Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0161 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/16/2023

                       
 
CS/HB 161  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0161-01-c1 
Page 1 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to homestead exemptions for persons 2 
age 65 and older; amending s. 196.075, F.S.; 3 
increasing the just value limit of real estate 4 
eligible for the homestead tax exemption that may be 5 
adopted by counties or municipalities for certain 6 
persons age 65 and older; requiring certain local 7 
government entities to amend or adopt an ordinance to 8 
comply with this act; requiring certain adopted or 9 
amended ordinances to be delivered to a certain person 10 
by a specified date; providing that certain ordinances 11 
are null and void on a certain date; providing that 12 
certain recipients of a homestead exemption during a 13 
specified tax year do not need to submit an additional 14 
application; providing for future repeal; providing 15 
effective dates. 16 
 17 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 18 
 19 
 Section 1.  Paragraph (b) of subsection (2) of section 20 
196.075, Florida Statutes, is amended to read: 21 
 196.075  Additional homestead exemption for persons 65 and 22 
older.— 23 
 (2)  In accordance with s. 6(d), Art. VII of the State 24 
Constitution, the board of county commissioners of any county or 25     
 
CS/HB 161  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0161-01-c1 
Page 2 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
the governing authority of any municipality may adopt an 26 
ordinance to allow either or both of the following additional 27 
homestead exemptions: 28 
 (b)  The amount of the assessed value of the property for a 29 
person who has the legal or equitable title to real estate with 30 
a just value less than $300,000 $250,000, as determined in the 31 
first tax year that the owner applies and is eligible for the 32 
exemption, and who has maintained thereon the permanent 33 
residence of the owner for at least 25 years, who has attained 34 
age 65, and whose household income does not exceed the income 35 
limitation prescribed in p aragraph (a), as calculated in 36 
subsection (3). 37 
 Section 2.  (1)  If the amendment to the State Constitution 38 
proposed by HJR 159, or a similar joint resolution having 39 
substantially the same specific intent and purpose, is approved 40 
at the next general elec tion or at an earlier special election 41 
specifically authorized by law for that purpose, the board of 42 
county commissioners of any county or the governing authority of 43 
any municipality that has an adopted ordinance that allows an 44 
additional homestead exempti on pursuant to s. 196.075(2)(b), 45 
Florida Statutes, must amend such ordinance or adopt a new 46 
ordinance to reflect the increase in the just value limitation 47 
from $250,000 to $300,000 specified in s. 196.075(2)(b), Florida 48 
Statutes, as amended by this act, as follows: 49 
 (a)  A board of county commissioners or the governing 50     
 
CS/HB 161  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0161-01-c1 
Page 3 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
authority of a municipality may prospectively amend an ordinance 51 
authorizing an additional homestead exemption pursuant to s. 52 
196.075(2)(b), Florida Statutes, or adopt a new ordinance to 53 
comply with this subsection at any time before the election, 54 
contingent upon voter approval of the amendment to the State 55 
Constitution proposed by HJR 159 or a similar joint resolution 56 
having substantially the same intent and purpose. 57 
 (b)  If the board of cou nty commissioners or the governing 58 
authority of a municipality that has an ordinance authorizing an 59 
additional homestead exemption pursuant to s. 196.075(2)(b), 60 
Florida Statutes, has not prospectively amended or replaced such 61 
ordinance pursuant to paragrap h (a) before the election, such 62 
board or governing authority must amend the existing ordinance 63 
or adopt a new ordinance either repealing the exemption or 64 
adopting the new just value limitation effective January 1, 65 
2025, on or before December 31, 2024. Notw ithstanding s. 66 
196.075(6), Florida Statutes, such ordinance must be delivered 67 
to the property appraiser no later than January 15, 2025. 68 
 (c)  Any ordinance that does not comport with the revised 69 
just value limitation provided for in s. 196.075(2)(b), Flori da 70 
Statutes, by January 1, 2025, is deemed null and void effective 71 
January 1, 2025. 72 
 (d)  For a county or municipality that had an ordinance in 73 
effect that granted the additional homestead exemption 74 
authorized under s. 196.075(2)(b), Florida Statutes, for the 75     
 
CS/HB 161  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0161-01-c1 
Page 4 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
2024 tax year and that adopts or amends an ordinance pursuant to 76 
paragraph (a) or paragraph (b), persons receiving the exemption 77 
for the 2024 tax year shall continue to receive the exemption 78 
for the 2025 tax year without having to submit an additional 79 
application, provided that the other conditions in s. 196.075, 80 
Florida Statutes, are met. 81 
 (2)  This section is repealed December 31, 2025. 82 
 Section 3. This section and section 2 shall take effect on 83 
July 1, 2023, and section 1 shall take effect on the effective 84 
date of the amendment to the State Constitution proposed by HJR 85 
159 or a similar joint resolution having substantially the same 86 
specific intent and purpose , if such amendment to the State 87 
Constitution is approved at the next general election or at an 88 
earlier special election specifically authorized by law for that 89 
purpose. 90