Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1493 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/17/2022

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h1493d.SAC 
DATE: 2/17/2022 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES LOCAL BILL STAFF ANALYSIS 
 
BILL #: CS/HB 1493    Alachua County 
SPONSOR(S): Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, Clemons 
TIED BILLS:    IDEN./SIM. BILLS:   
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Local Administration & Veterans Affairs 
Subcommittee 
17 Y, 0 N, As 
CS 
Darden Miller 
2) Public Integrity & Elections Committee 15 Y, 0 N Roy Rubottom 
3) State Affairs Committee  	Darden Williamson 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
The Florida Constitution requires each county commission to divide the county into districts of contiguous 
territory with as equal population as practicable following each decennial census. One commissioner residing 
in each district is elected as provided by law. Each county commission consists of five or seven members 
serving staggered terms of four years, unless otherwise provided by a county charter. 
 
The Alachua County Board of County Commissioners is a five-member body, divided into districts, with one 
commissioner elected from each district by the qualified electors of the entire county.   
 
The bill amends the Alachua County Home Rule Charter to require members of the county commission to be 
elected by the qualified electors of the district they represent. The charter amendment is subject to approval by 
the electors of Alachua County voting in a referendum to be held on November 8, 2022, the 2022 general 
election. 
 
   STORAGE NAME: h1493d.SAC 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 2/17/2022 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Background 
 
The Florida Constitution requires each county commission to divide the county into districts of 
contiguous territory with as equal population as practicable following each decennial census.
1
 One 
commissioner residing in each district is elected as provided by law. Each county commission consists 
of five or seven members serving staggered terms of four years, unless otherwise provided by a county 
charter.  
 
The default county election system requires the county commission to draw five districts nearly equal in 
population as possible, with one commissioner elected from each district by the qualified electors of the 
entire county.
2
 County commissioners are responsible for making periodic boundary adjustments to 
ensure district populations are nearly equal as possible, but these changes may only be made during 
odd-numbered years.
3
 This system is used by 41 of the state’s 67 counties, including Alachua County.
4
 
 
Alternatively, county commissioners may be elected from single-member districts, subject to voter 
approval at a referendum.
5
 A referendum to convert to single-member districts may be called by the 
county commission or electors of the county may petition to have the proposition placed on the ballot 
by gathering the signatures of at least 10 percent of the qualified electors of the county.
6
 The 
referendum may convert the county commission to a five-member body, with all members elected in 
districts, or a seven-member body with five members elected in districts and two members elected at-
large by the qualified electors of the entire county.
7
 Commissioners are elected to four-year terms 
which are staggered so that approximately half of the commissioners elected from districts and, if 
applicable, one of the commissioners elected at-large from the entire county, are elected every two 
years.
8
 The conversion to single-member districts does not impact the term of current officeholders.
9
 
 
Charter counties have all powers of local self-government not inconsistent with general law, or with 
special law approved by vote of the electors.
10
 Alachua County adopted its Home Rule Charter in 
1986.
11
 The charter assigns legislative powers to a five-member elected county commission and 
executive powers to a county manager appointed by the commission.
12
 Amendments to the charter 
may be proposed by a petition signed by  at least 10 percent of the number of electors qualified to vote 
in the county as a whole in the preceding general election.
13
  
 
Effect of Proposed Changes 
 
The bill amends the Alachua County Home Rule Charter to require members of the county commission 
to be elected by the qualified electors of the district they represent. The charter amendment is subject 
to approval by the electors of Alachua County voting in a referendum to be held on November 8, 2022, 
the 2022 general election. The bill specifies the wording of the referendum question on the ballot.  
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
                                                
1
 Art. VIII, s. 1, Fla. Const. 
2
 S. 124.01(1)-(2), F.S. 
3
 S. 124.01(3), F.S. 
4
 Fla. Ass’n of Counties, County Redistricting, https://www.fl-counties.com/county-districting (last visited Jan. 14, 2022). 
5
 S. 124.011, F.S. 
6
 S. 124.011(3), F.S. 
7
 S. 124.011(1), F.S. 
8
 S. 124.011(2), F.S. 
9
 S. 124.011(11), F.S. 
10
 Art. VIII, s. 1, Fla. Const. 
11
 See Alachua Cnty., Fla. Ordinance 86-20. 
12
 Alachua Cnty., Fla. Charter art. 2. 
13
 Alachua Cnty., Fla. Charter art. 4, s. 4.2(A)(1).  STORAGE NAME: h1493d.SAC 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 2/17/2022 
  
Section 1: Amending the Alachua County Home Rule Charter to require members of the county 
commission to be elected by the qualified electors of the district they represent. 
 
Section 2: Providing for a referendum election, ballot title, and ballot question. 
 
Section 3: Providing that the bill takes effect upon its approval by a majority vote of the qualified 
electors of Alachua County voting in a referendum, except that this section and section 2 
shall take effect upon becoming a law. 
II.  NOTICE/REFERENDUM AND OTHER REQUIREMENTS 
 
A.  NOTICE PUBLISHED?     Yes [x]     No [] 
 
      IF YES, WHEN? December 1, 2021 
 
WHERE? The Gainesville Sun, a daily newspaper of general circulation published in 
Alachua County, Florida. 
 
B.  REFERENDUM(S) REQUIRED?     Yes [x]     No [] 
 
      IF YES, WHEN? November 8, 2022 
 
C.  LOCAL BILL CERTIFICATION FILED?     Yes [x]     No [] 
 
D.  ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT FILED?     Yes [x]     No [] 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
The bill neither authorizes nor requires administrative rulemaking by executive branch agencies. 
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None. 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
On February 2, 2022, the Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee adopted a strike-all 
amendment and reported the bill favorably as a committee substitute. The amendment would maintain the 
current size of the Alachua County Board of County Commissioners, but require each member to be 
elected by the qualified electors of the district they represent. The amendment also corrects a scrivener's 
error in the bill as filed. 
 
This analysis is drafted to the committee substitute adopted by the Local Administration & Veterans 
Affairs Subcommittee.