Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H5009 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/11/2022

                     
 
 
Wilton Simpson 
President of the Senate 
 
THE FLORIDA LEGISLATURE 
 
 
 
Chris Sprowls 
Speaker of the House of 
Representatives 
 
 
 
March 19, 2022 
 
 
 
The Honorable Chris Sprowls 
Speaker, House of Representatives 
 
The Honorable Wilton Simpson 
President of the Senate 
 
 
Dear Mr. Speaker and Mr. President	: 
 
Your Conference Committee on the disagreeing votes of the two houses on HB 5009, same 
being: 
 
An act relating to the state group insurance program. 
 
 
having met, and after full and free conference, do recommend to their respective houses as 
follows: 
 
1. That the Senate recede from its Amendment 105220. 
2. That the Senate and House of Representatives adopt the Conference Committee 
Amendment attached hereto, and by reference made a part of this report. 
 
   The Honorable Chris Sprowls 
The Honorable Wilton Simpson 
March 10, 2022 
Page 2 
 
 
HB 5009 
Representative Jay Trumbull, Chair Representative Ramon Alexander, At Large 
Representative Bryan Avila, At Large Representative Kamia L. Brown, At Large 
Representative Colleen Burton, At Large Representative James Bush , At Large 
Representative Charles Wesley Clemons, Sr., At 
Large 
 Representative Ben Diamond, At Large 
Representative Brad Drake, At Large Representative Fentrice Driskell, At Large 
Representative Nicholas X. Duran, At Large Representative Randy Fine, At Large 
Representative Joseph Geller, At Large Representative Erin Grall, At Large 
Representative Michael Grant, At Large Representative Blaise Ingoglia, At Large 
Representative Evan Jenne, At Large Representative Chris Latvala, At Large 
Representative Thomas J. Leek, At Large Representative Ralph E. Massullo, MD, At Large 
Representative Lawrence McClure, At Large Representative Anika Tene Omphroy, At Large 
Representative Bobby Payne, At Large Representative Daniel Perez, At Large 
Representative Scott Plakon, At Large Representative Rene Plasencia, At Large 
Representative Paul Renner, At Large Representative Rick Roth, At Large 
Representative Cyndi Stevenson, At Large Representative Josie Tomkow, At Large  The Honorable Chris Sprowls 
The Honorable Wilton Simpson 
March 10, 2022 
Page 3 
 
 
HB 5009 
Representative Matt Willhite, At Large Representative Patricia H. Williams, At Large 
Representative Jayer Williamson, At Large  
 
 
Managers on the part of the House of Representatives 
   The Honorable Chris Sprowls 
The Honorable Wilton Simpson 
March 10, 2022 
Page 4 
 
 
HB 5009 
Senator Kelli Stargel,  Chair  Senator Ben Albritton 
Senator Loranne Ausley  Senator Dennis Baxley 
Senator Aaron Bean, At Large  Senator Lori Berman 
Senator Lauren Book, At Large  Senator Jim Boyd 
Senator Randolph Bracy  Senator Jennifer Bradley 
       Senator Jason Brodeur 
Senator Doug Broxson  Senator Danny Burgess 
Senator Janet Cruz  Senator Manny Diaz 
Senator Gary M. Farmer  Senator George B. Gainer 
Senator Ileana Garcia  Senator Audrey Gibson, At Large 
Senator Joe Gruters  Senator Gayle Harrell 
Senator Ed Hooper  Senator Travis Hutson 
Senator Shevrin D. Jones  Senator Debbie Mayfield, At Large 
Senator Kathleen Passidomo, At Large Senator Keith Perry, At Large 
Senator Jason W. B. Pizzo  Senator Tina Scott Polsky  The Honorable Chris Sprowls 
The Honorable Wilton Simpson 
March 10, 2022 
Page 5 
 
 
HB 5009 
Senator Bobby Powell, At Large  Senator Ray Wesley Rodrigues 
Senator Ana Maria Rodriguez  Senator Darryl Ervin Rouson, At Large 
Senator Wilton Simpson  Senator Linda Stewart, At Large 
Senator Annette Taddeo  Senator Victor M. Torres 
Senator Tom A. Wright   
 
 
Conferees on the part of the Senate 
 
   The Honorable Chris Sprowls 
The Honorable Wilton Simpson 
March 10, 2022 
Page 6 
 
 
HB 5009 
The Conference Committee Amendment for HB 5009, relating to the State Group Insurance 
Program, conforms to the Fiscal Year 2022	-2023 General Appropriations Act (GAA). The GAA 
contains $2.5 million and 3.00 positions related to the creation of an anti -fraud unit within the 
Division of State Group Insurance. 
 
The State Group Insurance Program (SGI Program) is created by s. 110.123, F.S., and is 
administered by the Division of State Group Insurance (DSGI) within the Department of 
Management Services (DMS). The SGI Program is an optional benefit for most state employees 
employed by executive branch agencies, state universities, the court system, and the Legislature 
and includes health, life, dental, vision, disability, and other supplemental insurance benefits. 
The SGI Program typically makes benefits changes on a plan year basis, January 1 through 
December 31. 
 
In Fiscal Year 2021-2022, the SGI Program will serve nearly 170,000 enrolled employees at the 
cost of $2.9 billion. The Revenue Estimating Conference forecasts the SGI Program will serve 
approximately the same number of employees at a cost of $3.1 billion in Fiscal Year 2022-	2023. 
 
The amendment amends statutes to make the following changes: 
• Provides that eligible former employees of state government may reenroll in the SGI 
Program within 24 months of separation from employment which occurred on or after July 1, 
2022. All eligible former employees must pay the same premiums as early retirees.  
• Directs DMS to establish an anti-fraud unit within DSGI by December 31, 2022. 
Specifically, DMS must establish and maintain a designated anti-fraud unit to investigate and 
report possible fraudulent insurance acts by insureds, persons making claims for services 
against the State Employees Health Insurance Trust Fund, or vendors under contract with the 
division. The amendment authorizes the division to contract for the provisions related to the 
anti-fraud division and requires DMS to designate staff with the primary responsibility of 
implementing those provisions. 
• Wavies member cost share within the Price Transparency Program. 
• Deletes obsolete language relating to additional state appropriations to the state group health 
insurance program. 
• Ratifies DMS’ rule to create nine HMO regions across the state pursuant to s. 110.123(3)(h) 
2.d., F.S.  
• Repeals the Metal Tier health plan contained in s. 110.123(3)(J), F.S. 
 
Except as otherwise provided (Section 4), the amendment has an effective date of July 1, 2022.