Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1160 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 01/14/2022

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Transportation  
 
BILL: SB 1160 
INTRODUCER:  Senator Perry 
SUBJECT:  Transportation Research 
DATE: January 14, 2022 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Price Vickers TR Pre-meeting 
2.     ED  
3.     RC  
 
I. Summary: 
SB 1160 establishes the Implementing Solutions from Transportation Research and Evaluating 
Emerging Technologies Living Lab (I-STREET) within the University of Florida (UF) and 
provides for its duties relating to transportation research, education, workforce development, and 
related issues. The bill requires I-STREET, by July 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, to provide 
to the Governor, the President of the Senate, and the Speaker of the House of Representatives a 
report outlining its goals, as well as its efforts and progress on reaching those goals. 
 
The bill also creates an advisory board to periodically review and advise I-STREET concerning 
its research program. The board consists of nine members in transportation-related areas, as 
follows: 
 Two members, one each appointed by the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the 
House of Representatives. 
 Two members, who are the Secretaries of Transportation and of Economic Opportunity, or 
their designees. 
 One member from the Florida Transportation Commission. 
 Four members nominated by UF’s College of Engineering and approved by UF’s president, 
which nominees may include representatives of UF, other academic and research institutions, 
or private entities. 
 
The costs associated with the I-STREET’s duties is unknown but is expected to be absorbed 
within the existing resources of the UF, the Florida Department of Transportation, and other 
participants. Transportation-related research with a focus on emerging technologies would be 
expected to facilitate planning, development, and implementation of transportation systems and 
facilities. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2022. 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 1160   	Page 2 
 
II. Present Situation: 
The I-STREET Living Lab 
UF’s College of Engineering Transportation Institute describes an existing partnership between 
I-STREET, the Florida Department of Transportation (FDOT), and the City of Gainesville 
creating the I-STREET Living Lab on the UF campus and surrounding highway network. “The 
testbed deploys and evaluates numerous advanced technologies including connected and 
autonomous vehicles, smart devices, and sensors. It also develops and applies novel applications 
to enhance mobility and safety.”
1
  
 
Based on a review of the website, the initial partnership appears to have contemplated a five-year 
project from 2017 to 2021.
2
 However, the website lists a number of “active” projects.
3
 In 
addition, according to the website, “It is anticipated that the testbed will become a permanent 
fixture at the University of Florida and testing will go on indefinitely.”
4
 
 
FDOT “UF I-STREET” Invitation 
The FDOT has issued an invitation to transportation industry leaders for participation in the “UF 
I-STREET program.” According to the FDOT: 
 
I-STREET is designed to assist in implementing emerging technologies 
aimed at safety and mobility improvements. The FDOT will develop 
requests for proposals (RFPs) utilizing the emerging technologies and will 
select vendors through a competitive bidding process. The selected vendor 
for each project will deploy technology solutions. The University of Florida 
will conduct before-and-after evaluations of implemented projects. After 
evaluation, the FDOT will consider whether to expand the successful I-
STREET projects elsewhere in the state. 
 
The FDOT has allocated funding for these innovative projects per fiscal 
year (FY) from FY 21 until FY 25. Each FY, the FDOT will fund multiple 
projects based on the projects' merits and safety and mobility improvement 
potential. The number of awards will vary depending on the project type 
and scope.
5
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
SB 1160 codifies the I-STREET Living Lab within the UF and requires it, at a minimum, to: 
 Conduct and facilitate research on issues related to innovative transportation mobility and 
safety technology development and deployment in this state and serve as an information 
                                                
11
 University of Florida Transportation Institute (UFTI), I-STREET Living Lab, available at I-STREET Living Lab - 
University of Florida Transportation Institute (ufl.edu) (last visited January 14, 2020). See UFTI, available at 
https://www.transportation.institute.ufl.edu/i-street-living-lab/faq/ (last visited January 14, 2020). 
2
 Id. 
3
 UFTI, available at Projects - University of Florida Transportation Institute (ufl.edu) (last visited January 14, 2020). 
4
 UFTI, FAQ, When will the testing begin and end?, available at FAQ - University of Florida Transportation Institute 
(ufl.edu) (last visited January 14, 2020). 
5
 FDOT, UF I-Street, available at UF I-STREET (fdot.gov) (last visited January 14, 2020).  BILL: SB 1160   	Page 3 
 
exchange and depository for the most current information pertaining to transportation 
research, education, workforce development, and related issues. 
 Be a continuing resource for the Legislature, the Florida Senate, the FDOT, local 
governments, the nation’s metropolitan regions, and the private sector in the area of 
transportation and related research. 
 Promote intercampus transportation and related research activities among Florida universities 
to enhance the ability of these universities to attract federal and private sector funding for 
transportation and related research. 
 Provide by July 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, to the Governor, the President of the Senate, 
and the Speaker of the House of Representatives a comprehensive report that outlines its 
clearly defined goals and its efforts and progress on reaching those goals. 
 
The bill also creates an advisory board to periodically review and advise I-STREET concerning 
its research program. The board consists of nine members in transportation-related areas, as 
follows: 
 Two members, one each appointed by the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the 
House of Representatives. 
 Two members, who are the Secretaries of Transportation and of Economic Opportunity, or 
their designees. 
 One member from the Florida Transportation Commission. 
 Four members nominated by UF’s College of Engineering and approved by UF’s president, 
which nominees may include representatives of UF, other academic and research institutions, 
or private entities. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None identified.  BILL: SB 1160   	Page 4 
 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
To the extent that a private sector entity participates in I-STREET activities, that entity 
may incur costs in an indeterminate amount. The bill does not provide funding for any 
costs associated with participation. 
 
Transportation-related research with a focus on emerging technologies would be expected 
to facilitate planning, development, and implementation of transportation systems and 
facilities. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
The costs associated with the I-STREET’s duties is unknown but is expected to be 
absorbed within the existing resources of the UF, the FDOT, and other potential 
government sector participants. The bill does not provide funding for any costs associated 
with participation. 
 
Transportation-related research with a focus on emerging technologies would be expected 
to facilitate planning, development, and implementation of transportation systems and 
facilities. 
 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill creates the following sections of the Florida Statutes:  334.066. 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None.  BILL: SB 1160   	Page 5 
 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.