Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0661 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 01/27/2022

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0661c.ITA 
DATE: 1/27/2022 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 661    Transportation Facility Designations 
SPONSOR(S): Valdés 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 650 
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee 15 Y, 0 N Walsh Keating 
2) Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations 
Subcommittee 
13 Y, 0 N Davis Davis 
3) Commerce Committee    
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
hUnder current law, the Legislature may designate a transportation facility, such as a bridge, interchange, or 
portion of a road, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular facility. Legislative 
designations do not change the official names of the facilities. The Department of Transportation (DOT) erects 
markers for each designation, but may not do so until the appropriate city or county commission passes a 
resolution in support of the designation.  
 
The bill honors Virginia Creighton by designating “Virginia Creighton Bridge” in Hillsborough County.  The bill 
directs DOT to erect suitable markers for the road designation.  
 
The bill will have an insignificant negative fiscal impact to the State Transportation Trust Fund associated with 
erecting suitable markers for the designation. The cost can be absorbed within DOT’s existing resources.  
 
The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2022. 
   STORAGE NAME: h0661c.ITA 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 1/27/2022 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Present Situation 
 
 Transportation Facility Designations 
Under current law, the Legislature may designate a transportation facility, such as a bridge, 
interchange, or portion of a road, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular 
facility. Legislative designations do not change the official names of the designated facilities, and do not 
require local governments or private entities to change street signs, mailing addresses, or 911 
emergency telephone-number system listings to account for the designations.
1
 
 
Current law sets standards for the naming of state buildings and other facilities. The law provides that 
except as specifically provided by law, state buildings, roads, bridges, parks, recreational complexes, 
and other similar facilities may not be named for a living person.
2
 
 
Road Markers 
The Department of Transportation (DOT) must place a marker at each terminus or intersection of a 
designated road, bridge, or other transportation facility and erect other markers it deems appropriate for 
the facility.
3
 Road markers may not be erected until the appropriate city or county commission passes a 
resolution in support of a particular designation. Additionally, if a designated facility extends through 
multiple cities or counties, a resolution must be passed by each affected local government before the 
road markers can be erected by DOT.
4
 
 
Virginia Creighton 
Virginia (Ginger) Creighton worked in the field of wetland science and was key to developing the  
Courtney Campbell Causeway – Old Tampa Bay Water Quality Improvement Project that provided  
environmental credit for other DOT projects in the Tampa Bay Area.
5
 Ms. Creighton passed away on  
May 29, 2020.
6
 
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
Under the bill, bridge number 100850 on S.R. 60/Courtney Campbell Causeway over Old Tampa Bay 
in Hillsborough County is designated as “Virginia Creighton Bridge.” The bill requires DOT to erect 
suitable markers.  
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Section 1: Designates “Virginia Creighton Bridge.”  
 
Section 2: Provides an effective date of July 1, 2022. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
                                                
1
 S. 334.071(1), F.S. 
2
 S. 267.062(1), F.S. 
3
 S. 334.071(2), F.S. 
4
 S. 334.071(3), F.S. 
5
 Virginia (Ginger) Creighton Death Notice from the Florida Department of Transportation.  
6
 Virginia A. “Ginger” Creighton, Legacy.com, https://www.legacy.com/us/obituaries/staugustine/name/virginia-creighton-
obituary?id=8236801 (last visited Jan. 5, 2022).   STORAGE NAME: h0661c.ITA 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 1/27/2022 
  
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
DOT estimates a cost of $1,040 for the appropriate markers, which provides for two signs per 
designation at $520 per sign.
7
 Therefore, the bill has an estimated negative fiscal impact of $1,040 
to the State Transportation Trust Fund. This cost can be absorbed within existing DOT resources. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVE RNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None.  
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None.  
 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
Not applicable. This bill does not appear to affect county or municipal governments.  
 
 2. Other: 
None.  
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
The bill does not require or authorize rulemaking.  
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None.  
 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
Not applicable.  
 
                                                
7
 Email from Amanda Marsh, Legislative Analyst, Florida Department of Transportation, FDOT Memorial Roadway 
Designation Sign Estimate, (Sep. 15, 2021).