Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1006 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 01/19/2022

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Rules  
 
BILL: CS/SB 1006 
INTRODUCER: Agriculture Committee and Senator Burgess 
SUBJECT:  State Symbols 
DATE: January 19, 2022 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Becker Becker AG Fav/CS 
2. Becker Phelps RC Pre-meeting 
 
Please see Section IX. for Additional Information: 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE - Substantial Changes 
 
I. Summary: 
CS/SB 1006 designates strawberry shortcake as the official state dessert. 
 
This bill is not expected to have an impact on state and local revenues and expenditures. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2022. 
II. Present Situation: 
State Symbols 
Chapter 15, F.S., designates state emblems. To date, there are designations for a state motto, tree, 
fruit,
1
 beverage,
2
 citrus archive, anthem, song, shell, stone, gem, wildflower, play, animal, freshwater 
fish, saltwater fish, marine mammal, saltwater mammal, butterfly, reptile, saltwater reptile, tortoise, 
air fair, rodeo, festival, moving image center and archive, litter control symbol, pageant, opera 
program, renaissance festival, railroad museums, history museum, transportation museum, flagship, 
soil, fiddle contest, band, sports hall of fame, pie, honey, horse, and heritage cattle breed. 
 
Currently, there is no state dessert. The state pie is key lime pie.
3
 
 
                                                
1
 Section 15.0315, F.S., designates the orange as the official fruit of Florida. 
2
 Section 15.032, F.S., designates orange juice as the official beverage of Florida. 
3
 Section 150025, F.S.  
REVISED:   BILL: CS/SB 1006   	Page 2 
 
Strawberries 
The strawberry is a small plant of the Rosacea (Rose) family and all varieties of the strawberry 
plant belong to the Fragaria genus. 
4
 Strawberries are not berries or fruit, they are enlarged ends 
of the plant’s stamen. The small black spots on the outside are actually the fruit.
5
 
 
Florida produces 12% of the U.S. value of strawberries annually, valued at $307 million.
6
 
Strawberries are the second highest valued of the berry, potato, vegetable, and watermelon crops 
in Florida.
7
 “Camarosa,” “Sweet Sensation,” and “Festival” varieties are recommended for 
Florida home gardens.
8
  
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
CS/SB 1006 provides the following information in whereas clauses: 
 More than 10,000 acres of strawberries are planted annually in the greater Plant City area, 
accounting for 75 percent of the United States’ winter strawberry crop; 
 Beginning in the spring of 1930, and again in 1948 after a six year hiatus during and 
following World War II, the Florida Strawberry Festival, held in Plant City and organized by 
the Plant City Lions Club, was revived by American Legion Post #26, and other area civic 
organizations; 
 Each year the Florida Strawberry Festival welcomes visitors from around the world to 
celebrate this slice of Americana and the area’s bountiful harvests; 
 Approximately 200,000 strawberry shortcakes, the festival’s signature dessert, are served 
each year at the Florida Strawberry Festival, making it a staple among festival attendees; 
 Strawberry shortcake is a dessert consisting of a base of shortcake, which resembles a biscuit 
with a touch of cake, a layer of sweet, sliced strawberries, and a healthy dollop of whipped 
cream; and 
 In 2000, Guinness World Records recognized Plant City as the home of the biggest shortcake 
in the world.  
 
The bill designates strawberry shortcake as the official state dessert. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2022.  
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
                                                
4
 UF/IFAS Gulf Coast Research and Education Center, Strawberry Facts, https://gcrec.ifas.ufl.edu/fruit-
crops/strawberries/strawberry-facts/ (last visited January 12, 2022). 
5
 Id. 
6
 Florida Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, Florida Agriculture Overview and Statistics, 
https://www.fdacs.gov/Agriculture-Industry/Florida-Agriculture-Overview-and-Statistics (last visited January 12, 2022).  
7
 Id. 
8
 UF/IFAS Extension, Growing Strawberries, https://sfyl.ifas.ufl.edu/lawn-and-garden/growing-strawberries/ (last visited 
January 12, 2022).  BILL: CS/SB 1006   	Page 3 
 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
None. 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill creates section 15.0522 of the Florida Statutes. 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Substantial Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
CS by Agriculture on January 13, 2022: 
Clarifies that the Florida Strawberry Festival occurs each year versus each spring.  BILL: CS/SB 1006   	Page 4 
 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.