Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0021 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 01/19/2023

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0021a.TMS 
DATE: 1/19/2023 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: CS/HB 21    Transportation Facility Designations 
SPONSOR(S): Transportation & Modals Subcommittee, Sirois 
TIED BILLS:    IDEN./SIM. BILLS:   
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Transportation & Modals Subcommittee 18 Y, 0 N, As CS Lewis Hinshelwood 
2) Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations 
Subcommittee 
   
3) Infrastructure Strategies Committee   
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
State law authorizes legislative designations of transportation facilities, such as bridges, interchanges, or 
portions of roads, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular facility. Legislative 
designations do not change the official names of the facilities and do not require local governments and private 
entities to change street signs, mailing addresses, or 911 emergency telephone system listings to account for 
the designations. The Department of Transportation (DOT) may not erect the markers for each designation 
unless the appropriate city or county commission enacts a resolution supporting the designation.  
 
The bill designates the “Dr. Sally Ride Memorial Bridge” in Brevard County. Under the bill, DOT must erect 
suitable markers for the designation.   
 
The bill will have an insignificant negative fiscal impact to the State Transportation Trust Fund associated with 
erecting suitable markers for the designation. The cost can be absorbed within DOT’s existing resources. 
 
The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2023.  
   STORAGE NAME: h0021a.TMS 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 1/19/2023 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Present Situation 
 
Transportation Facility Designations  
Under current law, the Legislature may designate a transportation facility, such as a bridge, 
interchange, or portion of a road, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular 
facility. Legislative designations do not officially change the existing names of the facilities and do not 
require local governments or private entities to change street signs, mailing addresses, or 911 
emergency telephone-number system listings to account for the designations.
1
 
 
Regarding the naming of state buildings and other facilities, state law provides that except as 
specifically provided by law, state buildings, roads, bridges, parks, recreational complexes, and other 
similar facilities may not be named for a living person.
2
   
 
Road Markers 
When the Legislature establishes road or bridge designations, the Department of Transportation (DOT) 
is required to place a marker at each terminus or intersection of the highway segment or bridge 
designated and may erect other markers it deems appropriate for the designated transportation facility.
3
 
Markers may not be erected until the appropriate city or county commission passes a resolution in 
support of the particular designation. Additionally, if the designated facility is located in multiple cities or 
counties, each affected local government must pass a resolution in support of the designation before 
DOT can install the markers.
4
  
 
Dr. Sally Ride 
In 1977, Dr. Sally Ride was one of only six women selected for the National Aeronautics and Space 
Administration’s (NASA’s) class of 1978. On June 18, 1983, Dr. Ride became the first American woman 
in space, and at the age of 32, the youngest American in space as one of five crew members aboard 
the space shuttle Challenger STS-7. Dr. Ride returned to space on October 5, 1984, aboard another 
shuttle mission, the STS-41G, and continued working for NASA until 1987.
5
 Dr. Ride was passionate 
about improving science and mathematics education and helping young women and girls foster an 
interest in science. Dr. Ride passed away on July 23, 2012, after a 17-month battle with pancreatic 
cancer at the age of 61.
6
  
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
Under the bill, upon completion of construction, the new NASA Causeway Bridge on S.R. 405 over the 
Indian River in Brevard County is designated as “Dr. Sally Ride Memorial Bridge.” The bill directs DOT 
to erect suitable markers.  
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Section 1: Designates “Dr. Sally Ride Memorial Bridge”; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.  
 
Section 2: Provides an effective date of July 1, 2023.  
                                                
1
 S. 334.071(1), F.S.  
2
 S. 267.062(1), F.S.  
3
 S. 334.071(2), F.S. 
4
 S. 334.071(3), F.S. 
5
 National Women’s History Museum, Sally Ride, https://www.womenshistory.org/education-resources/biographies/sally-
ride (last visited Jan. 5, 2023).  
6
 Sally Ride Science at UC San Diego, Dr. Sally Ride, https://sallyridescience.ucsd.edu/about/sallyride/ (last visited Jan. 5, 
2023)  STORAGE NAME: h0021a.TMS 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 1/19/2023 
  
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
DOT estimates a cost of $1,480 per designation for the appropriate markers, which provides for two 
signs per designation at $740 per sign.
7
 Therefore, the bill has an estimated negative fiscal impact 
of $1,480 to the State Transportation Trust Fund. This cost can be absorbed within existing DOT 
resources.
8
 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None. 
 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
Not applicable. This bill does not appear to affect county or municipal governments.  
 
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
None.  
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None. 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
On January 17, 2023, the Transportation and Modals Subcommittee considered one amendment, which 
was adopted, and reported the bill favorably as a committee substitute. The amendment clarifies that the 
                                                
7
 Email from Amanda Marsh, Legislative Programs Office, Florida Department of Transportation, RE: FDOT Memorial 
Roadway Designation Sign Estimate (Dec. 28, 2022).  
8
 Id.  STORAGE NAME: h0021a.TMS 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 1/19/2023 
  
bridge designation is for the new NASA Causeway Bridge currently being constructed, not the existing twin 
bascule bridges. 
 
The staff analysis has been updated to reflect the committee substitute.