MURIEL BOWSER MAYOR October 17, 2024 The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 Washington, DC 20004 Dear Chairman Mendelson: In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2- 142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 4 of the Commission on Arts and Humanities Act, effective October 21, 1975 (D.C. Law 1-22; D.C. Official Code § 39-203), I am pleased to nominate the following individual: Ms. Maggie O’Neill Rhode Island Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20001 (Ward 2) for appointment as a public member of the Commission on the Arts and Humanities, filling a vacant seat formerly held by Amy Bormet, for the remainder of an unexpired term to end June 30, 2025. Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments, should the Council require additional information. Sincerely, Muriel Bowser Mayor 1 2 hairman Phil Mendelson 3 at the request of the Mayor 4 5 6 A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7 8 9 10 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 12 13 14 15 To confirm the appointment of Maggie O'Neill to the Commission on the Arts and Humanities. 16 17 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 18 resolution may be cited as the "Commission on the Arts and Humanities Maggie O'Neill 19 Confirmation Resolution of 2024". 20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment of: 21 22 Maggie O'Neill 23 Rhode Island A venue, NW 24 Washington, DC 20001 25 (Ward 2) 26 27 as a public member of the Commission on the Arts and Humanities, established by section 4 of 28 the Commission on the Arts and Humanities Act, effective October 21, 1975 (D.C. Law 1-22; 29 D.C. Official Code§ 39-203), filling a vacant seat formerly held by Amy Bormet, for the 30 remainder of an unexpired term to end June 30, 2025. 31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution, 32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor. 33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. Maggie O'Neill "I believe color is the answer. I believe art creates the most unlikely and profound connection between people all over the world. I was put on this planet to create art, create spaces, and create connection and conversation through my work." Professional Summary Creative and dynamic professional with over 20 years of experience as a cultural leader, artist, and designer in Washington, D.C. Demonstrated success in supporting the city's creative community through innovative design projects, community-focused initiatives, and public art exhibitions. Entrepreneurial spirit with a proven track record of transforming commercial spaces, including the iconic Willard Hotel, and contributing to the cultural landscape of the nation's capital. Notable Achievements and Recognition • Personally delivered a portrait to President Obama in 2012. • Featured on embassy walls globally, as well as in prestigious hotels like Sofitel, Four Seasons, and Rosewood. • Named the 2018 Official Artist of the National Cherry Blossom Festival. • Created immersive pop-up art activations, such as cherry blossoms made from D.C. parking tickets. Public Art Projects • "The Women Who Will" (Pennsylvania Avenue, 50 x 50 mural commissioned by Tishman Speyer and Lyft to celebrate Women's History Month). • "Together" (Collaborative mural inspired by the 2017 Women's March, supported by Shaw Main Streets & Artbox DC, and the DC Commission on the Arts and Humanities Public Art Building Communities grant program). Professional Experience SWATCHROOM, Washington, D.C. Founder and Creative Director • Led a creative design firm with a robust portfolio of 55+ commercial spaces in the District, including restaurants and iconic hotels. • Spearheaded the complete reimagining of the historic Willard Hotel. • Executed community-focused projects, such as pop-ups and murals, designed to be inclusive and spark open dialogue. • Positioned as a cultural leader at the intersection of arts and hospitality. Vote for Your Daughter (VFYD), Washington, D.C. Founder and Creative Director • Initiated and led the VFYD public art exhibit and campaign, aiming to defend the rights of American women and girls. • Currently fundraising to create 51 statues of young girls with life-sized fiberglass figures, collaborating with 51 selected artists. • Utilizing art as a vehicle to educate voters and raise awareness of issues affecting women and girls. Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 Maggie O’Neill Ms. Maggie O’Neill is an artist, designer, and creative entrepreneur based in the District of Columbia. Living and working in the neighborhood of Shaw, her work is inspired by local landscapes and cultural icons, her travels abroad, notable women, and fashion. In 2012, Ms. O’Neill had the honor of personally delivering a portrait to President Obama, and in 2014 her “DC Uncle Sam” was featured on the front page of The New York Times . She is the co-founder of SWATCHROOM, a full-service design, art and fabrication studio. Through SWATCHROOM, she’s designed notable commercial spaces and private residencies throughout the Mid- Atlantic, including more than twenty restaurants and the offices for incubator 1776 in Washington, New York, and Dubai. She has also designed custom installation pieces for real estate developers, private commissions, and companies like Twitter and Microsoft. Ms. O’Neill is a fine artist, best known for her iconic pop impressionistic paintings of iconic Washington, D.C. landmarks and people, like her “Pop Capitol” and “Flynn’s Jefferson Memorial.” She’s been the featured speaker for Creative Mornings DC, a two- time winner of the design category for DC Inno’s “50 on Fire,” named a “Woman of Influence” by Capitol File in 2015, and her art was featured on the cover of DC Magazine’s December 2016 issue, among other accolades. In addition to her work, Ms. O’Neill is focused on giving back to her community and paying it forward. She is the founder of SUPERFIERCE, a national traveling art exhibit that highlights female artists, benefits local charities and mentors aspiring artists. Proceeds from her artwork have benefited organizations like Research Down Syndrome, Autism Speaks, Habitat for Humanity, DC Central Kitchen, and Project Soar. Additionally, she is active in her local community as a board member of Shaw Main Streets, a commercial revitalization and historic preservation non- profit. A Ward 2 resident, Ms. O’Neill earned her Bachelor of Science in Political Science from the College of the Holy Cross. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor ______________________________________________________________________________ The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681 To: From: Date: Subject: Tomas Talamante, S teve Walker Betsy Cavendish October 16, 2024 Leg al sufficiency review of the Resolution nominating Maggie O’Neill as a member of the Commission on the Arts and Humanities This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above- referenced resolutions and found them to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call me at 202-724-7681. ______________________________ Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish