Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0269 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/10/2022

                     
This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0269z.docx 
DATE: 3/10/2022 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 269    Natural Gas and Public Utility Petitions for Rate Relief 
SPONSOR(S): Byrd and others 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 350 
 
 
 
 
FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 113 Y’s 
 
3 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Pending 
 
 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
 
HB 269 passed the House on March 9, 2022, as SB 350. 
 
The bill increases the threshold under which investor-owned electric utilities (IOUs) are eligible to have a 
petition for rate relief considered by the Florida Public Service Commission (PSC) under informal procedures 
referred to as proposed agency action (PAA) procedures. Under current law, only IOUs with less than 500 
gigawatt hours (GWh) in annual electricity sales are eligible to request use of these PAA procedures for rate 
cases. No Florida IOU currently has annual sales below this threshold. The bill increases the annual sales 
threshold to 1,000 GWh, which will make one IOU, Florida Public Utilities Company (FPUC), eligible to request 
use of PAA procedures for a rate case. 
 
The bill may have an insignificant positive impact on state government expenditures. The bill will not impact 
state government revenues or local government revenues or expenditures. 
 
Subject to the Governor’s veto powers, the effective date of this bill is July 1, 2022.    
STORAGE NAME: h0269z.docx 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/10/2022 
  
I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION 
 
A. EFFECT OF CHANGES:  
 
Present Situation 
 
The Florida Public Service Commission (PSC) is an arm of the Legislature, created to oversee utility 
services to the people of Florida.
1
 Among its powers, the PSC has broad jurisdiction over the rates and 
service of investor-owned electric utilities (IOUs) in Florida.
2
 As required by law, the PSC sets base 
rates that are designed to allow each IOU to recover its legitimate costs of providing service,
3
 including 
a return on the IOU’s prudent capital investments.
4
 
 
Base rates are changed through “rate case” proceedings on an as-needed basis. When an IOU aims to 
change its base rates, it must petition the PSC and file documents that satisfy the minimum filing 
requirements (MFRs) established by the PSC for a rate case.
5
 A formal hearing process ensues, 
including a discovery process, an evidentiary hearing, customer service hearings, and post-hearing 
brief submissions. The PSC must take final action and issue its final order on the IOU’s petition within 
twelve months of the IOU’s completed MFR filing,
6
 though the PSC typically takes final action and 
issues its final order within eight months. This rate case process is typically resource intensive. 
Because an IOU’s rate case expenses are considered a legitimate cost of providing service, these 
expenses are recovered through customer rates. 
 
Under current law, an IOU with less than 500 gigawatt hours (GWh) in annual sales may request that 
its rate case be handled by the PSC under informal procedures referred to as proposed agency action 
(PAA) procedures. PAA procedures require less time and resources than the formal hearing process. 
Under PAA procedures, the IOU still must file documents that satisfy the MFRs, and customer service 
hearings are still held in the IOU’s service territory. PSC staff may request data from the IOU, and the 
Office of Public Counsel
7
 may appear as a party in the case and conduct discovery. Discovery from 
third parties is not permitted under PAA procedures. After the PSC hears input from its staff, the IOU, 
and any other interested persons, it votes on the IOU’s rate request and memorializes its vote in writing 
as a PAA order. The order must be issued within five months of the IOU’s completed filing of the 
MFRs.
8
 Any person whose substantial interests are affected by the PAA order may protest the order 
and initiate the formal hearing process with respect to the specific matters protested. If no such protest 
is filed, the order shall be entered and become final agency action, subject only to appeal.
9
 
 
At present, no IOU has annual sales below the 500 GWh threshold. When the threshold was enacted, 
Florida Public Utilities Company (FPUC), an IOU, operated two separate divisions, one in Marianna 
and one in Fernandina Beach. Each division was regulated as a separate entity for the purpose of 
setting rates. In 2004, the PSC approved a rate settlement agreement consolidating the rates and 
charges of the two divisions into one entity. From the time that the 500 GWh threshold was enacted 
                                                
1
 S. 350.001, F.S. 
2
 See, e.g., ss. 366.01, 366.04(1), 366.041, 366.05(1), and 366.06, F.S. There are four IOUs in Florida: Florida Power & 
Light Company, Duke Energy Florida, Tampa Electric Company, and Florida Public Utilities Company. The former Gulf 
Power Company merged into Florida Power & Light Company as of January 1, 2021. 
3
 Base rates make up just one component of an IOU’s rates. Other mechanisms are established by statute or PSC rule or 
order to allow IOUs to recover specific types of costs not included in base rates, such as fuel costs and certain 
environmental compliance costs. 
4
 Ss. 366.041(1) and 366.06(1), F.S. 
5
 See Rr. 25-6.043 and 25-6.140, F.A.C. 
6
 S. 366.06(3), F.S. 
7
 See S. 350.0611, F.S. (tasking the Office of the Public Counsel with providing legal representation for the general public 
of Florida in proceedings before the PSC and in other utility related matters). 
8
 See S. 366.06(4), F.S. 
9
 See Order Nos. PSC-08-0436-PAA-GU (PAA Order) and PSC-08-0849-CO-GU (Consummating Order), issued July 8 
and August 1, 2008, in Docket No. 20070592-GU, In re: Petition for rate increase by St. Joe Natural Gas Company, Inc.   
STORAGE NAME: h0269z.docx 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/10/2022 
  
until FPUC’s consolidation in 2004, the two independent divisions of FPUC were the only IOUs eligible 
to request use of PAA procedures for rate cases. After the consolidation, FPUC’s annual sales 
surpassed the 500 GWh threshold, and it became ineligible to request use of PAA procedures for its 
rate cases.
10
 
 
As shown in the following table, FPUC’s annual electricity sales are substantially less than any other 
IOU within the state: 
 
2020 Florida IOU Electricity Sales 
IOU 	Sales (GWh) 
Florida Power & Light 	113,531 
Duke Energy Florida 	39,230 
Tampa Electric 	19,954 
Gulf Power 	10,635 
FPUC 	650 
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
The bill increases the eligibility threshold under which an IOU may request that its rate case be handled 
informally through PAA procedures, from 500 GWh to 1,000 GWh. Under this change, Florida Public 
Utilities Company (FPUC) would regain its eligibility to use the PAA procedures. 
 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
  
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
The bill will likely have an insignificant positive fiscal impact on PSC expenditures due to potential 
cost savings realized by utilizing a proposed agency action (PAA) procedure, which is a more 
expedited disposition of a petition for rate relief, instead of a lengthy direct-to-hearing rate case that 
requires more time and staffing resources.
11
 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
 
                                                
10
 Email from Kaley Slattery, Legislative Director, Florida Public Service Commission, RE: Recorded year that FPUC 
exceeded 500 GWh in annual sales (Oct. 27, 2021). 
11
 Florida Public Service Commission, Agency Analysis of 2022 House Bill 269, pg. 3 (Oct. 21, 2021).    
STORAGE NAME: h0269z.docx 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 3/10/2022 
  
To the extent that FPUC is able to reduce its rate case expenses through the use of PAA procedures, 
these savings will be passed along to its ratepayers.  The bill could also offer potential benefits to 
newly-qualifying utilities resulting from a PAA instead of a direct-to-hearing rate case.
12
 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
 
None. 
 
 
 
 
                                                
12
 Id.