Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0477 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/07/2023

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0477.CIS 
DATE: 2/7/2023 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 477    Term Limits for District School Board Members 
SPONSOR(S): Rizo 
TIED BILLS:  None. IDEN./SIM. BILLS: None. 
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Choice & Innovation Subcommittee  	Wolff Sleap 
2) Education & Employment Committee   
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
Florida’s Constitution provides that each school district must be governed by a school board composed of five 
or more elected members elected to staggered, 4-year terms, as provided by law. In 2022, the Legislature 
established a term limit of 12 years for district school board members. This term limit applies to those 
individuals elected on or after November 8, 2022.  
 
The bill aligns district school board term limits to the other term limits provided for in the Florida Constitution. 
The bill prohibits a school board member from appearing on a ballot for reelection if the member will have 
served, or would have served if not for resignation, in that office for 8 consecutive years. The proposed 
limitation would apply only to terms of office beginning on or after November 8, 2022, and is prospective, so 
that school board members reelected to a consecutive term in 2022 could serve another 8 consecutive years 
before reaching the term limit. 
 
The bill does not have a fiscal impact. 
 
The bill takes effect on July 1, 2023.   STORAGE NAME: h0477.CIS 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 2/7/2023 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Present Situation 
 
District School Board Member Terms of Office 
 
The Florida Constitution provides that “[i]n each school district there shall be a school board composed 
of five or more members chosen by vote of the electors in a nonpartisan election for appropriately 
staggered terms of four years, as provided by law.”
1
 This provision has been interpreted to allow school 
board member qualifications to be established by statute.
2
 The Florida Constitution does not address 
the number of terms a school board member may serve.
3
  
 
However, Florida’s Constitution establishes term limits for the following elected officials:
4
 
 Florida Governor; 
 Florida representatives; 
 Florida senators; 
 Florida Lieutenant Governor; 
 Florida Cabinet members; 
 U.S. representatives from Florida; and 
 U.S. senators from Florida. 
 
Term limits imposed by states for federal elected officials were held to be unconstitutional, and thus 
unenforceable, by the U.S. Supreme Court in 1995.
5
 
 
The Florida Constitution states that none of these officials, except for the office of Governor which is 
governed by a slightly different provision, may appear on a ballot for reelection if, by the end of the 
current term of office, the person will have served or, but for resignation, would have served in that 
office for eight consecutive years.
6
 These term limits became effective in 1992 and were prospective, 
so that officials reelected to a consecutive term in 1992 could serve another consecutive eight years 
before reaching the term limit.
7
  
 
In 2022, the Legislature established a term limit of 12 years for district school board members.
8
 This 
term limit applies to those individuals elected on or after November 8, 2022.
9
 The term limit is 
prospective, so that school board members reelected to a consecutive term in 2022 could serve 
another 12 consecutive years before being term limited.
10
 Currently, Duval County is the only district to 
                                                
1
 Art. IX, s. 4(a), Fla. Const. 
2
 In Askew v. Thomas, 293 So.2d 40, 42 (Fla. 1974), the court interpreted section 4(a) of article IX and refused to invoke the 
constitutional principle that “statutes imposing additional qualifications for office are unconstitutional where the basic document of the 
constitution itself has already undertaken to set forth those requirement” because that section does not address school board member 
qualifications. Similarly, in Telli v. Broward County, 94 So. 3d 504 (Fla. 2012), the court receded from prior opinions which held that 
article VI, section 4(b), Florida Constitution, listing the state elected offices with mandatory term limits, prohibited the imposition of 
term limits on other officials. The court held that “[i]nterpreting Florida's Constitution to find implied restrictions on powers otherwise 
authorized is unsound in principle” and that “express restrictions must be found not implied.” Id. at 513. 
3
 Art. IX, s. 4(a), Fla. Const.  
4
 Art. VI, s. 4(c), Fla. Const. See also art. IV, s. 5(b), Fla. Const. 
5
 See U.S. Term Limits, Inc. v. Thornton, 514 U.S. 779 (1995). See also Ray v. Mortham, 742 So. 2d 1276 (Fla. 1999) (holding that 
term limits imposed on elected state officials were severable from provisions imposing term limits on elected federal officials). 
6
 Art. VI, s. 4(c), Fla. Const. 
7
 See Art. VI, s. 4, Fla. Const. (1992); Billy Buzzett and Steven J. Uhlfelder, Constitution Revision Commission: A Retrospective and 
Prospective Sketch, The Florida Bar Journal (April 1997), https://www.floridabar.org/the-florida-bar-journal/constitution-revision-
commission-a-retrospective-and-prospective-sketch (last visited Jan 24, 2023).  
8
 Section 1001.35, F.S. 
9
 Id. 
10
 Id.  STORAGE NAME: h0477.CIS 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 2/7/2023 
  
have established a more restrictive term limit for its school board members of two consecutive full 
terms of 4 years.
11
  
 
Effect of Proposed Changes 
 
The bill prohibits a school board member from appearing on a ballot for reelection if, by the end of his 
or her current term of office, the member will have served, or would have served if not for resignation, 
in that office for 8 consecutive years. The proposed limitation would apply only to terms of office 
beginning on or after November 8, 2022, and is prospective, so that school board members reelected 
to a consecutive term in 2022 could serve another 8 consecutive years before reaching the term limit. 
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Section 1: Amends s. 1001.35, F.S.; revising the term limits for district school board members. 
 
Section 2: Providing an effective date. 
 
II. FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None. 
 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
None. 
 
                                                
11
 Charter of the City of Jacksonville, Florida, art. 13, s. 13.15, 
https://library.municode.com/fl/jacksonville/codes/code_of_ordinances?nodeId=CHRELA_PTACHLA CHJAFL_ART13DUCOSCB
O. (last visited Jan. 27, 2023)   STORAGE NAME: h0477.CIS 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 2/7/2023 
  
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
None. 
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None. 
 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
Not applicable.