Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1443 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/24/2022

                       
 
CS/CS/HB 1443  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1443-02-c2 
Page 1 of 6 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to a review under the Open Government 2 
Sunset Review Act; amending s. 110.12301, F.S.; 3 
designating the Department of Management Services, 4 
rather than the Division of State Group Insurance, as 5 
the entity required to contract for certain services 6 
for the state group insurance program; authorizing the 7 
department or contractor to require certain 8 
information from subscribers; revising the type of 9 
information the department or contractor may require 10 
from subscribers for verifying dependent eligibility; 11 
removing obsolete language; revising the retention 12 
requirements for certain documentation; providing an 13 
effective date. 14 
 15 
Be It Enacted by the Legislatu re of the State of Florida: 16 
 17 
 Section 1.  Subsection (2) of section 110.12301, Florida 18 
Statutes, is amended to read: 19 
 110.12301  Competitive procurement of postpayment claims 20 
review services and dependent eligibility verification services; 21 
public records exemption.— 22 
 (2)  The department Division of State Group Insurance is 23 
directed to competitively procure a contract for dependent 24 
eligibility verification services for the state group insurance 25     
 
CS/CS/HB 1443  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1443-02-c2 
Page 2 of 6 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
program; however, compensation under the contract may not exce ed 26 
historical claim costs for the prior 12 months for the dependent 27 
populations disenrolled as a result of the contractor's 28 
services. 29 
 (a)1.  By September 1, 2017, the division shall notify all 30 
subscribers regarding the eligibility rules for dependents. 31 
Through November 30, 2017, the division must hold subscribers 32 
harmless for past claims of ineligible dependents if such 33 
dependents are removed from plan membership before December 1, 34 
2017. 35 
 2.  Subparagraph 1. does not apply to any dependent 36 
identified as ineligible before July 1, 2017, for which the 37 
department has notified the state agency employing the 38 
associated subscriber. 39 
 (a)(b) The department or the contractor providing 40 
dependent eligibility verification services may require request 41 
the following information from subscribers: 42 
 1.  To prove a spouse's eligibility: 43 
 a.  If married fewer less than 12 months and the subscriber 44 
and his or her spouse have not filed a joint federal income tax 45 
return, a copy of a government-issued marriage certificate; or 46 
 b.  If married for 12 or more months, a copy of the 47 
transcript of the most recently filed federal income tax return ; 48 
or 49 
 c.  If the documentation specified in sub -subparagraph a. 50     
 
CS/CS/HB 1443  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1443-02-c2 
Page 3 of 6 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
or sub-subparagraph b. cannot be produced, an attestation of the 51 
marriage by sworn affidavit consistent with s. 92.50 . 52 
 2.  To prove a biological child's or a newborn grandchild's 53 
eligibility:, 54 
 a. A copy of a government-issued birth certificate ; or 55 
 b.  If a government-issued birth certificate cannot be 56 
produced, an attestation of the subscriber-dependent 57 
relationship by sworn affidavit consistent with s. 92.50 . 58 
 3.  To prove an adopted child's eligibility: 59 
 a.  A copy of an adoption certificate; or 60 
 b.  A copy of an adoption placement agreement and a 61 
petition for adoption ; or 62 
 c.  If the documentation specified in sub -subparagraph a. 63 
or sub-subparagraph b. cannot be produced, an attestation of the 64 
subscriber-dependent relationship by sworn affidavit consistent 65 
with s. 92.50. 66 
 4.  To prove a stepchild's eligibility , both of the 67 
following: 68 
 a.  A copy of a government-issued birth certificate for the 69 
stepchild.; and 70 
 b.  A copy of the transcript of the subscriber's most 71 
recently filed federal income tax return. 72 
 5.  To prove a child's eligibility under guardianship, a 73 
copy of the court order naming the subscriber or the 74 
subscriber's spouse as the child's legal guardian or custodian 75     
 
CS/CS/HB 1443  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1443-02-c2 
Page 4 of 6 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
Any other information necessary to verify the dependent's 76 
eligibility for enrollment in the state group insurance program . 77 
 6.  To prove a foster child's elig ibility, a copy of the 78 
records showing the subscriber or the subscriber's spouse as the 79 
child's foster parent. 80 
 7.  To prove eligibility of an unmarried child who is at 81 
least 26 but not more than 30 years of age, all of the 82 
following: 83 
 a.  A copy of the ch ild's government-issued birth 84 
certificate or adoption certificate naming the subscriber or the 85 
subscriber's spouse as the child's parent, or a copy of the 86 
court order naming the subscriber or the subscriber's spouse as 87 
the child's legal guardian or custodi an. 88 
 b.  A copy of a completed Certification of Over -Age 89 
Dependent Eligibility Form. 90 
 c.  A document confirming the child's current enrollment as 91 
a student, including the name of the child, the name of the 92 
school where the child is enrolled, and the school term in which 93 
the child is enrolled, or a bill or statement in the child's 94 
name that is dated within the last 60 days and is mailed to the 95 
child at an address in the state. 96 
 8.  To prove eligibility of a disabled child who is at 97 
least 26 years of age or older, both of the following: 98 
 a.  A copy of the child's government -issued birth 99 
certificate or adoption certificate naming the subscriber or the 100     
 
CS/CS/HB 1443  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1443-02-c2 
Page 5 of 6 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
subscriber's spouse as the child's parent, or a copy of the 101 
court order naming the subscriber or the subscribe r's spouse as 102 
the child's legal guardian or custodian. 103 
 b.  A copy of the subscriber's or the subscriber's spouse's 104 
most recently filed federal income tax return listing the 105 
child's name and the last four digits of the child's social 106 
security number and id entifying the child as the subscriber's or 107 
the subscriber's spouse's dependent for tax purposes. 108 
 (b)(c) If a document requested from a subscriber is not 109 
confidential or exempt from public records requirements, the 110 
division and the contractor shall disclo se to all subscribers 111 
that such information submitted to verify the eligibility of 112 
dependents may be subject to disclosure and inspection under 113 
chapter 119. 114 
 (c)(d) A government-issued marriage license or marriage 115 
certificate submitted for dependent eligi bility verification 116 
must include the date of the marriage between the subscriber and 117 
the spouse. 118 
 (d)(e) A government-issued birth certificate submitted for 119 
dependent eligibility verification must list the parents' names. 120 
 (e)(f) Foreign-born subscribers unable to obtain the 121 
necessary documentation within the specified time period of 122 
producing verification documentation may provide a sworn execute 123 
a signed affidavit consistent with s. 92.50 attesting to 124 
eligibility requirements. 125     
 
CS/CS/HB 1443  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1443-02-c2 
Page 6 of 6 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
 (f)(g) Documentation submitted to verify eligibility may 126 
be an original or a photocopy of an original document. Before 127 
submitting a document, the subscriber may redact any information 128 
on a document which is not necessary to verify the eligibility 129 
of the dependent. 130 
 (g)(h) All documentation obtained by the department or 131 
contractor to conduct the dependent eligibility verification 132 
services must be retained in accordance with the applicable 133 
records retention schedule until June 30, 2019. The department 134 
or the contractor is not requi red to retain such documentation 135 
after June 30, 2019, and shall destroy such documentation as 136 
soon as practicable after such date. 137 
 Section 2.  This act shall take effect July 1, 2022. 138