This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. STORAGE NAME: h0317z.GOS.DOCX DATE: 3/15/2022 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS BILL #: CS/HB 317 Substitution of Work Experience for Postsecondary Educational Requirements SPONSOR(S): State Affairs Committee; DiCeglie, Buchanan, and others TIED BILLS: IDEN./SIM. BILLS: CS/CS/SB 514 FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 112 Y’s 0 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Pending SUMMARY ANALYSIS CS/HB 317 passed the House on March 4, 2022, as CS/CS/SB 514. State agencies must make hiring decisions without regard to age, sex, color, religion, national origin, political affiliation, marital status, or disability. Hiring decisions are determined based on an assessment of the specific knowledge, skills, and abilities (KSAs) necessary for the successful performance of the position’s duties. Candidates must also have any required licenses, certifications, or registrations. The final employment selection decision is the sole responsibility of the employing agency. Agencies must document the qualifications of the selected candidate to ensure the candidate meets the minimum requirements specified by the employing agency, any licensure, certification, or registration requirements, and possess the requisite KSAs for the position. The bill allows an employing agency of the state or its political subdivisions to substitute verifiable, related work experience for postsecondary educational requirements for employment positions if the candidate is otherwise qualified for the position. Work experience may not be substituted for any required licensure, certification, or registration. If the employing agency elects to substitute related work experience for postsecondary educational requirements, the employing agency must include in all advertisements for the position a notice that such substitution is authorized. The advertisements must also describe the related work experience equivalencies that may be substituted for postsecondary educational requirements. The bill does not appear to have a fiscal impact on state or local governments. Subject to the Governor’s veto powers, the effective date of this bill is July 1, 2022. STORAGE NAME: h0317z.GOS.DOCX PAGE: 2 DATE: 3/15/2022 I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION A. EFFECT OF CHANGES: Background State Employment Policy According to the employment policy of the state, conditions of employment in state government must be made without regard to age, sex, color, religion, national origin, political affiliation, marital status, or disability. 1 The state and its political subdivisions must comply with the Americans with Disabilities Act, 2 Equal Employment Opportunity Act, 3 Florida Civil Rights Act, 4 and Fair Labor Standards Act. 5 In addition, the state and its political subdivisions must give preference to veterans for positions of employment. 6 State Hiring Process The State of Florida’s employment process is decentralized, so each state agency is responsible for its recruitment, selection, and hiring decisions. 7 However, recruitment of candidates for employment must be done in a manner that assures open competition, while placing special emphasis on efforts to attract minorities, women, or other groups that are underrepresented in the workforce of the employing agency. 8 Selection of candidates for employment is based on an assessment of the specific knowledge, skills, and abilities (KSAs) necessary for the successful performance of the position’s duties. 9 After assembling a pool of candidates, an agency’s hiring official compares candidates’ education, experience, and any necessary license or certification requirements. 10 Candidates who appear to possess the required KSAs and any required licensure or certifications will proceed further in the selection process. 11 The hiring official then determines the candidates who will be asked to participate in additional selection procedures, such as oral interviews or work sample exercises. 12 The job-related information gained during the selection process assists the hiring official in making the final selection decision. The final selection decision is the sole responsibility of the employing agency. 13 Agencies must document the qualifications of the selected candidate to ensure the candidate meets the minimum requirements specified by the employing agency, any licensure, certification, or registration requirements, and possesses the requisite KSAs for the position. 14 1 Section 110.105(2)(a), F.S. 2 U.S. Department of Labor, Employers' Responsibilities, Americans with Disabilities Act, https://www.dol.gov/general/topic/disability/employersresponsibilities (last visited Jan. 18, 2022). 3 U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Overview, https://www.eeoc.gov/overview#:~:text=The%20U.S.%20Equal%20Employment%20Opportunity,national%20origin%2C%20age%2 0(40%20or (last visited Jan. 18, 2022). 4 Section 760.02(7), F.S. 5 U.S. Department of Labor, Wages and the Fair Labor Standards Act, https://www.dol.gov/agencies/whd/flsa (last visited Jan. 18, 2022). 6 Section 296.07, F.S. 7 Job Candidate Program Manual, Division of Human Resource Management, Department of Management Services, available at https://www.dms.myflorida.com/content/download/99277/573474/Job_Candidate_Program_Manual_Final_3-21-17.pdf (last visited Nov. 22, 2021). 8 Section 110.211, F.S. 9 State of Florida Employee Handbook, Department of Management Services, available at https://www.dms.myflorida.com/workforce_operations/human_resource_management/for_state_personnel_system_hr_practitioners/e mployment_policies_and_programs#EPP_EmpHndbk (last visited Nov. 22, 2021). 10 Id. 11 Id. 12 Id. 13 Section 110.211(1), F.S. 14 Section 110.213(2), F.S. STORAGE NAME: h0317z.GOS.DOCX PAGE: 3 DATE: 3/15/2022 Effect of the Bill Beginning July 1, 2022, the bill allows the head of an employing agency 15 to substitute verifiable, related work experience for postsecondary educational requirements for an employment position if the candidate is otherwise qualified for the position. Work experience may not be substituted for any required licensure, certification, or registration. If the head of an employing agency elects to substitute related work experience for postsecondary educational requirements, the employing agency must include a notice that such substitution is authorized in all of the position’s advertisements. The advertisements must also describe the related work experience equivalencies that may be substituted for postsecondary educational requirements. II. FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 1. Revenues: None. 2. Expenditures: None. B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 1. Revenues: None. 2. Expenditures: None. C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: None. D. FISCAL COMMENTS: None. 15 The bill defines “employing agency” to mean any agency or unit of government of the state or any county, city, municipality, or political subdivision thereof, including special districts, that is authorized to employ personnel to carry out the responsibilities of the agency or unit of government.