District Of Columbia 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR26-0039 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/17/2025

                    January 21, 2025 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council of the District o f Columbia 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Su	ite 504 
Washington, DC 
20004-3003 
Dear Chairman M endelson: 
Pursuant to D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02, I have enclosed, for consideration by the Council of the District of Columbia, 
the (a) Council Contract Summary for the con	tract between the District of Columbia
 Housing Authority (“DCHA”) and 
Rock Solid District Group LLC, and (b) proposed Multiyear Contract Number 41-B-20	24 with Rock Solid District Group 
LLC. Approval R esolution of 2025.  
DCHA proposes to enter into a contract for janitorial services for select DCHA buildings with Rock Solid District Group 
LLC .   Th e proposed contract with 	Rock Solid is in the amount of $697,553.94  for a 	2 year base term.  The proposed 
contract also allows DCHA to extend the contract for up to three (3) one (1) year option periods. 
As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding t he proposed contract.  In or der to f acilitate 
a
 response to any questions concerning th	is contract, 	please have your staff contact H	ammere Gebreyes, Director o f 
External Affairs & Senior Advisor, at (202) 207 -4694.  
I look forward to your 	favorable consideration of this proposed contract. 
Sincerely, 
Keith Pettigrew 
Executive Director, District of Columbia Housing Authority 
Enclosures 
KP/hg 
cc:  Nyasha Smith, Secretary to the Council  i ~;?~ 
3 	khai-Phil Mendelson 
4 	at the request 
of District of 
5 	Columbia Housing Authority 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 	A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
11 
12 
13 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
14 
15 
16 
17 To approve Multiyear Contract 	Number 4 l-B-2024 with Rock Solid District Group 	LLC to 
18 provide janitorial services for select District 	of Columbia Housing Authority buildings. 
19 
20 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
21 resolution may be cited as the 	"Multiyear Contract Number 4 l-B-2024 with Rock Solid District 
22 Group 
LLC Approval Resolution of 2025". 
23 Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 
of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
24 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code 	§ 1-204.51 ), and section 202 	of the 
25 
Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. 	Law 18-371; D.C. 
26 Official 
Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves the Multiyear Contract Number 41-B-2024 
27 with Rock Solid District Group LLC to provide janitorial services to select District of 
28 Columbia Housing Authority buildings in the not-to-exceed amount of $697,553.94 for the 
29 period from the 
execution date of the contract to the two year anniversary of the execution 
30 date 
of the contract. 
3 I Sec. 3 
Transmittal. 
32 The Council shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District 	of 
33 Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor. 
{0030893 
-} 1   
 
 
 
{0030893 - }2 
 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.  1 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 2 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 3 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a).  4 
Sec. 5. Effective date.  5 
This resolution shall take effect immediately. 6