Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1360 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/14/2022

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Rules 
 
BILL: SB 1360 
INTRODUCER:  Senator Wright 
SUBJECT:  Governor’s Medal of Freedom 
DATE: February 14, 2022 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Brown Caldwell MS Favorable 
2. Brown Phelps RC Pre-meeting 
 
I. Summary: 
SB 1360 saves from repeal the Governor’s Medal of Freedom. The Governor’s Medal of 
Freedom authorizes the Governor to present a medal of freedom to a person who has made an 
especially meritorious contribution to the state. 
 
The bill replaces the term “citizens” with “residents.” 
 
The repealer date of July 1, 2022, is removed from statute. 
II. Present Situation: 
Governor’s Medal of Freedom 
The Governor’s Medal of Freedom, enacted in the state in 2020
1
, authorizes the Governor to 
present a medal to a person who has made an especially meritorious contribution to the citizens 
of the state, its culture, or other significant public or private endeavor.
2
 The medal itself contains 
an inscription and a ribbon.
3
 
 
If the Governor has selected a recipient who has died prior to being awarded the medal, the 
Governor may present the medal to a person otherwise designated.
4
 
 
Authority for the Governor’s Medal of Freedom is set to expire July 1, 2022. Florida is the only 
state to statutorily authorize a Governor’s Medal of Freedom. 
 
                                                
1
 Ch. 2020-114, Laws of Fla. 
2
 Section 14.35, F.S. 
3
 Section 14.35(1), F.S. 
4
 Section 14.35(2)(a), F.S. 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 1360   	Page 2 
 
Previous Recipients of the Medal of Freedom 
The Governor has previously twice awarded the Medal of Freedom. On April 7, 2021, the 
Governor awarded the inaugural Medal of Freedom to Bobby Bowden, long-time head football 
coach for the Florida State University.
5
 In support, the Governor cited not only Coach Bowden’s 
formidable achievement in launching the Florida State University Seminoles into a top 
nationally-recognized football program, but also his positive and enduring influence on the 
student athletes.
6
 During the ceremony, the Governor proclaimed April 7, 2021, Bobby Bowden 
Day.
7
 
 
On September 16, 2021, the Governor presented the Medal of Freedom to Felix Rodriguez, a 
former paramilitary officer in the CIA who served during the Bay of Pigs Invasion, and also as 
an Army Colonel during the conflict in Vietnam.
8
 At the presentation ceremony, the Governor 
noted, “Felix’s life has been dedicated to fighting communism, to supporting freedom, to 
supporting liberty, and we appreciate Felix as a brave and courageous freedom fighter.”
9
 In 
addition to awarding the Medal of Freedom, the Governor proclaimed September 16, 2021 Felix 
I. Rodriguez-Mendigutia Day.
10
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
SB 1360 saves from repeal the Governor’s Medal of Freedom, thereby enabling the Governor to 
award Medals of Freedom. The Governor may present a Medal of Freedom to a person who has 
made an especially meritorious contribution to the state. 
 
The bill replaces the term “citizens” with “residents.” 
 
The repealer date of July 1, 2022, is removed from statute. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2022. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
                                                
5
 The Florida Channel, 4/7/21 Ceremony to Honor Florida Medal of Freedom Recipient Bobby Bowden, available at 4/7/21 
Ceremony to Honor Florida Medal of Freedom Recipient Bobby Bowden - The Florida Channel 
6
 Id. 
7
 Id. 
8
 Executive Office of the Governor, Press Release: Governor Ron DeSantis Awards Felix Rodriguez with Governor’s Medal 
of Freedom, Sept. 17, 2021, available at Governor Ron DeSantis Awards Felix Rodríguez with Governor’s Medal of 
Freedom (flgov.com) 
9
 Id. 
10
 Id.  BILL: SB 1360   	Page 3 
 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None identified. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
A fiscal impact is not expected; therefore, an appropriation is not needed. 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill substantially amends section 14.35 of the Florida Statutes. 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.