District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0928 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/09/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-550  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
July 9, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency basis, due to congressional review, with respect to the 
need to amend the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to 
set a new expiration date for qualifying patient and caregiver registration identification 
cards from 2 years to 6 years and to require the surrender of a registration card and 
notification of any registered caregiver when a person no longer requires medical 
cannabis; and to amend Title 47 of the District of Columbia Official Code to establish the 
4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week for 2024. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 4/20 Medical 
Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 
2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2. (a) There existed an immediate need to set a new expiration date for qualifying 
patient and caregiver registration identification cards from 2 years to 6 years, require the 
surrender of a registration card and notification of any registered caregiver when a person no 
longer requires medical cannabis, and to authorize the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis 
Administration to summarily close an unlicensed retailer; and to amend Title 47 of the District of 
Columbia Official Code to establish the 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week for 
2024. 
 (b) In April 2024, the Council enacted the Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 
4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, effective 
April 8, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-437; 71 DCR 4118), (“emergency legislation”) and the Medical 
Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, passed on 2nd reading on May 7, 2024 (Enrolled version 
Bill 25-761), (“temporary legislation”) to address the above-referenced needs.  
 (c) The emergency legislation expires on July 7, 2024.  The temporary legislation must 
still complete the 30-day review period required by section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia 
Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-
206.02(c)(1)), and will not become law until after the emergency legislation has expired.    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
 (d) It is necessary that the provisions of the emergency legislation continue in effect, 
without interruption, until the temporary legislation is in effect.  
 
 Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension 
and 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Congressional Review Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.