCEDrDrewVarano—Technician
‘2016to ‘2017,WashingtonDC
LaserHairRemoval
TattooRemoval
ChemicalPeels
Microdermabrasion
Fraxel
SCLA/Equinox—MasterAestheticianLicensedMassageTherapist
06/2 ‘2017,WashingtonDC
 
Facials
Hydrafacials
‘SwedishDeepTissueMassage,Reflexology   
Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
 
Donna Pavone 
 
Ms. Donna Pavone brings over two decades of expertise in the wellness and 
beauty industry, as both 	a Master Aesthetician and Licensed Massage Therapist. 
Currently serving as a member of The Spa @ Equinox in Washington, 	DC since 
May 2021, Ms. Pavone specializes in a range of rejuvenating treatments 
including facials and HydraFacial sessions, as well as Swedish, deep 	tissue, and 
prenatal massages, ensuring each client experiences relaxation and skincare 
benefits. 
Prior to her tenure at Equinox, Ms. Pavone honed her craft at WTS International from April 2017 
to March 2021, catering to clientele at The Spa @ Lorien Hotel and The Spa by Ivanka Trump. 
Her dedication to excellence and client satisfaction was evident in her role as an Aesthetician and 
Licensed Massage Therapist, where she provided top-	notch services tailored to individual needs. 
With a passion for continuous learning and innovation, 	Ms. Pavone expanded her repertoire during 
her time at MCE Dr. Drew Varano from September 2016 to February 2017, specializing in 
advanced skincare treatments such as laser hair removal, tattoo removal, chemical peels, 
microdermabrasion, and Fraxel procedures. 
Beginning her career at SCLA/Equinox in June 2000, Ms. Pavone’s journey as a Master 
Aesthetician and Licensed Massage Therapist took root, as she mastered the art of facials, 
Hydrafacials, Swedish and deep 	tissue massages, and reflexology techniques. Her dedication to 
her craft led her to become a valued member of the Associated Bodywork & Massage Professionals 
(ABMP), demonstrating her commitment to upholding the highest standards of professionalism 
and integrity. 
A Ward 2 resident, Ms. Pavone earned her accreditation as a Licensed Massage Therapist at the 
Potomac Massage Therapy Institute.   GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
 
 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724-7681 
 
To:   Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker 
From:   Betsy Cavendish 
Date:   May 7, 2024 
Subject:  Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Donna M. Pavone and Hope 
R. Carlisle as members of the Board of Massage Therapy 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and 
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-
724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. 
 
 
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish