This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. STORAGE NAME: h0661a.TIE DATE: 1/13/2022 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS BILL #: HB 661 Transportation Facility Designations SPONSOR(S): Valdés TIED BILLS: IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 650 REFERENCE ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 1) Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee 15 Y, 0 N Walsh Keating 2) Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee 3) Commerce Committee SUMMARY ANALYSIS Under current law, the Legislature may designate a transportation facility, such as a bridge, interchange, or portion of a road, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular facility. Legislative designations do not change the official names of the facilities. The Department of Transportation (DOT) erects markers for each designation, but may not do so until the appropriate city or county commission passes a resolution in support of the designation. The bill honors Virginia Creighton by designating “Virginia Creighton Bridge” in Hillsborough County. The bill will have an insignificant negative fiscal impact to the State Transportation Trust Fund associated with erecting suitable markers for the designation. The cost can be absorbed within DOT’s existing resources. The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2022. STORAGE NAME: h0661a.TIE PAGE: 2 DATE: 1/13/2022 FULL ANALYSIS I. SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: Present Situation Transportation Facility Designations Under current law, the Legislature may designate a transportation facility, such as a bridge, interchange, or portion of a road, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular facility. Legislative designations do not change the official names of the designated facilities, and do not require local governments or private entities to change street signs, mailing addresses, or 911 emergency telephone-number system listings to account for the designations. 1 Current law sets standards for the naming of state buildings and other facilities. The law provides that except as specifically provided by law, state buildings, roads, bridges, parks, recreational complexes, and other similar facilities may not be named for a living person. 2 Road Markers The Department of Transportation (DOT) must place a marker at each terminus or intersection of a designated road, bridge, or other transportation facility and erect other markers it deems appropriate for the facility. 3 Road markers may not be erected until the appropriate city or county commission passes a resolution in support of a particular designation. Additionally, if a designated facility extends through multiple cities or counties, a resolution must be passed by each affected local government before the road markers can be erected by DOT. 4 Virginia Creighton Virginia (Ginger) Creighton worked in the field of wetland science and was key to developing the Courtney Campbell Causeway – Old Tampa Bay Water Quality Improvement Project that provided environmental credit for other DOT projects in the Tampa Bay Area. 5 Ms. Creighton passed away on May 29, 2020. 6 Effect of the Bill Under the bill, bridge number 100850 on S.R. 60/Courtney Campbell Causeway over Old Tampa Bay in Hillsborough County is designated as “Virginia Creighton Bridge.” The bill requires DOT to erect suitable markers. B. SECTION DIRECTORY: Section 1: Designates “Virginia Creighton Bridge.” Section 2: Provides an effective date of July 1, 2022. II. FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 1. Revenues: 1 S. 334.071(1), F.S. 2 S. 267.062(1), F.S. 3 S. 334.071(2), F.S. 4 S. 334.071(3), F.S. 5 Virginia (Ginger) Creighton Death Notice from the Florida Department of Transportation. 6 Virginia A. “Ginger” Creighton, Legacy.com, https://www.legacy.com/us/obituaries/staugustine/name/virginia-creighton- obituary?id=8236801 (last visited Jan. 5, 2022). STORAGE NAME: h0661a.TIE PAGE: 3 DATE: 1/13/2022 None. 2. Expenditures: DOT estimates a cost of $1,040 for the appropriate markers, which provides for two signs per designation at $520 per sign. 7 Therefore, the bill has an estimated negative fiscal impact of $1,040 to the State Transportation Trust Fund. This cost can be absorbed within existing DOT resources. B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 1. Revenues: None. 2. Expenditures: None. C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: None. D. FISCAL COMMENTS: None. III. COMMENTS A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: Not applicable. This bill does not appear to affect county or municipal governments. 2. Other: None. B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: The bill does not require or authorize rulemaking. C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: None. IV. AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES Not applicable. 7 Email from Amanda Marsh, Legislative Analyst, Florida Department of Transportation, FDOT Memorial Roadway Designation Sign Estimate, (Sep. 15, 2021).