MURIEL BOWSER MAYOR October 10, 2024 The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 Washington, DC 20004 Dear Chairman Mendelson: In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2- 142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 102 of the Racial Equity Achieves Results (REACH) Amendment Act of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. Law 23-181; D.C. Official Code § 2-1471.02), I am pleased to nominate the following individual: Vivian Lowery Derryck Oregon Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20015 (Ward 4) for reappointment as a member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, for a term to end December 17, 2026. Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments, should the Council require additional information. Sincerely, Muriel Bowser Mayor 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 A PROPOSED RESOLUTION ~~~ Chairman Phil Mendelson at the request of the Mayor 10 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 12 13 14 15 To confirm the reappointment of Vivian Lowery Derryck to the Racial Equity Advisory Board. 16 17 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 18 resolution may be cited as the "Racial Equity Advisory Board Vivian Lowery Derryck 19 Confirmation Resolution of 2024". 20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: 21 22 Vivian Lowery Derryck 23 Oregon A venue, NW 24 Washington, DC 20015 25 (Ward 4) 26 27 as a member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, established by section 102 of the Racial 28 Equity Achieves Results (REACH) Amendment Act of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. 29 Law 23-181; D.C. Official Code§ 2-1471.02), for a term to end December 17, 2026. 30 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution, 31 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor. 32 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. AWARDS Guggenheim Humanitarian Award; the National Council of Negro Women Martin Luther King Service Award; the UNICEF Achievement Award; the African Union African Women of Excellence Award; the 2019 UN National Capital Area Human Rights Award. She has been named a Knight of the National Order of Mali by the Malian government; named a Purpose Prize Fellow; and awarded an honorary doctorate. Two endowed Fellowships in Sustainable Development established in her name at Howard University. Vivian Lowery Derryck Fo The Bridges Institute XXXXXXX // Washington, DC // XXX-XXX-XXXX // XXX@XXXX.XXX PROFILE Bachelor of Arts in Political Science - Chatham College Master of International Affairs - Columbia University EXPERIENCE Founder and President Emerita of the Bridges Institute (Bridges), a nonprofit that works to strengthen African governance and democracy. Bridges’ programs bring together continental Africans and the Diaspora to examine issues of governance, corruption, race, equity, and women’s rights to develop strategies for strengthening citizen engagement in building robust democracies. Deputy Assistant Secretary for Equal Employment Opportunity and Civil Rights at the U.S. Department of State; the Senate-confirmed Assistant Administrator for Africa at USAID where she managed a $1 billion portfolio; president of the African American Institute; executive vice president of the National Council of Negro Women (NCNW); the first vice-president of the National Democratic Institute; and senior vice-president of the former $850 million non- profit, the Academy for Educational Development. Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvan ia Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 Vivian Lowery Derryck Ms. Vivian Lowery Derryck is the founder and President Emerita of the Bridges Institute (Bridges), a nonprofit that works to strengthen African governance and democracy. Bridges’ programs bring together continental Africans and the Diaspora to examine issues of governance, corruption, race, equity, and women’s rights to develop strategies for strengthening citizen engagement in building robust democracies. In 2020, following George Floyd’s murder, Bridges launched a new initiative, Concerned Citizens Defending Democracy, which focuses on strengthening U.S. democracy, social justice, racial healing and reconciliation. She is also a current member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board. The 2023, George Washington University-endowed Vivian Lowery Derryck/Bridges Institute African Lecture and Meeting Series ensures annual dialogue on African democracy and governance in perpetuity. Ms. Derryck founded the Bridges Institute in 2009 when she was an Inaugural Fellow in Harvard’s Advanced Leadership Initiative. Prior to Bridges, Ms. Derryck worked in and out of government in more than 35 countries in Africa, Asia, and the Caribbean. She served as the Deputy Assistant Secretary for Equal Employment Opportunity and Civil Rights at the U.S. Department of State; the Senate-confirmed Assistant Administrator for Africa at USAID where she managed a $1 billion portfolio; president of the African American Institute; executive vice president of the National Council of Negro Women (NCNW); the first vice-president of the National Democratic Institute; and senior vice-president of the former $850 million non-profit, the Academy for Educational Development. Ms. Derryck has received several accolades, including the Guggenheim Humanitarian Award; the National Council of Negro Women Martin Luther King Service Award; the UNICEF Achievement Award; the African Union African Women of Excellence Award; the 2019 UN National Capital Area Human Rights Award. She has been named a Knight of the National Order of Mali by the Malian government; named a Purpose Prize Fellow; and awarded an honorary doctorate. She also has two endowed Fellowships in Sustainable Development established in her name at Howard University. A Ward 4 resident, Ms. Vivian Lowery Derryck earned her Bachelor of Arts in Political Science from Chatham College and a Master of International Affairs from Columbia University. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor ______________________________________________________________________________ The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681 To: Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker From: Betsy Cavendish Date: September 16, 2024 Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Shareefah Al’Uqdah, David Coleman, Kelly Crawford, Kenya Hutton, Yolanda Lewis, Vivian Lowery Derrick, Lamont Mitchell, and Gabrielle Parsons as members of the Racial Equity Advisory Board This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and found them to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202- 724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. ______________________________ Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish