Delaware 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR23 Draft / Bill

                    SPONSOR:      Sen. Lawson & Sen. Brown & Rep. Carson       Sens. Buckson, Gay, Hansen, Hocker, Hoffner, Huxtable, Lockman, Mantzavinos, S. McBride, Paradee, Pettyjohn, Pinkney, Poore, Richardson, Sokola, Sturgeon, Townsend, Walsh, Wilson; Reps. Baumbach, Briggs King, Collins, Hensley, Osienski, Romer, D. Short, Michael Smith, K. Williams, Yearick           DELAWARE STATE SENATE   152nd GENERAL ASSEMBLY       SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION NO. 23       RECOGNIZING MARCH 29, 2023, AS "NATIONAL VIETNAM WAR VETERANS DAY IN THE STATE OF DELAWARE.      

     

     SPONSOR:      Sen. Lawson & Sen. Brown & Rep. Carson       Sens. Buckson, Gay, Hansen, Hocker, Hoffner, Huxtable, Lockman, Mantzavinos, S. McBride, Paradee, Pettyjohn, Pinkney, Poore, Richardson, Sokola, Sturgeon, Townsend, Walsh, Wilson; Reps. Baumbach, Briggs King, Collins, Hensley, Osienski, Romer, D. Short, Michael Smith, K. Williams, Yearick     

SPONSOR: Sen. Lawson & Sen. Brown & Rep. Carson
Sens. Buckson, Gay, Hansen, Hocker, Hoffner, Huxtable, Lockman, Mantzavinos, S. McBride, Paradee, Pettyjohn, Pinkney, Poore, Richardson, Sokola, Sturgeon, Townsend, Walsh, Wilson; Reps. Baumbach, Briggs King, Collins, Hensley, Osienski, Romer, D. Short, Michael Smith, K. Williams, Yearick

 SPONSOR:  

 Sen. Lawson & Sen. Brown & Rep. Carson 

 Sens. Buckson, Gay, Hansen, Hocker, Hoffner, Huxtable, Lockman, Mantzavinos, S. McBride, Paradee, Pettyjohn, Pinkney, Poore, Richardson, Sokola, Sturgeon, Townsend, Walsh, Wilson; Reps. Baumbach, Briggs King, Collins, Hensley, Osienski, Romer, D. Short, Michael Smith, K. Williams, Yearick 

   

 DELAWARE STATE SENATE 

 152nd GENERAL ASSEMBLY 

   

 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION NO. 23 

   

 RECOGNIZING MARCH 29, 2023, AS "NATIONAL VIETNAM WAR VETERANS DAY IN THE STATE OF DELAWARE. 

   

  WHEREAS, National Vietnam War Veterans Day is to honor and thank our Nations Vietnam veterans and their families for their service and sacrifice; and   WHEREAS, this day also aims to highlight the service of the Armed Forces and support organizations during the war, pay tribute to wartime contributions at home by American citizens, highlight technology, science and medical advances made during the war, and recognize contributions by our Allies; and   WHEREAS, more than 9 million Americans served between November 1, 1955, and May 15, 1975; and   WHEREAS, there are 58,318 names memorialized on the Vietnam Veterans Memorial in our Nations capital; and   WHEREAS, at least 304,000 of those who served were wounded during their service; and   WHEREAS, 1,600 of those who served are Missing in Action (MIA) and have not returned home; and   WHEREAS, there were about 2,500 Prisoners of War during that time; and   WHEREAS, many who served were exposed to the poisonous chemical, Agent Orange, with many still affected by this exposure; and   WHEREAS, there are 65,438 veterans living in Delaware and 38.9% served in Vietnam; and   WHEREAS, March 29th was chosen as the date of recognition and thanks because March 29, 1973, was the day Military Assistance Command, Vietnam was disestablished, and the last U.S. combat troops departed Vietnam.   NOW, THEREFORE:    BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the 152nd General Assembly of the State of Delaware, the House concurring therein, that March 29, 2023, is hereby recognized as National Vietnam War Veterans Day in the State of Delaware.      

 WHEREAS, National Vietnam War Veterans Day is to honor and thank our Nations Vietnam veterans and their families for their service and sacrifice; and 

 WHEREAS, this day also aims to highlight the service of the Armed Forces and support organizations during the war, pay tribute to wartime contributions at home by American citizens, highlight technology, science and medical advances made during the war, and recognize contributions by our Allies; and 

 WHEREAS, more than 9 million Americans served between November 1, 1955, and May 15, 1975; and 

 WHEREAS, there are 58,318 names memorialized on the Vietnam Veterans Memorial in our Nations capital; and 

 WHEREAS, at least 304,000 of those who served were wounded during their service; and 

 WHEREAS, 1,600 of those who served are Missing in Action (MIA) and have not returned home; and 

 WHEREAS, there were about 2,500 Prisoners of War during that time; and 

 WHEREAS, many who served were exposed to the poisonous chemical, Agent Orange, with many still affected by this exposure; and 

 WHEREAS, there are 65,438 veterans living in Delaware and 38.9% served in Vietnam; and 

 WHEREAS, March 29th was chosen as the date of recognition and thanks because March 29, 1973, was the day Military Assistance Command, Vietnam was disestablished, and the last U.S. combat troops departed Vietnam. 

 NOW, THEREFORE:  

 BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the 152nd General Assembly of the State of Delaware, the House concurring therein, that March 29, 2023, is hereby recognized as National Vietnam War Veterans Day in the State of Delaware. 

   

  SYNOPSIS   This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 29, 2023, as "National Vietnam War Veterans Day" in Delaware.      Author: Senator Lawson  

 SYNOPSIS 

 This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 29, 2023, as "National Vietnam War Veterans Day" in Delaware. 

  

 Author: Senator Lawson