District Of Columbia 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR26-0153 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/01/2025

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
26-58  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
April 1, 2025 
 
To declare an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need to amend the 
Condominium Act of 1976 to authorize condominium unit owners’ associations to 
conduct virtual meetings and clarify voting and quorum requirements for such meetings; 
to amend section 29-	910 of the District of Columbia Official Code to allow cooperatives 
to conduct remote meetings; and to amend sections 29-	1005.06, 29- 1005.07, and 29-
1008.11(b) of the District of Columbia Official Code to allow limited equity cooperatives 
to conduct remote meetings. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Association Meeting Flexibility Congressional Review 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2025”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) Since the onset of the COVID -19 pandemic, virtual meetings have become 
routine for many District residents and organizations.  
(b) During this time, the Council has repeatedly granted emergency and temporary 
flexibility for condominium and cooperative associations to conduct their meetings virtually 
without the need to amend their bylaws.  
(c) On December 17, 2024, Council passed a permanent measure, the 	Fairness and 
Stability in Housing Amendment Act of 2024, enacted on January 16, 2025 (D.C. Act 25-	694; 72 
DCR 753) (“permanent measure”), which included these provisions. The 	permanent measure is 
expected to become law on 	May 22, 2025.  
(d) After passing the permanent measure, the Council passed a final round of emergency 
and temporary legislation with the intent of avoiding a gap in the law. However, the emergency 
bill will expire on May 14, 2025, and the temporary is expected to become law on May 17, 2025. 
(e) Congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to ensure that all interested 
associations can readily benefit from virtual meeting capabilities.  
 
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 
enumerated in section 2 constitute an emergency making it necessary that the Association 
Meeting Flexibility Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2025 be adopted after 
a single reading.     	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
2 
 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.