Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0806 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 01/12/2022

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Health Policy  
 
BILL: SB 806 
INTRODUCER:  Senators Perry and Stewart 
SUBJECT:  Alzheimer’s Disease and Dementia-related Disorders Awareness 
DATE: January 12, 2022 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Looke Brown HP Pre-meeting 
2.     AHS   
3.     AP  
 
I. Summary: 
SB 806 creates s. 381.825, F.S., to establish the “Ramping up Education of Alzheimer’s Disease 
and Dementia for You (READY) Act.” The bill requires the Department of Health (DOH), in 
collaboration with the Department of Elder Affairs (DOEA), to use existing, relevant public 
health and community outreach programs to develop and disseminate information to medical and 
osteopathic doctors and to nurses in order to educate them on and increase their understanding 
and awareness of Alzheimer’s disease and dementia-related disorders (ADRD).  
 
The bill allows the DOH, using any federal or state funds appropriated for the purpose, to fund 
mobile and virtual outreach programs that prioritize underserved communities to provide 
information on ADRD, referrals to the DOEA, and links to available resources.  
 
The bill also directs the DOH to collaborate with other agencies and organizations to create a 
systematic approach to increasing public awareness of ADRD. 
 
The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2022. 
II. Present Situation: 
Alzheimer’s Disease and Dementia 
Dementia is the loss of cognitive functioning—thinking, remembering, and reasoning—and 
behavioral abilities to such an extent that it interferes with a person’s daily life and activities. 
These functions include memory, language skills, visual perception, problem solving, self-
management, and the ability to focus and pay attention. Some people with dementia cannot 
control their emotions, and their personalities may change. Dementia ranges in severity from the 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 806   	Page 2 
 
mildest stage, when it is just beginning to affect a person's functioning, to the most severe stage, 
when the person must depend completely on others for basic activities of living.
1
 
 
Alzheimer’s disease is the most common type of dementia. It is a progressive disease that begins 
with mild memory loss and can lead to loss of the ability to carry on a conversation and respond 
to one’s environment. Alzheimer’s disease affects parts of the brain that control thought, 
memory, and language. It can seriously affect a person’s ability to carry out daily activities. 
Although scientists are studying the disease, the cause of Alzheimer’s disease is unknown.
2
 
 
It is estimated that there are over 580,000 individuals living with Alzheimer’s disease in the state 
of Florida.
3
 By 2025, it is projected that 720,000 Floridians will have Alzheimer’s disease.
4
 Most 
individuals with Alzheimer’s can live in the community with support, often provided by spouses 
or other family members. In the late stages of the disease, many patients require care 24 hours 
per day and are often served in long-term care facilities. 
 
Dementia Care and Cure Initiative 
The DOEA announced the Dementia Care and Cure Initiative (DCCI) in 2015 to engage 
communities across the state to be more dementia-caring, promote better care for Floridians 
affected by dementia, and support research efforts to find a cure. In collaboration with Florida’s 
11 Area Agencies on Aging and 17 memory disorder clinics, participating DCCI communities 
organize task forces consisting of community professionals and stakeholders who work to bring 
about education, awareness of, and sensitivity regarding the needs of those affected by 
dementia.
5
 The goals of the DCCI include: 
 Increasing awareness of dementia, services, and supports. 
 Providing assistance to dementia-caring communities. 
 Continuing advocacy for care and cure programs.
6
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
SB 806 creates s. 381.825, F.S., to establish the “Ramping up Education of Alzheimer’s Disease 
and Dementia for You (READY) Act.” 
 
The bill requires the DOH, in collaboration with the DOEA, to use existing, relevant public 
health and community outreach programs to develop and disseminate information to medical and 
osteopathic doctors and to nurses in order to educate them on and increase their understanding 
and awareness of ADRD. The bill specifies that the information must, at a minimum, cover the 
following topics: 
 The importance of early detection and timely diagnosis of cognitive impairment. 
                                                
1
 What is Dementia? Symptoms, Types, and Diagnosis, National Institute on Aging, available at 
https://www.nia.nih.gov/health/what-dementia-symptoms-types-and-diagnosis, (last visited Jan. 4, 2022). 
2
 Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Alzheimer’s Disease and Healthy Aging website available at 
https://www.cdc.gov/aging/aginginfo/alzheimers.htm#AlzheimersDisease, (last visited Jan. 4, 2022). 
3
 Alzheimer’s Association available at https://www.alz.org/media/Documents/florida-alzheimers-facts-figures-2018.pdf, (last 
visited Mar. 10, 2021). 
4
 Id. 
5
 See http://elderaffairs.state.fl.us/doea/dcci.php (last visited Jan. 4, 2022). 
6
 See DCCI-Fact-Sheet_2021-March-2021.pdf (elderaffairs.org) (last visited Jan. 4, 2022).  BILL: SB 806   	Page 3 
 
 Use of a validated cognitive assessment tool. 
 The value of Medicare annual wellness visits for cognitive health. 
 Use of the Medicare billing code for advance care planning for individuals with cognitive 
impairment. 
 Methods to detect early warning signs of ADRD. 
 Methods to reduce the risk of cognitive decline, particularly among individuals in diverse 
communities who are at greater risk of developing ADRD. 
 
The bill requires the DOH to encourage providers, including but not limited to, hospitals, county 
health departments, physicians, nurses, and rural health centers, to display the above information 
in their facilities and discuss the risks of ADRD with patients age 60 or older. 
 
The bill allows the DOH, using any federal or state funds appropriated for the purpose, to fund 
mobile and virtual outreach programs that prioritize underserved communities to provide 
information on ADRD, including but not limited to brain health, risk education, and early 
detection and diagnosis; provide referrals to the DOEA; and include links to available resources 
relating to ADRD. 
 
The bill also directs the DOH to collaborate with other agencies and organizations to create a 
systematic approach to increasing public awareness of ADRD. 
 
The bill provides and effective date of July 1, 2022. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None.  BILL: SB 806   	Page 4 
 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
SB 806 may have an indeterminate negative fiscal impact on the DOH related to 
developing and disseminating the information required by the bill.  
 
The DOEA indicates that its involvement with developing and disseminating the 
information required by the bill will likely be able to be absorbed within existing 
resources.
7
 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill creates section 381.825 of the Florida Statutes.  
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate. 
                                                
7
 See DOEA analysis of SB 806, Nov. 16, 2021, on file with Senate Health Policy Committee staff.