Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H7063 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/16/2022

                     
This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h7063z.DOCX 
DATE: 3/16/2022 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 7063          PCB PIE 22-05    Identification Cards 
SPONSOR(S): Public Integrity & Elections Committee, Perez 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 144 
 
 
 
 
FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 116 Y’s 
 
0 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Pending 
 
 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
 
HB 7063 passed the House on March 9, 2022, as SB 144. 
 
Florida law authorizes any person who is five years of age or older, or any person who has a disability 
regardless of age, to be issued an identification card by the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles 
(DHSMV) upon completion of an application and payment of a $25 application fee. Of this amount, $7 is 
deposited into the Highway Safety Operating Trust Fund or retained by the county tax collector, and $18 is 
deposited into the General Revenue Fund. 
 
Under current law, DHSMV must issue identification cards at no charge to certain persons. This exemption is 
limited to applicants who present satisfactory evidence of homelessness, as well as specified juvenile 
offenders and prison inmates upon the expiration of their sentence. 
 
SB 144 adds the following applicants to whom DHSMV must issue a Florida identification card at no charge:  
 A person who presents a valid Florida voter’s registration card and attests that he or she is 
experiencing a financial hardship. DHSMV may not require such persons to present evidence of 
financial hardship. 
 Persons 80 years of age or older whose driving privilege is denied due to failure to pass a vision test. 
 
 
The bill may have a significant negative fiscal impact on local and state government revenues as a result of 
adding these two new statutory fee exemptions relating to the issuance of identification cards. However, it is 
unknown how many individuals would qualify for the exemptions. See Fiscal Analysis. 
 
Subject to the Governor’s veto powers, the effective date of this bill is July 1, 2022. 
 
 
    
STORAGE NAME: h7063z.DOCX 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/16/2022 
  
 
I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION 
 
A. EFFECT OF CHANGES:  
 
Current Situation 
 
Chapter 322, F.S, governs the issuance of Florida driver licenses and identification cards. Florida 
identification cards provide the same reliable photographic identification as Florida driver licenses. In 
Florida identification cards are interchangeable with driver licenses for purposes of commercial air 
travel, banking, and voter registration. 
 
Florida law authorizes any person who is five years of age or older, or any person who has a disability, 
regardless of age, who applies for a disabled parking permit, to be issued an identification card by the 
Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles (DHSMV) upon completion of an application and 
payment of an application fee.
1
 The cost for an original, renewal, or replacement identification card is 
$25. Of this amount, $7 is deposited into the Highway Safety Operating Trust Fund or retained by the 
county tax collector,
2
 and $18 is deposited into the General Revenue Fund.
3
 
 
Under Florida law, DHSMV must issue identification cards at no charge to certain persons. The 
exemption is limited to applicants who present satisfactory evidence of homelessness, as well as 
specified juvenile offenders and prison inmates upon the expiration of their sentence.
4
 
 
In 2020, Florida ranked second in the nation for the percentage of state population aged 65 or older. At 
the time of the last census, it was determined that over 21 percent of Florida citizens are in this 
category.
5
 
 
Florida law requires driver licenses to be renewed every eight years, except drivers who are 80 years or 
older are required to renew every six years. Mandatory vision tests are required for drivers 80 years or 
older at each renewal.
6
 
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
The bill adds the following persons to the list of persons to whom DHSMV must issue a Florida 
identification card at no charge: 
 A person who presents a valid Florida voter’s registration card and attests that he or she is 
experiencing a financial hardship. DHSMV may not require such persons to present evidence of 
financial hardship. 
 Persons 80 years of age or older whose driving privilege is denied due to failure to pass a vision 
test.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
                                                
1
 s. 322.051(1), F.S. 
2
 This is based on whether DHSMV or the county tax collector issues the identification card. 
3
 s. 322.21(1)(f), F.S. 
4
 s. 322.051(9), F.S. 
5
 https://www.prb.org/resources/which-us-states-are-the-oldest/ (last accessed: Feb. 1, 2022) 
6
 s. 322.18(2)(a) and (b), F.S.   
STORAGE NAME: h7063z.DOCX 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/16/2022 
  
 
  
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1.  Revenues: 
 
The bill creates two new groups that qualify for the issuance of an identification card at no charge. It 
is unknown how many individuals would claim a hardship and seek an identification card at no 
charge. For Fiscal Year 2022-2023, DHSMV projects a likely significant decrease in revenues as a 
result of these two new statutory fee exemptions: $4.3 million impact to the General Revenue Fund 
and $381,794 impact to the Highway Safety Operating Trust Fund. However, these impacts are 
indeterminate, as this bill has not been reviewed in an official revenue estimating conference to 
determine a consensus cost estimate, and it is indeterminate how many would qualify for a fee 
exemption 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
The creation of the two new groups that can receive an identification card at no charge is projected 
to reduce revenues collected by tax collectors by $315,919. This projection is based upon 
DHSMV’s calculations as the bill has not been reviewed in an official revenue estimating 
conference to determine a consensus cost estimate. It is unknown how many individuals would 
claim a hardship and seek an identification card at no charge. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVA TE SECTOR: 
 
Registered voters who attest to experiencing financial hardship and those at least 80 years of age who 
lose their driving priviledges due to a vision disability will benefit from able to receive an identification 
card at no charge to them. 
 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
 
None.