Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0160 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 01/24/2022

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Transportation  
 
BILL: SB 160 
INTRODUCER:  Senator Harrell 
SUBJECT:  Transportation Facility Designations/Deputy Sheriff Donta Manuel and Deputy Sheriff 
Jonathan Wallace Highway 
DATE: January 24, 2022 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Price Vickers TR Pre-meeting 
2.     ATD   
3.     AP  
 
I. Summary: 
SB 160 designates the portion of S.R. 715/Bacom Point Road between W. Morgan Road and 
S.W. 14th Street in Palm Beach County as “Deputy Sheriff Donta Manuel and Deputy Sheriff 
Jonathan Wallace Highway” and directs the Florida Department of Transportation (FDOT) to 
erect suitable markers. 
 
The estimated cost to the FDOT to install the designation markers required under the bill is 
$1,040. See the “Fiscal Impact Statement” below for details. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2022. 
II. Present Situation: 
Section 334.071, F.S., provides that legislative designations of transportation facilities are for 
honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular facility. Such designations are not to 
be construed as requiring any action by local governments or private parties regarding the 
changing of any street signs, mailing addresses, or 911 emergency telephone number system 
listings, unless the legislation specifically provides for such changes.
1
 
 
When the Legislature establishes road or bridge designations, the FDOT is required to place 
markers only at the termini specified for each highway segment or bridge designated by the law 
creating the designation and to erect any other markers it deems appropriate for the 
transportation facility.
2
 
 
                                                
1
 Section 334.071(1), F.S.  
2
 Section 334.071(2), F.S. 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 160   	Page 2 
 
The FDOT may not erect the markers for honorary road or bridge designations unless the 
affected city or county commission enacts a resolution supporting the designation. When the 
designated road or bridge segment is located in more than one city or county, each affected local 
government must pass resolutions supporting the designations before the installation of the 
markers.
3
 
 
Deputy Sheriffs Donta Manuel and Jonathan Wallace 
On November 28, 2007, as other deputies pursued a stolen vehicle that had just passed over “stop 
sticks” in the roadway on State Road 715 near Lake Okeechobee, Deputies Manuel and Wallace 
ran into the roadway in an attempt to remove the stop sticks.
4
 Apparently, due to the darkness, 
Deputies Manuel and Wallace did not perceive the speed at which the pursuing patrol cars were 
following behind the suspect vehicle. One of the pursuing patrol cars struck and killed both 
deputies. The driver of that pursuing patrol car was seriously injured and flown to a local 
hospital. One of the suspects in the stolen vehicle was apprehended a short time later. 
 
Deputy Manuel served with the Palm Beach County Sheriff’s Office (PBCSO) for 13 years. He 
was survived by his wife, Suzette Manuel, sons Donta and Diontray Manuel, and daughter 
Dashja Trawick. Deputy Wallace served with the PBSCO for 18 months. He was survived by his 
mother, Patricia Wallace.
5
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
The bill designates the portion of S.R. 715/Bacom Point Road between W. Morgan Road and 
S.W. 14th Street in Palm Beach County as “Deputy Sheriff Donta Manuel and Deputy Sheriff 
Jonathan Wallace Highway” and directs the Florida Department of Transportation (FDOT) to 
erect suitable markers. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2022. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
                                                
3
 Section 334.071(3), F.S. 
4
 See the SunSentinel, Stop Sticks help put the brakes on escaping criminals, May 25, 2013, available at http://www.sun-
sentinel.com/news/fl-xpm-2013-05-25-fl-stop-stick-20130525-story.html and Fallen Heroes - Palm Beach County Sheriff's 
Office (pbso.org) (last visited January 19, 2022). 
5
 Id.  BILL: SB 160   	Page 3 
 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None identified. 
 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
The estimated cost to erect the designation markers required under this bill is $1,040, 
based on the assumption that a minimum of two markers are required for each 
designation at a cost to the FDOT of no less than $520 each. The estimate includes sign 
fabrication, installation, and maintenance over time but does not include any additional 
expenses related to maintenance of traffic, dedication event costs, or replacement 
necessitated by damage, vandalism, or storm events. The FDOT is expected to absorb the 
estimated cost within existing resources. 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
The bill creates an undesignated section of Florida law.   
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None.  BILL: SB 160   	Page 4 
 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.