Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H7041 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/28/2022

                     
This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h7041z.DOCX 
DATE: 3/9/2022 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 7041          PCB RUC 22-05    Florida Statutes 
SPONSOR(S): Rules Committee, Clemons 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 854 
 
 
 
 
FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 117 Y’s 
 
1 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Approved 
 
 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
HB 7041 passed the House on February 10, 2022, as SB 854. 
 
This bill replaces references to the Department of Business and Professional Regulation (DBPR) Division of 
Pari-mutuel Wagering and references to DBPR relating to gaming with references to the Florida Gaming 
Control Commission to conform the Florida Statutes to the transfer of duties in S. 11, ch. 2021-269, Laws of 
Florida. 
 
The bill was approved by the Governor on February 24, 2022, ch. 2022-7, L.O.F. and becomes effective on 
May 13, 2022.     
STORAGE NAME: h7041z.DOCX 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/9/2022 
  
I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION 
 
A. EFFECT OF CHANGES:  
 
Ch. 2021-269, Laws of Fla. (CS/SB 4A from Special Session 2021A) 
 
Ch. 2021-269, Laws of Fla. (CS/SB 4A from Special Session 2021A) establishes the Florida Gaming 
Control Commission (Commission) within the Department of Legal Affairs (DLA).  
 
S.11, ch. 2021-269, Laws of Fla. provided for a type two transfer as defined in s. 20.06(2), F.S., to the 
commission, effective July 1, 2022, of all powers, duties, functions, records, offices, personnel, 
associated administrative support positions, property, pending issues, existing contracts, administrative 
authority, administrative rules, and unexpended balances of appropriations, allocations, and other 
funds of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation (DBPR) related to the oversight 
responsibilities by the state compliance agency for authorized gaming compacts under s. 285.710, 
F.S., the regulation of pari-mutuel wagering under chapter 550, F.S., the regulation of slot machines 
and slot machine gaming under chapter 551, F.S., and the regulation of cardrooms under s. 849.086, 
F.S. 
 
In addition, s.13, ch. 2021-269, Laws of Fla. directed the Division of Law Revision to prepare a reviser’s 
bill effective July 1, 2022, to replace references to the Division of Pari-mutuel Wagering and references 
to DBPR relating to gaming with references to the Commission to conform Florida Statutes to the type 
two transfer. 
 
Effect of Proposed Changes 
 
This reviser’s bill makes the conforming changes directed by s.13, ch. 2021-269, Laws of Fla. 
 
 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
 
  
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1.  Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
   
STORAGE NAME: h7041z.DOCX 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/9/2022 
  
None.