ENROLLED ORIGINAL A RESOLUTION 25-611 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA September 17, 2024 To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need to amend the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on voluntary agreements. RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution may be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the Council passed the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-0517; 71 DCR 9351), which was enacted on July 18, 2024, and expires on October 20, 2024. (b) On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-0531; 71 DCR 9936), which was transmitted to Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to become law on December 7, 2024. (c) Emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.