District Of Columbia 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B26-0188 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/24/2025

                      
COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA  
OFFICE OF COUNCILMEMBER BROOKE PINTO  
THE JOHN A. WILSON BUILDING  
1350 PENNSYLVANIA AVENUE, N.W., SUITE 106  
WASHINGTON, D.C. 20004  
 
   
 
March 24, 2025  
 
Nyasha Howard, Secretary 
Council of the District of Columbia 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. 
Washington, DC 20004  
 
Dear Secretary Howard,  
 
Today, along with Councilmember Anita Bonds, I am introducing the “Pretrial Detention 
Amendment Act of 2025.”  
 
District law generally provides that when a person is arrested and charged with a crime, the person 
should be released prior to trial (either with or without conditions) unless a judge finds that the 
person either (1) is a flight risk, or (2) presents a danger to the community.
1
 If a judge finds that 
no conditions imposed on a person would reasonably assure the safety of others, or that no 
condition would assure the person’s required appearance in court, then the law directs the judge to 
order the person detained pretrial.
2
  
 
In certain situations, there is a “rebuttable presumption” that a person presents a flight risk or a 
danger to the community and therefore should be detained prior to trial. A rebuttable presumption 
is an inference that the court presumes to be conclusive about the facts presented until or unless 
that inference is challenged or “rebutted” with counter-evidence.
3
 In these cases, to release a 
person, a court can only release a person if it finds that evidence has rebutted the presumption. 
 
B25-0395, the Prioritizing Public Safety Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 (“PPSE”), and 
subsequently B25-0345, the Secure DC Omnibus Amendment Act of 2024 (“Secure DC”) made 
changes to pretrial detention. Previously, before PPSE and Secure DC, there was no general 
presumption of detention when a court found probable cause to believe that a person has committed 
a crime of violence. Almost all of the situations in which the rebuttable presumption applied 
required that the individual committed (or at least had been charged with) a crime prior to the 
crime at issue in the case. 
 
PPSE and Secure DC expanded the rebuttable presumption to apply to all charges of crimes of 
violence, regardless of whether the individual has previously been convicted or charged with a 
crime. It also expanded detention for youth who have committed an offense while armed, 
carjacking, sexual abuse or unarmed murder. Secure DC was amended to sunset those provisions, 
which are currently set to expire on July 15, 2025. This bill would remove the sunset and make 
these changes permanent. 
 
1
 D.C. Code § 23-1321(a)-(b). 
2
 D.C. Code § 23-1322. 
3
 Legal Information Institute, Rebuttable presumption, available here.   
   
 
 
Should you have any questions about this legislation, please contact my Committee and Legislative 
Director, Linn Groft, at lgroft@dccouncil.gov.  
 
Thank you, 
 
 
 
Brooke Pinto 
Ward 2 Councilmember 
Chairwoman, Committee on the Judiciary and Public Safety 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
  _____________________________    _____________________________ 1 
Councilmember Anita Bonds          Councilmember Brooke Pinto 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
A BILL 8 
 9 
_________________________ 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
_________________________ 14 
 15 
 16 
To amend the Secure DC Omnibus Amendment Act of 2024 to remove the sunset date of certain 17 
pretrial detention provisions. 18 
 19 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 
act may be cited as the “Pretrial Detention Amendment Act of 2025”. 21 
Sec. 2. The Secure DC Omnibus Amendment Act of 2024, effective June 8, 2024 (D.C. 22 
Law 25-175; 71 DCR 2732), is amended as follows: 23 
(a) Section 18(c)(2) is repealed. 24 
(b) Section 30(k) is repealed. 25 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 26 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 27 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 28 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 29 
Sec. 4. Effective date. 30 
 This act shall take effect after approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 31 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-	day period of congressional review as 32  provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 33 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-	206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 34 
Columbia Register. 35 
 36