District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-1080 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 12/03/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-727  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
December 3, 2024 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to authorize the Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development to provide grant 
funding to a technology incubator in the District. 
  RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development 
Technology Incubator Grant Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
  Sec. 2. (a) On July 9, 2024, the Council unanimously approved the Deputy Mayor for 
Planning and Economic Development Technology Incubator Grant Emergency Amendment Act 
of 2024, effective July 26, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-	546; 71 DCR 9982)(“Emergency Act”). The 
Emergency Act expired on October 24, 2024. 
 (b) On September 17, 2024, the Council unanimously approved the Deputy Mayor for 
Planning and Economic Development Technology Incubator Grant Temporary Amendment Act 
of 2024, effective November 27, 2024 (D.C. Law 25-224; 71 DCR 12342)	(“Temporary Act”) on 
second reading. The Temporary Act completed congressional review following the expiration of 
the Emergency Act. Therefore, congressional review emergency is necessary to prevent a gap in 
the law between the expiration of the emergency measure 	and the effective date of the temporary 
measure. 
  Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Deputy Mayor for Planning and 	Economic Development Technology Incubator Grant Congressional Review Emergency 	Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.