ENROLLED ORIGINAL A RESOLUTION 25-610 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA September 17, 2024 To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need to continue existing requirements for providers of commercial or residential rental property to abide by agreed upon rent payment plans with eligible tenants. RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution may be cited as the “Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the passed the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Emergency Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-513; 71 DCR 9336), which was enacted on July 18, 2024, and expires on October 16, 2024. (b) On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Temporary Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-532; 71 DCR 9938), which was transmitted to Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to become law on December 7, 2024. (c) Emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.