Delaware 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware House Bill HCR65 Draft / Bill

                    SPONSOR:      Rep. Dorsey Walker & Sen. Brown & Rep. Bolden & Rep. Chukwuocha & Rep. Cooke & Rep. Harris & Rep. K. Johnson & Rep. Lambert & Rep. Minor-Brown & Rep. S. Moore & Rep. Neal & Rep. Parker Selby & Rep. Phillips & Rep. Wilson-Anton & Sen. Lockman & Sen. Pinkney           HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES   152nd GENERAL ASSEMBLY       HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION NO. 65       RECOGNIZING JUNE 19, 2023, AS "JUNETEENTH NATIONAL INDEPENDENCE DAY" IN THE STATE OF DELAWARE.      

     

     SPONSOR:      Rep. Dorsey Walker & Sen. Brown & Rep. Bolden & Rep. Chukwuocha & Rep. Cooke & Rep. Harris & Rep. K. Johnson & Rep. Lambert & Rep. Minor-Brown & Rep. S. Moore & Rep. Neal & Rep. Parker Selby & Rep. Phillips & Rep. Wilson-Anton & Sen. Lockman & Sen. Pinkney     

SPONSOR: Rep. Dorsey Walker & Sen. Brown & Rep. Bolden & Rep. Chukwuocha & Rep. Cooke & Rep. Harris & Rep. K. Johnson & Rep. Lambert & Rep. Minor-Brown & Rep. S. Moore & Rep. Neal & Rep. Parker Selby & Rep. Phillips & Rep. Wilson-Anton & Sen. Lockman & Sen. Pinkney

 SPONSOR:  

 Rep. Dorsey Walker & Sen. Brown & Rep. Bolden & Rep. Chukwuocha & Rep. Cooke & Rep. Harris & Rep. K. Johnson & Rep. Lambert & Rep. Minor-Brown & Rep. S. Moore & Rep. Neal & Rep. Parker Selby & Rep. Phillips & Rep. Wilson-Anton & Sen. Lockman & Sen. Pinkney 

   

 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 

 152nd GENERAL ASSEMBLY 

   

 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION NO. 65 

   

 RECOGNIZING JUNE 19, 2023, AS "JUNETEENTH NATIONAL INDEPENDENCE DAY" IN THE STATE OF DELAWARE. 

   

    WHEREAS, the final Emancipation Proclamation signed by President Abraham Lincoln on January 1, 1863, which changed the federal legal status of over 3.5 million enslaved African Americans in designated areas of the south from slave to free, although the implementation of Lincolns order came slowly over the duration of the Civil War; and     WHEREAS, June 19, 1865, is recognized as the date the Union General Gordon Granger, upon arriving in Galveston, Texas, issued General Order Number Three, which notified the last enslaved Americans in southern areas denoted in the Emancipation Proclamation of their new legal status; and     WHEREAS, General Grangers General Order Number Three was issued nearly two and a half years after the final issuance of the Emancipation Proclamation, over a month after the end of the Civil War; and     WHEREAS, slavery was officially outlawed across the entire United States on December 18, 1865, with the ratification of the 13th Amendment to the Constitution, which freed slaves in the final two slave states in AmericaKentucky and Delaware; and     WHEREAS, African Americans who had been enslaved in the south thereafter celebrated June 19th as Juneteenth National Independence Day to signify the anniversary of their emancipation; and     WHEREAS, the freed Women and Men handed down this tradition from generation to generation as inspiration and encouragement for future generations; and     WHEREAS, this year marks the 158th anniversary of Juneteenth National Independence Day, which calls for celebrations to honor the memory of all those who endured slavery, especially those who moved from slavery to freedom and to encourage self-development and respect for all cultures; and     WHEREAS, the history behind celebrating Juneteenth should be remembered as the event continues to receive increased recognition across the country and the world; and     WHEREAS, the example of faith, hope, love, strength and character of those who endured and overcame slavery remains a lesson for all Americans today, regardless of background, region or race.     NOW, THEREFORE:     BE IT RESOLVED by the House of Representatives of the 152  nd   General Assembly of the State of Delaware, the Senate concurring therein, that June 19, 2023, is hereby recognized as Juneteenth National Independence Day in the State of Delaware.     BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Delaware House of Representatives and Senate do hereby encourage the people of the State of Delaware to reflect upon the significant roles and many contributions of African Americans to Delaware and our country throughout history and today and to celebrate this day with appropriate activities and events that honor this rich legacy.      

   WHEREAS, the final Emancipation Proclamation signed by President Abraham Lincoln on January 1, 1863, which changed the federal legal status of over 3.5 million enslaved African Americans in designated areas of the south from slave to free, although the implementation of Lincolns order came slowly over the duration of the Civil War; and 

   WHEREAS, June 19, 1865, is recognized as the date the Union General Gordon Granger, upon arriving in Galveston, Texas, issued General Order Number Three, which notified the last enslaved Americans in southern areas denoted in the Emancipation Proclamation of their new legal status; and 

   WHEREAS, General Grangers General Order Number Three was issued nearly two and a half years after the final issuance of the Emancipation Proclamation, over a month after the end of the Civil War; and 

   WHEREAS, slavery was officially outlawed across the entire United States on December 18, 1865, with the ratification of the 13th Amendment to the Constitution, which freed slaves in the final two slave states in AmericaKentucky and Delaware; and 

   WHEREAS, African Americans who had been enslaved in the south thereafter celebrated June 19th as Juneteenth National Independence Day to signify the anniversary of their emancipation; and 

   WHEREAS, the freed Women and Men handed down this tradition from generation to generation as inspiration and encouragement for future generations; and 

   WHEREAS, this year marks the 158th anniversary of Juneteenth National Independence Day, which calls for celebrations to honor the memory of all those who endured slavery, especially those who moved from slavery to freedom and to encourage self-development and respect for all cultures; and 

   WHEREAS, the history behind celebrating Juneteenth should be remembered as the event continues to receive increased recognition across the country and the world; and 

   WHEREAS, the example of faith, hope, love, strength and character of those who endured and overcame slavery remains a lesson for all Americans today, regardless of background, region or race. 

   NOW, THEREFORE: 

   BE IT RESOLVED by the House of Representatives of the 152  nd   General Assembly of the State of Delaware, the Senate concurring therein, that June 19, 2023, is hereby recognized as Juneteenth National Independence Day in the State of Delaware. 

   BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Delaware House of Representatives and Senate do hereby encourage the people of the State of Delaware to reflect upon the significant roles and many contributions of African Americans to Delaware and our country throughout history and today and to celebrate this day with appropriate activities and events that honor this rich legacy. 

   

  SYNOPSIS   This Resolution proclaims June 19, 2023. as Juneteenth National Independence Day in Delaware and encourages the people of Delaware to reflect upon the significant roles and many contributions of African Americans and to celebrate this day with appropriate activities and events.      

 SYNOPSIS 

 This Resolution proclaims June 19, 2023. as Juneteenth National Independence Day in Delaware and encourages the people of Delaware to reflect upon the significant roles and many contributions of African Americans and to celebrate this day with appropriate activities and events.