District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-1055 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/07/2024

                     
1 
 
    1 
  Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION  6 
________ 7 
 8 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 
______________________ 10 
 11 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Rental Housing 12 
Act of 1985 to enact a moratorium on applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance  of, 13 
certificates of assurance associated with District rent stabilization laws	. 14 
 15 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 16 
may be cited as the “Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Emergency Declaration 17 
Resolution of 2024”. 18 
Sec. 2. (a) Section 221 of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 2985 (	D.C. 19 
Law 6-10; D.C. Official Code § 42- 3502.21) allows owners of housing accommodations to apply 20 
for certificates of assurance from the Mayor , which would provide that in the event their 21 
properties become subject to any rent stabilization , the owners would recover in the form of a 22 
District real estate tax credit the difference between the annual fair market rent	s and the annual 23 
amount of stabilized rent s the owners receive from the tenants in the housing accommodations	.  24 
(b) Because the certificate of assurance 	entitlement lasts for as long as the properties 25 
remain housing accommodations	, the entitlement may create a potentially prohibitive fiscal 26 
impact on future reform legislation	.  27 
(c) Implementation barriers and concerns kept the program from ever being fully 28 
operational.  29 
(d) On September 22, 2020, the Council passed the Certificate of Assurance Moratorium 30   
2 
 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2020 (Bill 23	-0900), which placed an emergency moratorium on 31 
applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance of, certificates of a ssurance to owners of housing 32 
accommodations.  33 
(e) The Council has extended the moratorium through subsequent emergency and 34 
temporary acts, including most recently the Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Second 35 
Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, effective April 10, 2024 (D.C. Law 25-	152), 36 
which will expire on November 21, 2024.  37 
(f) The Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 is 38 
necessary to maintain the status quo while permanent legislation is considered. 39 
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 40 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 41 
Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 	be adopted after a 42 
single reading. 43 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 44