The Florida Senate BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT (This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Education BILL: SB 490 INTRODUCER: Senator Stewart and others SUBJECT: Required Instruction in the History of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders DATE: January 14, 2022 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR REFERENCE ACTION 1. Jahnke Bouck ED Pre-meeting 2. AED 3. AP I. Summary: SB 490 requires public schools to provide instruction on the history of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders, including the immigration, citizenship, civil rights, identity, and culture of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders. Additionally, the bill requires instructional materials to include the contributions of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders to American society. The bill has no impact on state revenues or expenditures. The bill may have a fiscal impact to school districts. See section V. This bill is effective July 1, 2022. II. Present Situation: Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders Almost eight percent of the United States population is comprised of Asians and Pacific Islanders, with Florida’s population being made up by nearly four percent of Asians and Pacific Islanders. 1 Asian Americans are the fastest-growing major racial or ethnic group in the United States. 2 More than 22 million Asians live in the United States and almost all trace their roots to specific countries or populations from East and Southeast Asia and the Indian subcontinent. 3 1 United States Census Bureau, Race and Ethnicity in the United States: 2010 Census and 2020 Census, https://www.census.gov/library/visualizations/interactive/race-and-ethnicity-in-the-united-state-2010-and-2020-census.html (last visited January 5, 2022). 2 Pew Research Center, Key facts about Asian origin groups in the U.S., https://www.pewresearch.org/fact- tank/2021/04/29/key-facts-about-asian-origin-groups-in-the-u-s/ (last visited January 5, 2022). 3 Id. REVISED: BILL: SB 490 Page 2 Every May, Asian American and Pacific Islander (AAPI) Heritage month is celebrated to commemorate the arrival of the first Japanese immigrants to the United States on May 7, 1843, and the completion of the transcontinental railroad on May 10, 1869. The majority of the workers who laid the tracks were Chinese immigrants. 4 Among some of the AAPI communities’ contributions to America’s rich heritage are: 5 Birthright Citizenship: After a year-long battle between Wong Kim Ark (born in San Francisco to Chinese immigrants) and the U.S. Justice Department, the U.S. Supreme Court ruled in 1898 that children born in America to foreigners were U.S. citizens. Technology: Taiwanese American Jerry Yang co-founded the web portal Yahoo! and Taiwanese American Steven Chen co-founded the video-sharing platform YouTube. Architecture: Chinese American I.M. Pei designed the Rock & Roll Hall of Fame and Museum, the National Gallery of Art in Washington, D.C., and the Pyramid at the Louvre in Paris. Japanese American Minoru Yamasaki designed the original World Trade Center. Fashion: Chinese American fashion designer Vera Wang is best known for her bridal wear, and Thailand born designer Phillip Lim and his partner, Wen Zhou, grew their fledgling start- up to a successful international brand. States Requiring Instruction on Asian American and Pacific Islander History In July 2021, Illinois became the first state to require Asian American history to be taught in public schools. Beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, every public elementary and high school in Illinois is required to include a unit on the history of Asian Americans, including their history in Illinois and the Midwest. 6 New Jersey has proposed legislation that requires school districts to provide K-12 instruction on the history and contributions of AAPIs as part of implementation of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Social Studies. 7 The proposed legislation has passed both Houses and is waiting to be signed by the governor. If the bill is signed into law, New Jersey will be the second state to mandate instruction on AAPI history. Florida Required Instruction in Schools The mission of Florida’s K-20 education system is to allow its students to increase their proficiency by allowing them the opportunity to expand their knowledge and skills through rigorous and relevant learning opportunities. 8 Each district school board must provide appropriate instruction to ensure that students meet State Board of Education (SBE) adopted 4 Food Safety and Inspection Service U.S. Department of Agriculture, Asian American and Pacific Islander Contributions to our Nation’s History, https://www.fsis.usda.gov/employees/employee-news-stories/aapi-2021 (last visited January 6, 2022). 5 Id. 6 EdWeek, Illinois Becomes First State to Require Teaching Asian American History in Public Schools, https://www.edweek.org/teaching-learning/illinois-becomes-first-state-to-require-teaching-asian-american-history-in-public- schools/2021/07 (last visited January 10, 2022). 7 New Jersey Legislature, Session 2020-2021, Bill A6100 Aca (1R) and Bill S4021 Aca (1R). 8 Section 1000.03(4), F.S. BILL: SB 490 Page 3 standards in the following subject areas: reading and other language arts, mathematics, science, social studies, foreign languages, health and physical education, and the arts. 9 Instructional staff of public schools, excluding charter schools, 10 subject to the rules of the SBE and the district school board, must provide instruction in: 11 The history and content of the Declaration of Independence. The history, meaning, significance, and effect of the provisions of the Constitution of the United States. The arguments in support of adopting our republican form of government. Flag education, including proper flag display and flag salute. The elements of civil government. The history of the United States. The history of the Holocaust. The history of African Americans. The elementary principles of agriculture. The effects of alcoholic and intoxicating liquors and beverages and narcotics. Kindness to animals. The history of the state. The conservation of natural resources. Comprehensive health education. The study of Hispanic contributions to the United States. The study of women’s contributions to the United States. The nature and importance of free enterprise to the United States economy. A character-development program in kindergarten through grade 12. The sacrifices that veterans and Medal of Honor recipients have made serving the country. III. Effect of Proposed Changes: The bill amends s. 1003.42, F.S., to require instructional staff of public schools to provide instruction on the history of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders (AAPI), including the immigration, citizenship, civil rights, identity, and culture of AAPIs. Additionally, the bill requires instructional materials to include AAPI contributions to American society. Requiring instruction on AAPI history could provide students with a better awareness and understanding of the historical, cultural, and societal impacts made by the AAPI communities. This bill is effective July 1, 2022. 9 In 2020, the SBE adopted new standards for English language arts and mathematics, called the Benchmarks for Excellent Student Thinking (BEST) standards. The English language arts standards implementation began with the 2021-2022 school year and implementation of the math standards begin in the 2022-2023 school year. Section 1003.42(1), F.S. 10 Instructional staff of charter schools are exempt from this section of law. Section 1002.33(16), F.S. 11 Section 1003.42(2), F.S. BILL: SB 490 Page 4 IV. Constitutional Issues: A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: None. B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: None. C. Trust Funds Restrictions: None. D. State Tax or Fee Increases: None. E. Other Constitutional Issues: None. V. Fiscal Impact Statement: A. Tax/Fee Issues: None. B. Private Sector Impact: None. C. Government Sector Impact: For those school districts that do not already provide instruction on the history of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders, there may be a cost associated with including this instruction in the required curriculum. VI. Technical Deficiencies: None. VII. Related Issues: None. VIII. Statutes Affected: This bill substantially amends sections 1003.42, 1006.148, and 1014.05 of the Florida Statutes. BILL: SB 490 Page 5 IX. Additional Information: A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: (Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) None. B. Amendments: None. This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.