Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0147 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 01/26/2022

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0147b.ITA 
DATE: 1/26/2022 
 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: CS/HB 147    Transportation Facility Designations 
SPONSOR(S): Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee, Tuck 
TIED BILLS:    IDEN./SIM. BILLS:   
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee 16 Y, 0 N, As CS Walsh Keating 
2) Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations 
Subcommittee 
 	Davis Davis 
3) Commerce Committee    
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
Under current law, the Legislature may designate a transportation facility, such as a bridge, interchange, or 
portion of a road, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular facility. Legislative 
designations do not change the official names of the facilities. The Department of Transportation (DOT) erects 
markers for each designation, but may not do so until the appropriate city or county commission passes a 
resolution in support of the designation.  
 
The bill honors fallen law enforcement officers by designating “Deputy William J. Gentry Jr., Highway” and 
“Sergeant Eric John Twisdale Memorial Interchange.”  The bill directs DOT to erect suitable markers for the 
road designations.  
 
The bill will have an insignificant negative fiscal impact to the State Transportation Trust Fund associated with 
erecting suitable markers for the road designations. The cost can be absorbed within DOT’s existing 
resources.  
 
The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2022.    STORAGE NAME: h0147b.ITA 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 1/26/2022 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Present Situation 
 
 Transportation Facility Designations 
Under current law, the Legislature may designate a transportation facility, such as a bridge, 
interchange, or portion of a road, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular 
facility. Legislative designations do not change the official names of the designated facilities, and do not 
require local governments or private entities to change street signs, mailing addresses, or 911 
emergency telephone-number system listings to account for the designations.
1
 
 
Current law sets standards for the naming of state buildings and other facilities. The law provides that 
except as specifically provided by law, state buildings, roads, bridges, parks, recreational complexes, 
and other similar facilities may not be named for a living person.
2
 
 
Road Markers 
The Department of Transportation (DOT) must place a marker at each terminus or intersection of a 
designated road, bridge, or other transportation facility and erect other markers it deems appropriate for 
the facility.
3
 Road markers may not be erected until the appropriate city or county commission passes a 
resolution in support of a particular designation. Additionally, if a designated facility extends through 
multiple cities or counties, a resolution must be passed by each affected local government before the 
road markers can be erected by DOT.
4
 
 
Deputy William J. Gentry, Jr. 
Deputy William J. Gentry, Jr., served with the Highlands County Sherriff’s Office for 13 years in various 
capacities, including time on patrol, the K-9 Unit, the Special Investigations Unit, and as a field training 
deputy.
5
 On May 6, 2019, Deputy Gentry and the deputy he was training responded to an animal abuse 
call in Highlands County. Deputy Gentry attempted to make contact with the suspect, who opened fire 
on Deputy Gentry. On May 7, 2019, Deputy Gentry succumbed to his injuries at the age of 40.
6
  
 
Sergeant Eric John Twisdale 
Sergeant Eric John Twisdale served with the Clay County Sheriff’s Office in various capacities for 22 
years and previously served with the Jacksonville Sheriff’s Office.
7
 Sergeant Twisdale received the 
Sheriff’s Office’s Lifesaving Award in 2014 after he saved someone from drowning, and he was 
recognized as Deputy of the Year in 2015 for “displaying exceptional valor.”
8
 Sergeant Twisdale passed 
away on August 19, 2020, after contracting COVID-19 due to a presumed exposure at the Clay County 
Sheriff’s Office.
9
  
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
                                                
1
 S. 334.071(1), F.S. 
2
 S. 267.062(1), F.S. 
3
 S. 334.071(2), F.S. 
4
 S. 334.071(3), F.S. 
5
 Legacy.Com, William J Gentry, Jr., https://www.legacy.com/obituaries/name/william-gentry-jr-obituary?pid=188976004 
(last visited Nov. 22, 2021).  
6
 Officer Down Memorial Page, Deputy Sheriff William Jackson Gentry, Jr., https://www.odmp.org/officer/23672-deputy-
sheriff-william-jackson-gentry-jr (last visited Nov. 22, 2021). 
7
 Officer Down Memorial Page, Sergeant Eric John Twisdale, https://www.odmp.org/officer/24909-sergeant-eric-john-
twisdale (last visited Nov. 29, 2021).  
8
 Dan Scanlan, Remebered as ‘a cop’s cop,’ Clay County sergeant laid to rest after COVID-19 death, jacksonville.com 
(Sept. 24, 2020), https://www.jacksonville.com/story/news/crime/2020/09/24/sgt-eric-twisdale-remembered-cops-cop-
funeral/3515087001/ (last visited Nov. 29, 2021).  
9
 Officer Down Memorial Page, supra note 7.   STORAGE NAME: h0147b.ITA 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 1/26/2022 
  
Under the bill, that portion of U.S. 98 between Haywood Taylor Boulevard and Lakeview Boulevard in 
Highlands County is designated as “Deputy William J. Gentry, Jr., Highway.” The bill also designates 
the interchange at S.R. 23/First Coast Expressway and Henley Road in Clay County as “Sergeant Eric 
John Twisdale Memorial Interchange.” The bill requires DOT to erect suitable markers for the road 
designations. 
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Section 1: Designates “Deputy William J. Gentry Jr., Highway” and “Sergeant Eric John Twisdale 
Memorial Interchange.” 
 
Section 2: Provides an effective date of July 1, 2022. 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
DOT estimates a cost of $1,040 for the appropriate markers for each designation, which provides 
for two signs per designation at $520 per sign.  Therefore, the bill has an estimated negative fiscal 
impact of $2,080 to the State Transportation Trust Fund. This cost can be absorbed within existing 
DOT resources. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None. 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
Not applicable. This bill does not appear to affect county or municipal governments.  
 
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
The bill does not require or authorize rulemaking.  
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS:  STORAGE NAME: h0147b.ITA 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 1/26/2022 
  
None. 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
On December 2, 2021, the Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee adopted a strike-all 
amendment to the bill and reported the bill favorably as a committee substitute. The amendment added the 
designation of “Sergeant Eric John Twisdale Memorial Interchange” in Clay County and directs DOT to 
erect suitable markers.  
 
This analysis is drafted to the committee substitute as approved by the Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy 
Subcommittee.