Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1443 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/15/2022

                       
 
CS/HB 1443  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1443-01-c1 
Page 1 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to dependent eligibility verification 2 
services; amending s. 110.12301, F.S.; requiring the 3 
Department of Management Services, rather than the 4 
Division of State Group Insurance, to directly provide 5 
or contract for certain services; removing 6 
requirements for such contract; removing obsolete 7 
language; revising the retention requirements for 8 
certain documentation; providing an effective date. 9 
 10 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 11 
 12 
 Section 1.  Subsection (2) of section 110.12301, Florida 13 
Statutes, is amended to read: 14 
 110.12301  Competitive procurement of postpayment claims 15 
review services; and dependent eligibility verific ation 16 
services; public records exemption. — 17 
 (2)  The department may directly provide or Division of 18 
State Group Insurance is directed to competitively procure a 19 
contract for dependent eligibility verification services for the 20 
state group insurance program ; however, compensation under the 21 
contract may not exceed historical claim costs for the prior 12 22 
months for the dependent populations disenrolled as a result of 23 
the contractor's services . 24 
 (a)1.  By September 1, 2017, the division shall notify all 25     
 
CS/HB 1443  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1443-01-c1 
Page 2 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
subscribers regarding the eligibility rules for dependents. 26 
Through November 30, 2017, the division must hold subscribers 27 
harmless for past claims of ineligible dependents if such 28 
dependents are removed from plan membership before December 1, 29 
2017. 30 
 2.  Subparagraph 1. does not apply to any dependent 31 
identified as ineligible before July 1, 2017, for which the 32 
department has notified the state agency employing the 33 
associated subscriber. 34 
 (a)(b) The contractor providing dependent eligibility 35 
verification services ma y request the following information from 36 
Subscribers must provide all of the following information to the 37 
department or the contractor providing dependent eligibility 38 
verification services : 39 
 1.  To prove a spouse's eligibility: 40 
 a.  If married fewer less than 12 months and the subscriber 41 
and his or her spouse have not filed a joint federal income tax 42 
return, a government -issued marriage certificate; or 43 
 b.  If married for 12 or more months, a transcript of the 44 
most recently filed federal income tax return. 45 
 2.  To prove a biological child's or a newborn grandchild's 46 
eligibility, a government -issued birth certificate. 47 
 3.  To prove an adopted child's eligibility: 48 
 a.  An adoption certificate; or 49 
 b.  An adoption placement agreement and a petition for 50     
 
CS/HB 1443  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1443-01-c1 
Page 3 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
adoption. 51 
 4.  To prove a stepchild's eligibility: 52 
 a.  A government-issued birth certificate for the 53 
stepchild; and 54 
 b.  The transcript of the subscriber's most recently filed 55 
federal income tax return. 56 
 5.  Any other information necessary to verify the 57 
dependent's eligibility for enrollment in the state group 58 
insurance program. 59 
 (b)(c) If a document requested from a subscriber is not 60 
confidential or exempt from public records requirements, the 61 
division and the contractor shall disclose to all subscribers 62 
that such information submitted to verify the eligibility of 63 
dependents may be subject to disclosure and inspection under 64 
chapter 119. 65 
 (c)(d) A government-issued marriage license or marriage 66 
certificate submitted for dependent eligibility verification 67 
must include the date of the marriage between the subscriber and 68 
the spouse. 69 
 (d)(e) A government-issued birth certificate submitted for 70 
dependent eligibility verification must list the parents' names. 71 
 (e)(f) Foreign-born subscribers unable to obtain the 72 
necessary documentation within the specified time period of 73 
producing verification documentation may execute a signed 74 
affidavit attesting to eligibility requirements. 75     
 
CS/HB 1443  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1443-01-c1 
Page 4 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
 (f)(g) Documentation submitted to verify eligibility may 76 
be an original or a photocopy of an original document. Before 77 
submitting a document, the subscriber may redact any information 78 
on a document which is not necessary to verify the eligibility 79 
of the dependent. 80 
 (g)(h) All documentation obtained by the contractor to 81 
conduct the dependen t eligibility verification services must be 82 
retained in accordance with the applicable records retention 83 
schedule until June 30, 2019. The department or the contractor 84 
is not required to retain such documentation after June 30, 85 
2019, and shall destroy such documentation as soon as 86 
practicable after such date. 87 
 Section 2.  This act shall take effect July 1, 2022. 88