This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. STORAGE NAME: h0089c.ITA DATE: 1/27/2022 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS BILL #: CS/HB 89 Transportation Facility Designations SPONSOR(S): Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee, LaMarca TIED BILLS: IDEN./SIM. BILLS: REFERENCE ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 1) Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee 16 Y, 0 N, As CS Walsh Keating 2) Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee 13 Y, 0 N Hicks Davis 3) Commerce Committee SUMMARY ANALYSIS Under current law, the Legislature may designate a transportation facility, such as a bridge, interchange, or portion of a road, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular facility. Legislative designations do not change the official names of the facilities. The Department of Transportation (DOT) erects markers for each designation, but may not do so until the appropriate city or county commission passes a resolution in support of the designation. The bill designates: “Pio Ieraci Memorial Drive” in Broward County; “Sgt. George Lee Taylor, Sr., Memorial Highway” in Brevard County; and “Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., Boulevard” in Brevard County. The bill directs DOT to erect suitable markers for the road designations. The bill will have an insignificant negative fiscal impact to the State Transportation Trust Fund associated with erecting suitable markers for the designations. The cost can be absorbed within DOT’s existing resources. The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2022. STORAGE NAME: h0089c.ITA PAGE: 2 DATE: 1/27/2022 FULL ANALYSIS I. SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: Present Situation Transportation Facility Designations Under current law, the Legislature may designate a transportation facility, such as a bridge, interchange, or portion of a road, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular facility. Legislative designations do not change the official names of the designated facilities, and do not require local governments or private entities to change street signs, mailing addresses, or 911 emergency telephone-number system listings to account for the designations. 1 Current law sets standards for the naming of state buildings and other facilities. The law provides that except as specifically provided by law, state buildings, roads, bridges, parks, recreational complexes, and other similar facilities may not be named for a living person. 2 Road Markers The Department of Transportation (DOT) must place a marker at each terminus or intersection of a designated road, bridge, or other transportation facility and erect other markers it deems appropriate for the facility. 3 Road markers may not be erected until the appropriate city or county commission passes a resolution in support of a particular designation. Additionally, if a designated facility extends through multiple cities or counties, a resolution must be passed by each affected local government before the road markers can be erected by DOT. 4 Pio Ieraci After moving to Florida over 30 years ago, Pio Richard Ieraci became an active community leader in the Fort Lauderdale Community. Throughout Mr. Ieraci’s time in Florida, he served as a member on the City of Fort Lauderdale Education Advisory Board, Chairman of South Florida Business Advisors, Inc., Chairman of the Broward Beach Coalition, President of the Galt Mile Community Association, and President of the Galt Ocean Club Condominium Association. Mr. Ieraci passed away on December 20, 2020, and is survived by his wife and two children. 5 Sgt. George Lee Taylor, Sr. Sgt. George Lee Taylor, Sr., served in the United States Army from 1967 to 1971. After returning from war, Sgt. Taylor founded National Veterans Homeless Support, which is estimated to have helped reduce the homeless veteran population in Brevard County by 90 percent. Sgt. Taylor passed away on May 17, 2020. 6 Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., was a civil rights leader and the youngest man to have received the Nobel Peace Prize. Dr. King traveled over six million miles and spoke over twenty-five hundred times, with his most well-known speech being the famous “I Have a Dream” address. On the evening of April 4, 1968, Dr. King was assassinated. 7 Effect of the Bill 1 S. 334.071(1), F.S. 2 S. 267.062(1), F.S. 3 S. 334.071(2), F.S. 4 S. 334.071(3), F.S. 5 Dignity Memorial, Pio Richard Ieraci, https://www.dignitymemorial.com/obituaries/fort-lauderdale-fl/pio-ieraci-9961464 (last visited Jan. 5, 2022). 6 Legacy, George Taylor Sr., https://www.legacy.com/us/obituaries/floridatoday/name/george-taylor-obituary?id=8577009 (last visited Jan. 13, 2022). 7 The Nobel Prize, Martin Luther King Jr., https://www.nobelprize.org/prizes/peace/1964/king/biographical/ (last visited Jan. 13, 2022). STORAGE NAME: h0089c.ITA PAGE: 3 DATE: 1/27/2022 The bill designates: That portion of S.R. A1A between the northern terminus and southern terminus of Galt Ocean Drive in Broward County is designated as “Pio Ieraci Memorial Drive”; That portion of S.R. 520/W. King Street between S.R. 501/Clearlake Road and S.R. 519/Fiske Boulevard in Brevard County as “Sgt. George Lee Taylor, Sr., Memorial Highway”; and That portion of S.R. 519/Fiske Boulevard between Rosa L. Jones Drive and I-95 in Brevard County as “Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., Boulevard.” The bill directs DOT to erect suitable markers for the designations. B. SECTION DIRECTORY: Section 1: Designates “Pio Ieraci Memorial Drive;” “Sgt. George Lee Taylor, Sr., Memorial Highway;” and “Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., Boulevard.” Section 2: Provides an effective date of July 1, 2022. II. FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 1. Revenues: None. 2. Expenditures: DOT estimates a cost of $1,040 for the appropriate markers for each designation, which provides for two signs per designation at $520 per sign. 8 Therefore, the bill has an estimated negative fiscal impact of $3,120 to the State Transportation Trust Fund. This cost can be absorbed within existing DOT resources. B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 1. Revenues: None. 2. Expenditures: None. C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: None. D. FISCAL COMMENTS: None. III. COMMENTS A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 8 Email from Amanda Marsh, Legislative Analyst, Florida Department of Transportation, FDOT Memorial Roadway Designation Sign Estimate, (Sep. 15, 2021). STORAGE NAME: h0089c.ITA PAGE: 4 DATE: 1/27/2022 Not applicable. This bill does not appear to affect county or municipal governments. 2. Other: None. B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: The bill does not require or authorize rulemaking. C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: None. IV. AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES On January 12, 2022, the Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee adopted a strike-all amendment to the bill and reported the bill favorably as a committee substitute. The amendment added the designations of “Sgt. George Lee Taylor, Sr., Memorial Highway” in Brevard County, and “Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., Boulevard” in Brevard County. The amendment directs DOT to erect suitable markers for all the designations. This analysis is drafted to the committee substitute as approved by the Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee.