Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1591 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/23/2022

                     
This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h1591z.LAV.docx 
DATE: 3/23/2022 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 1591    Hernando County 
SPONSOR(S): Ingoglia 
TIED BILLS:    IDEN./SIM. BILLS:   
 
 
 
 
FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 107 Y’s 
 
0 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Pending 
 
 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
HB 1591 passed the House on February 25, 2022, and subsequently passed the Senate on March 10, 2022. 
 
The Hernando County Port Authority (Authority) was created by special act in 1965 as an independent special 
district to allow Hernando County to utilize the capital financing mechanisms required by the 1959 Port 
Facilities Financing Law. The Authority is governed by a board of five members appointed by the Board of 
County Commissioners of Hernando County.  
 
The bill amends ch. 65-1618, s. 2, Laws of Florida, as amended by ch. 71-666, Laws of Florida, substituting 
the Board of County Commissioners of Hernando County as the Hernando County Port Authority rather than 
appoint separate members to the Authority. 
 
The bill does not appear to have a fiscal impact on state or local government. 
 
Subject to the Governor’s veto powers, the effective date of this bill is upon becoming a law. 
    
STORAGE NAME: h1591z.LAV.docx 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/23/2022 
  
I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION 
 
A. EFFECT OF CHANGES:  
Present Situation 
 
Special Districts 
 
A “special district” is a unit of local government created for a particular purpose, with jurisdiction to 
operate within a limited geographic boundary.
1
 Special districts are created by general law, special act, 
local ordinance, or rule of the Governor and Cabinet.
2
 A special district has only those powers 
expressly provided by, or reasonably implied from, the authority provided in the district’s charter.
3
 
Special districts provide specific municipal services in addition to, or in place of, those provided by a 
municipality or county.
4
 A “dependent special district” is a special district subject to significant control by 
the governing body of a single county or municipality.
5
 An “independent special district” is any district 
that is not a dependent special district.
6
 
 
Special districts do not possess “home rule” powers and may impose only those taxes, assessments, 
or fees authorized by special or general law. The special act creating an independent special district 
may provide for funding from a variety of sources while prohibiting others. For example, ad valorem tax 
authority is not mandatory for a special district.
7
 
 
Hernando County Port Authority 
 
The Hernando County Port Authority (Authority) was created by special act in 1965 (Act) as an 
independent special district.
8
 The Authority was created to allow Hernando County to utilize the capital 
financing mechanisms required by the 1959 Port Facilities Financing Law.
9
 
 
The Authority initially was governed by a board of five members appointed by the Governor and 
confirmed by the Senate. The terms of the members were to be one year, two years, three years, four 
years, and five years, as designated by the Governor upon the member’s appointment. The board 
chose a member to serve as chair for two-year terms.
10
  
 
In 1971, the charter of the Authority was amended to require the members of the Authority be 
appointed by the Board of County Commissioners of Hernando County (BOCC). The term of each 
                                                
1
 See Halifax Hospital Medical Center v. State of Fla., et al., 278 So. 3d 545, 547 (Fla. 2019). 
2
 See ss. 189.02(1), 189.031(3), and 190.005(1), F.S. See generally s. 189.012(6), F.S. 
3
 Halifax Hospital Medical Center, supra at 547. See ss. 189.02(4)-(5) and 189.031(3), F.S. Counties and municipalities 
have “home rule” powers allowing them to enact ordinances not inconsistent with general or special law for governmental, 
corporate, or proprietary purposes. Special districts do not possess home rule powers and are permitted to impose only 
those taxes, assessments, or fees authorized by special or general law. See art. VIII, ss. 1(f) and (g), 2(b), s. 6(e), Fla. 
Const. and ss. 166.021 and 125.01, F.S. See also 2021 – 2022 Local Gov’t Formation Manual, p. 70, at 
https://myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/committeesdetail.aspx?CommitteeId=3117 (last visited January 30, 
2022) (hereinafter Local Government Manual). 
4
 2020 – 2022 Local Gov’t Formation Manual, pp. 60-61, at 
https://myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Documents/loaddoc.aspx?PublicationType=Committees&CommitteeId=3117&Sessio
n=2021&DocumentType=General+Publications&FileName=2021-2022+Local+Government+Formation+Manual.pdf (last 
visited on January 31, 2022). 
5
 S. 189.012(2), F.S. Types of such control include the county or municipality governing body acting as the district 
governing body, having the authority to appoint or remove at will district board members, or having final approval authority 
over the district’s budget. 
6
 S. 189.012(3), F.S. 
7
 Art. VII, s. 9(a), Fla. Const.  
8
 Ch. 65-1618, Laws of Fla. 
9
 Hernando County Ordinance No. 2021-01. The 1959 Port Facilities Financing Law refers to ss. 315.01-315.18, F.S. 
10
 Ch. 65-1618, s. 2, Laws of Fla.   
STORAGE NAME: h1591z.LAV.docx 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/23/2022 
  
board member was amended to four years, with all vacancies filled by the BOCC and members of the 
Authority continuing to elect the board chair.
11
 
 
The Authority is granted the power to: 
 Acquire land, submerged land, and water rights;
12
  
 Construct fixtures, facilities, and infrastructure as necessary to promote, create, maintain, and 
operate a commercial port;
13
 
 Contract;
14
 
 Take by eminent domain;
15
 
 Sue and be sued;
16
 
 Prescribe, fix, maintain, and regulate charges, tolls, or rents for the use of any of its facilities;
17
 
 Mortgage, pledge, or otherwise encumber any of its property or assets;
18
 
 Borrow money and incur indebtedness by the issuance of revenue bonds or certificates;
19
 
 Adopt and enforce rules and regulations or procedures pertaining to the use, acquisition, 
maintenance, development, operation, or disposal of any of the facilities or projects enumerated 
in the special act;
20
 
 Acquire and perform all things enumerated in the special act separately, jointly, or in conjunction 
with a municipality or other political subdivision of the state;
21
 
 Employ secretaries, attorneys, engineers, and other technical assistants and employees.
22
 
 
The Authority does not have the power to levy ad valorem taxes or non-ad valorem special 
assessments.  
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
The bill amends ch. 65-1618, s. 2, Laws of Florida, as amended by ch. 71-666, Laws of Florida, to 
provide that the Board of County Commissioners of Hernando County sits and acts as the board for the 
Authority. All powers and duties of the Authority are vested in the BOCC. The bill removes the separate 
provisions for term lengths, filling vacancies, and electing a chair. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
None. 
 
                                                
11
 Ch. 71-666, s. 2, Laws of Fla. 
12
 Ch. 65-1618, s. 3(1), Laws of Fla. 
13
 Ch. 65-1618, s. 3(2), Laws of Fla. 
14
 Ch. 65-1618, s. 3(3), Laws of Fla. 
15
 Ch. 65-1618, s. 3(4), Laws of Fla. 
16
 Ch. 65-1618, s. 3(5), Laws of Fla. 
17
 Ch. 65-1618, s. 3(6), Laws of Fla. 
18
 Ch. 65-1618, s. 3(7), Laws of Fla. 
19
 Ch. 65-1618, s. 3(8), Laws of Fla. 
20
 Ch. 65-1618, s. 3(9), Laws of Fla. 
21
 Ch. 65-1618, s. 3(10), Laws of Fla. 
22
 Ch. 65-1618, s. 3(11), Laws of Fla.   
STORAGE NAME: h1591z.LAV.docx 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 3/23/2022 
  
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
None. 
 
C. ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT FILED?     Yes [X]     No [] 
 
D. NOTICE PUBLISHED?     Yes [X]     No [] 
 
IF YES, WHEN? November 5, 2021. 
 
WHERE? The Hernando Sun, a weekly newspaper of general circulation, published in 
Hernando County, Florida. 
 
E. REFERENDUM(S) REQUIRED?     Yes []     No [X] 
 
IF YES, WHEN?