SPONSOR: Sen. Lawson & Sen. Brown & Rep. Carson Sens. Buckson, Gay, Hansen, Hocker, Hoffner, Huxtable, Lockman, Mantzavinos, S. McBride, Paradee, Pettyjohn, Pinkney, Poore, Richardson, Sokola, Sturgeon, Townsend, Walsh, Wilson; Reps. Baumbach, Briggs King, Collins, Hensley, Osienski, Romer, D. Short, Michael Smith, K. Williams, Yearick DELAWARE STATE SENATE 152nd GENERAL ASSEMBLY SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION NO. 23 RECOGNIZING MARCH 29, 2023, AS "NATIONAL VIETNAM WAR VETERANS DAY IN THE STATE OF DELAWARE. SPONSOR: Sen. Lawson & Sen. Brown & Rep. Carson Sens. Buckson, Gay, Hansen, Hocker, Hoffner, Huxtable, Lockman, Mantzavinos, S. McBride, Paradee, Pettyjohn, Pinkney, Poore, Richardson, Sokola, Sturgeon, Townsend, Walsh, Wilson; Reps. Baumbach, Briggs King, Collins, Hensley, Osienski, Romer, D. Short, Michael Smith, K. Williams, Yearick SPONSOR: Sen. Lawson & Sen. Brown & Rep. Carson Sens. Buckson, Gay, Hansen, Hocker, Hoffner, Huxtable, Lockman, Mantzavinos, S. McBride, Paradee, Pettyjohn, Pinkney, Poore, Richardson, Sokola, Sturgeon, Townsend, Walsh, Wilson; Reps. Baumbach, Briggs King, Collins, Hensley, Osienski, Romer, D. Short, Michael Smith, K. Williams, Yearick SPONSOR: Sen. Lawson & Sen. Brown & Rep. Carson Sens. Buckson, Gay, Hansen, Hocker, Hoffner, Huxtable, Lockman, Mantzavinos, S. McBride, Paradee, Pettyjohn, Pinkney, Poore, Richardson, Sokola, Sturgeon, Townsend, Walsh, Wilson; Reps. Baumbach, Briggs King, Collins, Hensley, Osienski, Romer, D. Short, Michael Smith, K. Williams, Yearick DELAWARE STATE SENATE 152nd GENERAL ASSEMBLY SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION NO. 23 RECOGNIZING MARCH 29, 2023, AS "NATIONAL VIETNAM WAR VETERANS DAY IN THE STATE OF DELAWARE. WHEREAS, National Vietnam War Veterans Day is to honor and thank our Nations Vietnam veterans and their families for their service and sacrifice; and WHEREAS, this day also aims to highlight the service of the Armed Forces and support organizations during the war, pay tribute to wartime contributions at home by American citizens, highlight technology, science and medical advances made during the war, and recognize contributions by our Allies; and WHEREAS, more than 9 million Americans served between November 1, 1955, and May 15, 1975; and WHEREAS, there are 58,318 names memorialized on the Vietnam Veterans Memorial in our Nations capital; and WHEREAS, at least 304,000 of those who served were wounded during their service; and WHEREAS, 1,600 of those who served are Missing in Action (MIA) and have not returned home; and WHEREAS, there were about 2,500 Prisoners of War during that time; and WHEREAS, many who served were exposed to the poisonous chemical, Agent Orange, with many still affected by this exposure; and WHEREAS, there are 65,438 veterans living in Delaware and 38.9% served in Vietnam; and WHEREAS, March 29th was chosen as the date of recognition and thanks because March 29, 1973, was the day Military Assistance Command, Vietnam was disestablished, and the last U.S. combat troops departed Vietnam. NOW, THEREFORE: BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the 152nd General Assembly of the State of Delaware, the House concurring therein, that March 29, 2023, is hereby recognized as National Vietnam War Veterans Day in the State of Delaware. WHEREAS, National Vietnam War Veterans Day is to honor and thank our Nations Vietnam veterans and their families for their service and sacrifice; and WHEREAS, this day also aims to highlight the service of the Armed Forces and support organizations during the war, pay tribute to wartime contributions at home by American citizens, highlight technology, science and medical advances made during the war, and recognize contributions by our Allies; and WHEREAS, more than 9 million Americans served between November 1, 1955, and May 15, 1975; and WHEREAS, there are 58,318 names memorialized on the Vietnam Veterans Memorial in our Nations capital; and WHEREAS, at least 304,000 of those who served were wounded during their service; and WHEREAS, 1,600 of those who served are Missing in Action (MIA) and have not returned home; and WHEREAS, there were about 2,500 Prisoners of War during that time; and WHEREAS, many who served were exposed to the poisonous chemical, Agent Orange, with many still affected by this exposure; and WHEREAS, there are 65,438 veterans living in Delaware and 38.9% served in Vietnam; and WHEREAS, March 29th was chosen as the date of recognition and thanks because March 29, 1973, was the day Military Assistance Command, Vietnam was disestablished, and the last U.S. combat troops departed Vietnam. NOW, THEREFORE: BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the 152nd General Assembly of the State of Delaware, the House concurring therein, that March 29, 2023, is hereby recognized as National Vietnam War Veterans Day in the State of Delaware. SYNOPSIS This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 29, 2023, as "National Vietnam War Veterans Day" in Delaware. Author: Senator Lawson SYNOPSIS This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 29, 2023, as "National Vietnam War Veterans Day" in Delaware. Author: Senator Lawson