Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0421 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/16/2023

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0421a.TMS 
DATE: 3/16/2023 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: CS/HB 421    Driving in the Furthermost Left-hand Lane of a Roadway 
SPONSOR(S): Transportation & Modals Subcommittee, Persons-Mulicka and others 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 464 
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Transportation & Modals Subcommittee 15 Y, 0 N, As CS Johnson Hinshelwood 
2) Infrastructure Strategies Committee   
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
Under Florida law, on any road, street, or highway having two or more lanes going the same direction, a driver 
may not continue to operate a motor vehicle in the furthermost left-hand lane if he or she knows or reasonably 
should know that he or she is being overtaken in that lane from the rear by a motor vehicle traveling at a higher 
speed. This does not apply to drivers operating a vehicle that is overtaking another vehicle proceeding in the 
same direction, or is preparing for a left turn at an intersection. A violation is a noncriminal traffic infraction, 
punishable as a moving violation. The statutory base fine is $60, but with additional fees and surcharges, the 
total penalty may be up to $158. 
 
The bill provides that on any road, street, or highway having two or more lanes allowing movement in the same 
direction with a posted speed limit of at least 65 miles per hour, a driver may not operate a motor vehicle in the 
furthermost left-hand lane, except when overtaking and passing another vehicle, when preparing to exit the 
road, street, or highway, or when otherwise directed by an official traffic control device. This provision does not 
apply to authorized emergency vehicles and vehicles engaged in highway maintenance or construction 
operations. The bill also defines the term “furthermost left-hand lane” to exclude from that term high-
occupancy-vehicle lanes and designated left-turn lanes. A violation is a noncriminal traffic infraction, 
punishable as a moving violation. The statutory base fine is $60, but with additional fees and surcharges, the 
total penalty may be up to $158. 
 
The bill has an indeterminate fiscal impact on the state and the private sector. 
 
The bill has an effective date of January 1, 2024. 
 
   STORAGE NAME: h0421a.TMS 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/16/2023 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Current Situation 
 
Under Florida law, a vehicle must be driven upon the right half of the roadway, except: 
 When overtaking and passing another vehicle proceeding in the same direction under the rules 
governing such movement; 
 When an obstruction exists making it necessary to drive to the left of the center of the highway, 
provided any person so doing yields the right-of-way to all vehicles traveling in the proper 
direction upon the unobstructed portion of the highway within such distance as to constitute an 
immediate hazard; 
 Upon a roadway divided into three marked lanes for traffic under the rules applicable thereon; or 
 Upon a roadway designated and signposted for one-way traffic.
1
 
 
Upon all roadways, any vehicle proceeding at less than the normal speed of traffic must be driven in 
the right-hand lane then available for traffic or as close as practicable to the right-hand curb or edge of 
the roadway except when overtaking and passing another vehicle proceeding in the same direction or 
when preparing for a left turn.
2
 
 
On a road, street, or highway having two or more lanes allowing movement in the same direction, a 
driver may not continue to operate a motor vehicle in the furthermost left-hand lane if the driver knows 
or reasonably should know that he or she is being overtaken in that lane from the rear by a motor 
vehicle traveling at a higher rate of speed. This does not apply to drivers operating a vehicle that is 
overtaking another vehicle proceeding in the same direction, or is preparing for a left turn at an 
intersection.
3
 
 
Upon any roadway having four or more lanes for moving traffic and providing for two-way movement of 
traffic, a vehicle may not be driven to the left of the centerline of the roadway, except when authorized 
by official traffic control devices designating certain lanes to the left side of the center of the roadway 
for use by traffic not otherwise permitted to use such lanes, or except as permitted to drive around an 
obstruction. However, this may not be construed as prohibiting the crossing of the centerline in making 
a left turn.
4
 
 
A violation of the above laws is a noncriminal traffic infraction, punishable as a moving violation.
5
 The 
statutory base fine is $60,
6
 but with additional fees and surcharges, the total penalty may be up to 
$158.
7
 
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
The bill provides that on any road, street, or highway having two or more lanes allowing movement in 
the same direction with a posted speed limit of at least 65 miles per hour, a driver may not operate a 
motor vehicle in the furthermost left-hand lane, except when overtaking and passing another vehicle, 
when preparing to exit the road, street, or highway, or when otherwise directed by an official traffic 
control device. This does not apply to authorized emergency vehicles and vehicles engaged in highway 
maintenance or construction operations. 
                                                
1
 S. 316.081(1), F.S. 
2
 S. 316.081(2), F.S. 
3
 S. 316.081(3), F.S. 
4
 S. 316.081(4), F.S. 
5
 S. 316.081(5), F.S. 
6
 S. 318.18(3)(a), F.S. 
7
 Florida Association of Clerk of Courts, 2022 Distribution Schedule of Court-Related Filing Fees, Service Charges, Costs and Fines,  p. 
42. https://cdn.ymaws.com/www.flclerks.com/resource/resmgr/advisories/2022/22bull098_attach_2_2022_dist.pdf (last visited Mar. 8, 
2023).  STORAGE NAME: h0421a.TMS 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/16/2023 
  
 
The term “furthermost left-hand lane” means the farthest most left-hand lane, except that, except if 
such left-hand lane is a high-occupancy-vehicle lane,
8
 or is designated as a left-hand turn lane, the 
furthermost left-hand lane is that lane immediately to the right of such high-occupancy-vehicle lane or 
left-hand turn lane. 
 
A violation is a noncriminal traffic infraction, punishable as a moving violation. The statutory base fine is 
$60, but with additional fees and surcharges, the total penalty may be up to $158. 
 
The bill has an effective date of January 1, 2024. 
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Section 1 Amends s. 316.081, F.S., relating to driving on the right side of roadway; exceptions. 
 
Section 2 Provides an effective date of January 1, 2024. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
Indeterminate. See “Fiscal Comments” section below. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
Indeterminate. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
The Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles (DHSMV) will need to update its driver 
handbook, driver license test question bank, driver improvement course curricula, and the Uniform 
Traffic Citation Manual to reflect the change in the law. DHSMV will also need to train Florida Highway 
Patrol members on this change.
9
 
 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
                                                
8
 Section 316.0741(1)(a), F.S., defines the term “high-occupancy-vehicle lane” or “HOV lane” to mean a lane of a public roadway 
designated for use by vehicles in which there is more than one occupant unless otherwise authorized by federal law. 
9
 Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, Agency Analysis of 2023 House Bill 421, p. 2-3. (Mar. 6, 2023)  STORAGE NAME: h0421a.TMS 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 3/16/2023 
  
Not applicable. This bill does not appear to affect county or municipal governments. 
 
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
None. 
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None. 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
On March 15, 2023, the Transportation & Modals Subcommittee adopted one amendment and reported the bill 
favorably as a committee substitute. The amendment removes the word “continuously” from the bill and 
defines the term “furthermost left-hand lane” to exclude from that term high-occupancy-vehicle lanes and 
designated left-turn lanes. 
 
The staff analysis has been updated to reflect the committee substitute.