Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0455 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/15/2022

                     
This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0455z.LAV.docx 
DATE: 3/15/2022 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: CS/HB 455    Rupert J Smith Law Library, St. Lucie County 
SPONSOR(S): Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Trabulsy 
TIED BILLS:    IDEN./SIM. BILLS:   
 
 
 
 
FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 117 Y’s 
 
0 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Pending 
 
 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
CS/HB 455 passed the House on February 10, 2022, and subsequently passed the Senate on March 10, 2022. 
 
The Rupert J. Smith Law Library of St. Lucie County is an independent special district governed by a five-
member Board of Trustees, currently composed of one Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Judge, one member of the 
Board of County Commissioners of St. Lucie County, two active practicing attorneys who reside in St. Lucie 
County, and one lay member. The Board has full power and authority to establish, operate, and maintain law 
libraries within St. Lucie County.  
 
This bill adds an additional lay member to the Board of Trustees to be appointed by the other members of the 
Board. Additionally, the bill expands the residential boundaries within which the two active practicing attorney 
Board members may reside. Lastly, the bill updates the appointment power of the Saint Lucie County Bar 
Association, granting the Association the power to appoint both of the active practicing attorney Board 
members.  
 
According to the Economic Impact Statement, the bill will have no fiscal impact. 
 
Subject to the Governor’s veto powers, the effective date of this bill is upon becoming a law. 
    
STORAGE NAME: h0455z.LAV.docx 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/15/2022 
  
I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION 
 
A. EFFECT OF CHANGES:  
 
Present Situation 
 
Independent Special Districts 
 
A "special district" is a unit of local government created for a particular purpose, with jurisdiction to 
operate within a limited geographic boundary.
1
 Special districts are created by general law, special act, 
local ordinance, or rule of the Governor and Cabinet.
2
 A special district has only those powers 
expressly provided by, or reasonably implied from, the authority provided in the district’s charter. 
Special districts provide specific municipal services in addition to, or in place of, those provided by a 
municipality or county.
3
  
 
A “dependent special district” is a special district subject to control by the governing body of a single 
county or municipality.
4
 An “independent special district” is any district that is not a dependent special 
district.
5
 
 
Special districts do not possess “home rule” powers and may impose only those taxes, assessments, or 
fees authorized by special or general law. The special act creating an independent special district may 
provide for funding from a variety of sources while prohibiting others. For example, ad valorem tax 
authority is not mandatory for a special district.
6
 
 
Rupert J. Smith Law Library of St. Lucie County 
 
The Rupert J. Smith Law Library of St. Lucie County (Law Library) is an independent special district 
originally created by a special act of the Legislature in 1957.
7
 The district is governed by a Board of 
Trustees (Board) comprised of one Circuit Judge residing in St. Lucie County, who is appointed by the 
Chief Judge of the Nineteenth Judicial Circuit; one member of the Board of County Commissioners of 
St. Lucie County (BOCC), chosen by the BOCC biennially; two active practicing attorneys residing in 
St. Lucie County, one to be appointed by the President of the Saint Lucie County Bar Association and 
one appointed by the President of the Port Saint Lucie Bar Association, each for a term of one year 
beginning on the first Tuesday after the first Monday in January of each year; and one lay member 
appointed by the President of the Friends of Saint Lucie County Library Association.
8
 
 
The Board establishes, operates, and maintains law library facilities within St. Lucie County. The Board 
has the authority and power to “prescribe rules and regulations as to its own functions and organization; 
                                                
1
 See Halifax Hospital Medical Center v. State of Fla., et al., 278 So. 3d 545, 547 (Fla. 2019). 
2
 See ss. 189.02(1), 189.031(3), and. 190.005(1), F.S. See generally s. 189.012(6), F.S. 
3
 Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, The Local Gov’t Formation Manual 2020 – 2022, pp. 60-61, 
https://myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Documents/loaddoc.aspx?PublicationType=Committees&CommitteeId=3117&Sessio
n=2021&DocumentType=General+Publications&FileName=2021 -2022+Local+Government+Formation+Manual.pdf (last 
accessed Nov. 12, 2021). 
4
 S. 189.012(2), F.S. Types of such control include the county or municipality governing body acting as the district 
governing body, having the authority to appoint or remove at will district board members, or having final approval authority 
over the district’s budget. 
5
 S. 189.012(3), F.S. 
6
 Art. VII, s. 9(a), Fla. Const.  
7
 Ch. 57-1790, Laws of Fla. The special acts comprising the charter of the district were codified, reeneacted, and repealed 
as part of the recodification of the charter in 2001. See ch. 2001-326, s. 2, Laws of Fla. 
8
 The district’s original charter created a three-member Board comprised of the Circuit Judge, a member of the BOCC, 
and one active practicing attorney. Ch. 57-1790, s. 3, Laws of Fla. In 2006, the charter was amended to add a second 
active practicing attorney and the lay board member. Ch. 2006-336, s. 1, Laws of Fla.   
STORAGE NAME: h0455z.LAV.docx 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/15/2022 
  
and to prescribe and enforce rules and regulations as to the use, maintenance, and operation of said 
law library. Said Board of Trustees shall purchase books, furniture, equipment, and supplies.”
9
 
 
The district is funded through fees collected by the Clerk of the Circuit Court of St. Lucie County. 
Additionally, the BOCC is authorized to appropriate funds to the Board for the use of the Law Library.
10
 
 
Effect of Proposed Changes 
 
The bill adds one additional lay member to the Board of Trustees who must be appointed by the 
members of the Board. The bill expands the boundaries within which the two active practicing attorney 
members of the Board may reside from St. Lucie County to the entire Nineteenth Judicial Circuit.
11
 
Finally, the bill updates the appointment powers of the Saint Lucie County Bar Association, authorizing 
the Association to appoint both of the active practicing attorney Board members, and removes the 
appointment power of the President of the Port Saint Lucie Bar Association. 
 
According to the Economic Impact Statement, the bill will have no fiscal impact. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
None. 
 
C. ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT FILED?     Yes [X]     No [] 
 
D. NOTICE PUBLISHED?     Yes [X]     No [] 
 
IF YES, WHEN? September 1-3, 2021 
 
WHERE?  The St. Lucie News-Tribune, a daily newspaper published at Fort Pierce in St.  
 Lucie County, Florida, in Citrus County, Florida. 
 
E. REFERENDUM(S) REQUIRED?     Yes []     No [X] 
 
                                                
9
 Ch. 2001-326, s. 3, Laws of Fla. 
10
 Id. 
11
 The Nineteenth Judicial Circuit encompasses Indian River, Martin, Okeechobee, and St. Lucie Counties. S. 26.021(19), 
F.S.   
STORAGE NAME: h0455z.LAV.docx 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 3/15/2022 
  
IF YES, WHEN?