District Of Columbia 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B26-0166 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/04/2025

                     
March 4, 2025 
 
Nyasha Howard, Secretary 
Council of the District of Columbia 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW 
Washington, DC 20004 
 
 
Dear Secretary Howard: 
 
Today, I am introducing the “Closing of a Public Alley in Square 2068, S.O. 25-01801, Act of 
2025.” This legislation would close the 15-foot-wide L-shaped portion of the alley system in 
Square 2068 abutting Lots 92, 811, and 818 for purposes of facilitating the consolidation of 
properties and moving forward with construction by 3500 CT LLC and Uptown Heights LLC of 
a three-story, plus penthouse, residential building.  
 
The closing of this alley would allow for a more efficient site plan for the project, consisting of 
approximately 13,180 square feet of residential gross floor area and a parking area for 
approximately 12 to 14 vehicles. The portion of the alley being closed will not preclude access to 
services for the surrounding properties nor the project property given access to other alleys off 
Ordway and Porter streets. 
 
Should you have any questions about this legislation, please contact my Chief of Staff, Leigh 
Catherine Miles, at lcmiles@dccouncil.gov. 
 
Sincerely, 
 
 
 
Councilmember Matthew Frumin, Ward 3 
Chairperson, Committee on Human Services  1 
 
 1 
___________________________ 2 
Councilmember Matthew Frumin 3 
 4 
A BILL 5 
 6 
_________ 7 
 8 
 9 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 
 11 
__________________ 12 
 13 
To order the closing of the portion of the public alley system, including the 15-foot-wide L-14 
shaped portion of the alley system on 3500 Connecticut Avenue in Square 2068 abutting 15 
Lots 92, 811, and 818.  16 
 17 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That, this 18 
act may be cited as the “Closing of a Public Alley in Square 2068, S.O. 25-01801, Act of 2025”.  19 
 Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 404 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 20 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 787; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.04), and consistent with the Street 21 
and Alley Closing and Acquisition Procedures Act of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. Law 22 
4-201; D.C. Official Code § 9-201.01 et seq.), the Council finds that the portions of public alley 23 
in Square 2068, as shown on the Surveyor’s plat filed under S.O. 25-01801, are unnecessary for 24 
alley purposes and orders them closed with title to the land to vest as shown on the Surveyor’s 25 
plat.  26 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 27 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 28 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 29 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 30 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 31  2 
 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 32 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 33 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 34 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 35 
Columbia Register. 36