District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0932 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/09/2024

                     
 ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-607  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
July 9, 2024 
 
 
To approve the corrected collective bargaining agreement submitted by the Mayor for employees 
of the District of Columbia Public Schools who are represented by the Washington 
Teachers’ Union, Local #6 of the American Federation of Teachers. 
 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA , That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Corrected Compensation and Working Conditions Agreement 
between the District of Columbia Public Schools and the Washington Teachers’ Union, Local #6 
of the American Federation of Teachers Emergency Approval Resolution of 2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 1717(j) of the District of Columbia Government 
Comprehensive Merit Personnel Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-139; D.C. 
Official Code § 1-617.17(j)), the Council approves the corrected collective bargaining agreement 
between the District of Columbia Public Schools and the Washington Teachers’ Union, Local #6 
of the American Federation of Teachers and the associated pay schedules, which were 
transmitted to the Council by the Mayor on July 5, 2024. 
 
 Sec. 3. Applicability. 
 This resolution shall apply as of February 7, 2023.  
 
 Sec. 4. Transmittal. 
 The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the Washington 
Teachers’ Union, Local #6 of the American Federation of Teachers and to the Mayor. 
 
 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This resolution shall take effect immediately.