District Of Columbia 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR26-0046 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/04/2025

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
26-34  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
February 4, 2025 
 To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Condominium 
Act of 1976 to authorize condominium unit owners’ associations to conduct virtual meetings and clarify voting and quorum requirements for such meetings; to amend section 29- 910 of the District of Columbia Official Code to allow cooperatives to conduct 
remote meetings; and to amend sections 29-	1005.06, 29- 1005.07, and 29- 1008.11(b) of 
the District of Columbia Official Code to allow limited equity cooperatives to conduct remote meetings. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Association Meeting Flexibility Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2025”. 
 Sec. 2. (a) Since the onset of the COVID -19 pandemic, virtual meetings have become 
routine for many District residents and organizations.  
(b) During this time, the Council has repeatedly granted emergency and temporary 
flexibility for condominium and cooperative associations to conduct their meetings virtually without the need to amend their bylaws.  
(c) The most recent extension of such flexibilities to condominium and cooperative 
associations, the Association Meeting Flexibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, effective 
July 19, 2024 (D.C. law 25-	195; 71 DCR 6754), will expire on March 1	, 2025.  
(d) On December 17, 2024, the Council passed a permanent measure, the 	Fairness and 
Stability in Housing Amendment Act of 2024, enacted on January 16, 2025 (	D.C. Act 25- 694; 72 
DCR 754), which included these provisions. The measure has not yet completed congressional 
review.  
(e) Emergency legislation is necessary to ensure that all interested associations can 
readily benefit from virtual meeting capabilities.  
 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 
Association Meeting Flexibility Emergency Amendment Act of 2025 be adopted after a single reading.  
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.