Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0147 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 11/24/2021

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0147.TIE 
DATE: 11/24/2021 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 147    Transportation Facility Designations 
SPONSOR(S): Tuck 
TIED BILLS:    IDEN./SIM. BILLS:   
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee  	Walsh Keating 
2) Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations 
Subcommittee 
   
3) Commerce Committee    
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
Under current law, the Legislature may designate a transportation facility, such as a bridge, interchange, or 
portion of a road, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular facility. Legislative 
designations do not change the official names of the facilities. The Department of Transportation (DOT) erects 
markers for each designation, but may not do so until the appropriate city or county commission passes a 
resolution in support of the designation.  
 
The bill honors a fallen law enforcement officer by designating the “Deputy William J. Gentry Jr., Highway.”  
Under the bill, DOT must erect suitable markers for the road designation.  
 
The bill will have an insignificant negative fiscal impact to the State Transportation Trust Fund associated with 
erecting suitable markers for the road designation. The cost can be absorbed within DOT’s existing resources.  
 
The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2022.    STORAGE NAME: h0147.TIE 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 11/24/2021 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Present Situation 
 
 Transportation Facility Designations 
Under current law, the Legislature may designate a transportation facility, such as a bridge, 
interchange, or portion of a road, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular 
facility. Legislative designations do not change the official names of the designated facilities, and do not 
require local governments or private entities to change street signs, mailing addresses, or 911 
emergency telephone-number system listings to account for the designations.
1
 
 
Current law sets standards for the naming of state buildings and other facilities. The law provides that 
except as specifically provided by law, state buildings, roads, bridges, parks, recreational complexes, 
and other similar facilities may not be named for a living person.
2
 
 
Road Markers 
The Department of Transportation (DOT) must place a marker at each terminus or intersection of a 
designated road, bridge, or other transportation facility and erect other markers it deems appropriate for 
the facility.
3
 Road markers may not be erected until the appropriate city or county commission passes a 
resolution in support of a particular designation. Additionally, if a designated facility extends through 
multiple cities or counties, a resolution must be passed by each affected local government before the 
road markers can be erected by DOT.
4
 
 
Deputy William J. Gentry, Jr. 
Deputy William J. Gentry, Jr., served with the Highlands County Sherriff’s Office for 13 years in various 
capacities, including time on patrol, the K-9 Unit, the Special Investigations Unit, and as a field training 
deputy.
5
 On May 6, 2019, Deputy Gentry and the deputy he was training responded to an animal abuse 
call in Highlands County. Deputy Gentry attempted to make contact with the suspect, who opened fire 
on Deputy Gentry. At the age of 40, Deputy Gentry succumbed to his injuries on May 7, 2019.
6
  
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
The bill designates that portion of U.S. 98 between Haywood Taylor Boulevard and Lakeview 
Boulevard in Highlands County as “Deputy William J. Gentry, Jr., Highway.” The bill requires DOT to 
erect suitable markers for the road designation. 
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
 Section 1: Designates “Deputy Sheriff Donta Manuel and Deputy Sheriff Jonathan Wallace Highway.” 
 
Section 2: Provides an effective date of July 1, 2022. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
                                                
1
 S. 334.071(1), F.S. 
2
 S. 267.062(1), F.S. 
3
 S. 334.071(2), F.S. 
4
 S. 334.071(3), F.S. 
5
 Legacy.Com, William J Gentry, Jr., https://www.legacy.com/obituaries/name/william-gentry-jr-obituary?pid=188976004 
(last visited Nov. 22, 2021).  
6
 Officer Down Memorial Page, Deputy Sheriff William Jackson Gentry, Jr., https://www.odmp.org/officer/23672-deputy-
sheriff-william-jackson-gentry-jr (last visited Nov. 22, 2021).  STORAGE NAME: h0147.TIE 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 11/24/2021 
  
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
DOT estimates a cost of $1,040 for the appropriate markers, which provides for two signs at $520 
per sign.
7
 Therefore, the bill has an estimated negative fiscal impact of $1,040 to the State 
Transportation Trust Fund. This cost can be absorbed within existing DOT resources.  
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None. 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
Not applicable. This bill does not appear to affect county or municipal governments.  
 
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
The bill does not require or authorize rulemaking.  
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None. 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
Not applicable.  
 
                                                
7
 E-mail from Amanda Marsh, Legislative Programs Office, Department of Transportation, RE:FDOT Memorial Roadway 
Designation Sign Estimate (Sept. 15, 2021).