Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0593 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/02/2022

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0593a.PPH 
DATE: 2/2/2022 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 593    Telecommunicator Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation 
SPONSOR(S): Trabulsy 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 890 
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Professions & Public Health Subcommittee 17 Y, 0 N Guzzo McElroy 
2) Health & Human Services Committee   
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
A heart attack occurs when the flow of oxygen-rich blood to a section of heart muscle suddenly becomes 
blocked. If blood flow is not restored quickly, the section of heart muscle begins to die. Heart attack treatment 
is most effective if provided when symptoms first occur. Emergency assistance to a person having a heart 
attack is usually provided by emergency medical technicians (EMTs), paramedics, or a bystander who 
attempts to administer cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR). 
 
The Department of Health (DOH) is responsible for certifying 911 public safety telecommunicators (911 PSTs). 
To become certified as a 911 PST an applicant is required to receive 232 hours of training, which must include 
successful completion of a CPR certification class. A 911 PST must renew their certification every two years 
and must receive 20 hours of continuing education prior to renewal. Current law does not require the 20-hours 
of continuing education to include CPR training. Current law also does not require 911 PSTs to complete 
biennial telecommunicator CPR training. 
 
The bill requires a 911 PST to complete biennial telecommunicator CPR training in order to have their 
certification renewed. 
 
The bill also authorizes certain public safety agencies to enter into a reciprocal agreement with another public 
safety agency to provide telephonic assistance in administering CPR, including a fire department, law 
enforcement department, or other emergency medical service that receives or dispatches calls for emergency 
medical conditions. 
 
The bill has no fiscal impact on state or local government. 
 
The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2022.   STORAGE NAME: h0593a.PPH 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 2/2/2022 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Background 
 
Heart Attacks 
 
A heart attack occurs when the flow of oxygen-rich blood to a section of heart muscle suddenly 
becomes blocked.
1
 If blood flow is not restored quickly, the section of heart muscle begins to die. Heart 
attacks most often occur as a result of ischemic heart disease – also known as coronary heart disease 
or coronary artery disease, which is caused by plaque build-up inside the coronary arteries. Eventually, 
an area of plaque can rupture inside of an artery causing a blood clot to form on the plaque’s surface. If 
the blood clot becomes large enough, it can mostly or completely block blood flow through a coronary 
artery. If the blockage isn’t treated quickly, the portion of heart muscle fed by the artery begins to die. 
Heart attack treatment is most effective if provided when symptoms first occur.
2
 
 
 911 Public Safety Telecommunicators 
 
Out-of-hospital cardiac arrest describes the sudden, unexpected loss of heart function, breathing, and 
consciousness.
 3
 Every year an estimated 350,000 people have cardiac arrest in the United States in 
an out-of-hospital environment and only one out of 10 victims survive.
4
 911 public safety 
telecommunicators
5
 (911 PSTs) along with the 911-caller are often the first responders and it is the 911 
PST’s job to transform the caller into a lay rescuer by instructing them how to perform cardiopulmonary 
resuscitation (CPR).
6
 This is known as telephone CPR.
7
 Studies have shown the efficacy of telephone 
CPR in increasing the survival rate of sudden cardiac arrest.
8
 
 
The Department of Health (DOH) is responsible for certifying 911 PSTs.
9
 Certification as a 911 PST is 
required for any person employed as a 911 PST at a public safety answering point—the public safety 
agency that receives incoming 911 requests for assistance and dispatches appropriate public safety 
agencies to respond to the requests.
10
 A public safety agency
11
 may employ a 911 PST for up to 12 
months if the trainee works under the direct supervision of a certified 911 public safety 
telecommunicator and is enrolled in a 911 PST training program.
12
  
 
DOH is responsible for approving 911 PST training programs, which must be equivalent to the public 
safety telecommunication program curriculum framework developed by the Department of Education 
                                                
1
 U.S. Department of Health & Human Services, National Heart, Lung, and Blood Institute, Heart Attack, available at 
https://www.nhlbi.nih.gov/health-topics/heart-attack (last visited Jan 26. 20, 2022). 
2
 Id.  
3
 Michael Christopher, Telecommunicator Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation – A Policy Statement from the American Heart Association, 
AHA Journals, Mar. 24, 2020, available at https://www.ahajournals.org/doi/10.1161/CIR.0000000000000744 (last visited Jan. 26, 2022). 
4
 Id.  
5
 A 911 PST is a public safety dispatcher or 911 operator whose duties and responsibilities include the answering, receiving, 
transferring, and dispatching functions related to 911 calls; dispatching law enforcement officers, fire rescue services, emergency 
medical services, and other public safety services to the scene of an emergency; providing real-time information from federal, state, and 
local crime databases; or supervising or serving as the command officer to a person or persons having such duties and responsibilities.  
6
 Rea TD, Eisenberg MS, Culley LL, Becker L. Dispatcher-assisted cardiopulmonary resuscitation and survival in cardiac arrest. 
Circulation. 2001 Nov 20;104(21):2513-6. doi: 10.1161/hc4601.099468. PMID: 11714643. 
7
 Id. 
8
 Id., see also Eisenberg MS, Hallstrom AP, Carter WB, Cummins RO, Bergner L, Pierce J. Emergency CPR instruction via telephone. 
Am J Public Health. 1985 Jan;75(1):47-50. doi: 10.2105/ajph.75.1.47. PMID: 3966598; PMCID: PMC1646147.  
9
 Section 401.465(2), F.S. 
10
 Section 401.465(2)(a), F.S. 
11
 Public safety agency means a functional division of a public agency which provides firefighting, law enforcement, medical, or other 
emergency services. 
12
 Section 401.465(2)(b), F.S.  STORAGE NAME: h0593a.PPH 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 2/2/2022 
  
(DOE) and consist of at least 232 hours.
13
 The curriculum framework developed by DOE requires 
students to successfully complete a CPR certification class.
14
 
 
A 911 PST must renew their certification every two years and must receive 20 hours of continuing 
education prior to renewal, which does not currently include CPR training.
15
 Current law also does not 
require 911 PSTs to complete biennial telecommunicator CPR training. 
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
The bill requires a 911 PST to complete biennial telecommunicator CPR training in order to have their 
certification renewed.  
 
The bill also authorizes certain public safety agencies to enter into a reciprocal agreement with another 
public safety agency to provide telephonic assistance in administering CPR, including a fire 
department, law enforcement department, or other emergency medical service that receives or 
dispatches calls for emergency medical conditions. 
 
The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2022. 
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Section 1: Amends s. 401.465, F.S., relating to 911 public safety telecommunicator certification. 
Section 2: Provides an effective date of July 1, 2022.  
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None.  
 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
                                                
13
 Section 401.465(1)(c), F.S. 
14
 Florida Department of Education Curriculum Framework, p. 13 (Jun. 8, 2010), incorporated by reference in rule 64J-3.002, F.A.C., 
available at  https://www.flrules.org/Gateway/reference.asp?No=Ref-01490 (last visited Jan. 26, 2022). 
15
 Rule 64J-3.003, F.A.C.  STORAGE NAME: h0593a.PPH 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 2/2/2022 
  
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
Not applicable. The bill does not appear to affect county or municipal governments.  
 
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
DOH has sufficient rule-making authority to implement the provisions of the bill. 
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None. 
 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES