District Of Columbia 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR26-0063 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/12/2025

                    GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Office of the Attorney General  
 
 
 
A
TTORNEY GENERAL    
BRIAN L. SCHWALB 
 
February 10, 2025 
 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
 
Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed 
emergency legislation, the “Contract No. DCCB-2025-F	-0003 with Edelson PC Approval and 
Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2025” and accompanying emergency declaration 
resolution (“legislation”) to approve the award of the proposed definitive multiyear Contract Number 
DCCB-2025-F -0003 to Edelson PC.  
 
Under the proposed contract, Edelson PC will assist OAG with an investigation and potential 
litigation against identified targets for violation of law related to past marketing, selling, and 
installation of lead water pipes. The Contract is a multi-year contingency fee contract, under which 
the Contractor will only be compensated if the District realizes a monetary recovery, either through 
settlement, judgement, or otherwise. 
The not-to-exceed amount of this contract is $85 million, and 
the base period of performance is from the date of the award through five years thereafter. This 
contract will definitize a letter contract awarded on October 21, 2024.
 
 
If you have any questions , please have your staff contact Interim Deputy Attorney General Sarah 
Comeau at (202)-724-6611 or at sarah.comeau@dc.gov.  
 
I look forward to the Council’s favorable consideration of this contract	. 
 
Sincerely, 
 
Brian L. Schwalb 
Attorney General 
 
Enclosures 
400 Sixth Street NW, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20001-	5790 |  (202) 727- 3400 |  Fax (202) 730-	0484   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
~~~ 
~ fulMendelson 
at the request 
of the Attorney General 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
13 To declare the existence 
of an emergency with respect to the need to approve multi year Contract 
14 No. DCCB-2025-F-0003 with Edelson PC to provide legal services to the Office 	of the 
15 Attorney General. 
16 
17 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
18 resolution may be cited as the "Contract No. DCCB-2025-F-0003 with Edelson PC Emergency 
19 Declaration Resolution of 2025". 
20 Sec. 2. (a) There exists a need 
to approve multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2025-F-0003 
21 with Edelson PC to provide legal services 	to the Office of the Attorney General for Public 
22 Advocacy Division matters. 
23 (b) Because this is a multi year contract and involves expenditures 	in excess of $1 million 
24 during a 12-month period, Council approval 
of this contract is required by section 451 of the 
25 District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official 
26 
Code§ 1-204.51). 
27 ( 
c) Council approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services. 
28 Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
29 emergency circumstances making it necessary that the "Contract No. DCCB-2025-F-0003 with 
30 Edelson PC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act 	of 2025" be adopted after a 
31 single reading.   Sec. 4.   This resolution shall take effect immediately. 32   
 
GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA  
Office of the Attorney General  
  
  
ATTORNEY GENERAL  
BRIAN L. SCHWALB  
  
Commercial Division  
  
REVISED MEMORANDUM  
  
TO:    Sarina Loy  
   Deputy Director  
   
  
Office of Policy and Legislative Affairs  
FROM:   Robert Schildkraut  
   Section Chief   
   
  
Government Contracts Section  
DATE:  
   
January 29, 2025  
SUBJECT:  Approval of Contract Action for Outside Legal Counsel  
  Contract Number: DCCB-2025-F-0003  
  Contractor: Edelson PC  
  Proposed Contract Amount: NTE $85,000,000 (5-Year Amount)  
  
 
  
This is to Certify that this Office has reviewed the above-referenced Contract and that we have 
found it to be legally sufficient.   
  
 If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call me at (202) 724-	4018.  
  
  
______________________________  
  Robert Schildkraut