Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0567 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 07/10/2023

                     
This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0567z1.LFS.docx 
DATE: 7/10/2023 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 567    Lake Padgett Estates Independent Special District, Pasco County 
SPONSOR(S): Steele and Yarkosky 
TIED BILLS:    IDEN./SIM. BILLS:   
 
 
 
 
FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 113 Y’s 
 
0 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Approved 
 
 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
HB 567 passed the House on March 31, 2023, and subsequently passed the Senate on May 4, 2023.   
 
A “special district” is a unit of local government created for a particular purpose, with jurisdiction to operate 
within a limited geographic boundary. Special districts are created by general law, special act, local ordinance, 
or rule of the Governor and Cabinet. A “dependent special district” is a special district subject to significant 
control by the governing body of a single county or municipality.   
 
The Lake Padgett Estates Independent Special District (District) is an independent special district created in 
2006 by special act. The District encompasses approximately 775 acres of land in Pasco County. The District’s 
board is composed of five members serving two-year terms. Members of the board must be United States 
citizens and qualified electors who live in the District. If a vacancy occurs during the term of office, the 
remaining members of the board fill each vacancy by appointment for the remainder of the unexpired term. 
 
The bill increases the term of District board members from two years to four years, beginning with members 
elected during the 2024 general election. The bill provides that two members of the board elected during the 
2024 general election will serve a two-year term for the purpose of creating staggered terms. All members 
elected beginning in the 2026 general election will hold office for a four-year term until their successors are 
elected. 
 
According to the economic impact statement, the bill is not expected to have a fiscal impact. 
 
The bill was approved by the Governor on June 12, 2023, ch. 2023-327, L.O.F., and will become effective on 
July 1, 2023.  
    
STORAGE NAME: h0567z1.LFS.docx 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 7/10/2023 
  
I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION 
 
A. EFFECT OF CHANGES:  
 
Present Situation 
 
Special Districts 
 
A “special district” is a unit of local government created for a particular purpose, with jurisdiction to 
operate within a limited geographic boundary.
1
 A special district may be created by general law, special 
act, local ordinance, or rule of the Governor and Cabinet.
2
 A special district has only those powers 
expressly provided by, or reasonably implied from, the authority provided in the district’s charter.
3
 
Special districts provide specific municipal services in addition to, or in place of, those provided by a 
municipality or county.
4
  
 
A “dependent special district” is a special district meeting at least one of the following criteria: 
 The membership of the district’s governing body is identical to the governing body of a single 
county or municipality; 
 All members of the district’s governing body are appointed by the governing body of a single 
county or municipality; 
 Members of the district’s governing body are removable at will by the governing body of a single 
county or municipality; or 
 The district’s budget is subject to approval by the governing body of a single county or 
municipality.
5
  
 
An “independent special district” is any district that is not a dependent special district or one that 
includes more than one county unless the district lies wholly within a single municipality.
6
  
 
Lake Padgett Estates Independent Special District 
 
The Lake Padgett Estates Independent Special District (District) is an independent special district 
created in 2006 by special act.
7
 The District encompasses approximately 775 acres of land in Pasco 
County.
8
 The District was established to maintain, operate, and improve recreational amenities and 
associated infrastructure within its jurisdictional boundaries.
9
 The District is financed by special 
                                                
1
 S. 189.012(6), F.S. See also Halifax Hospital Medical Center v. State of Fla., et al., 278 So. 3d 545, 547-48 (Fla. 2019). 
2
 S. 189.012(6), F.S. 
3
 See ss. 189.02(4)-(5) and 189.031(3), F.S. Counties and municipalities have “home rule” powers allowing them to enact ordinances 
not inconsistent with general or special law for governmental, corporate, or proprietary purposes. Special districts do not possess home 
rule powers and are permitted to impose only those taxes, assessments, or fees authorized by special or general law. See art. VIII, ss. 
1(f) and (g), 2(b), s. 6(e), Fla. Const. and ss. 125.01 and 166.021, F.S. See also Local Gov’t Formation Manual 62, available at 
https://myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/committeesdetail.aspx?CommitteeId=3227 (last visited Mar. 6, 2023). 
4
 Local Gov’t Formation Manual at 62 available at 
https://myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/committeesdetail.aspx?CommitteeId=3227 (last visited Mar. 6, 2023). 
5
 S. 189.012(2), F.S. 
6
 S. 189.012(3), F.S. Independent special districts are created by the Legislature, unless another mechanism is authorized by general 
law. See, e.g. s. 190.005, F.S. (community development districts may be created by a county, municipality, or the Florida Land and 
Water Adjudicatory Commission, depending on the size and location of the district). 
7
 Ch. 2006-317, Laws of Fla. 
8
 Lake Padgett Estates, Independent Special District Overview, https://www.lakepadgettisd.org/about-the-isd (last visited Mar. 6, 2023). 
9
 Ch. 2006-317, s. 2(2), Laws of Fla.   
STORAGE NAME: h0567z1.LFS.docx 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 7/10/2023 
  
assessments levied on properties in the district.
10
 The District’s adopted budget for Fiscal Year 2022-23 
is $595,279.
11
 
 
The District’s board is composed of five members serving two-year terms.
12
 Members of the board must 
be United States citizens and qualified electors who live in the District. If a vacancy occurs during the 
term of office, the remaining members of the board fill each vacancy by appointment for the remainder 
of the unexpired term.
13
 Board members may receive compensation of $50 per board meeting, not to 
exceed $1,200 per year or an amount established by the electors of the District voting in a 
referendum.
14
 Members may also receive travel and per diem expenses as provided by general law. 
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
The bill increases the term of office for District board members from two years to four years, beginning 
with members elected during the 2024 general election. The bill provides that two members of the 
board elected during the 2024 general election will serve a two-year term for the purpose of creating 
staggered terms. All members elected beginning in the 2026 general election will hold office for a four-
year term until their successors are elected. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
  
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 None. 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
      C.  ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT FILED? Yes [X] No [] 
 
      D.  NOTICE PUBLISHED?     Yes [X] No [] 
      IF YES, WHEN?             December 14, 2022 
      WHERE?                        The Laker/Lutz News, a weekly newspaper of general circulation in Pasco   
                                                
10
 See Ch. 2006-317, s. 6, Laws of Fla. (district authorized to levy special assessments, but must have subsequent referendum to levy 
ad valorem taxes) and Lake Padgett Estates Independent Special District Adopted Budget for Fiscal Year 2022-2023, available at 
https://www.lakepadgettisd.org/documents (last visited Mar. 6, 2023). 
11
Lake Padgett Estates Independent Special District Adopted Budget for Fiscal Year 2022-2023, available at 
https://www.lakepadgettisd.org/documents (last visited Mar. 6, 2023). 
12
 Ch. 2006-317, s. 4(2)(a), Laws of Fla. 
13
 Ch. 2006-317, s. 4(3), Laws of Fla. 
14
 Ch. 2006-317, s. 4(8), Laws of Fla.   
STORAGE NAME: h0567z1.LFS.docx 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 7/10/2023 
  
                                               County, Florida. 
 
      E.  REFERENDUM(S) REQUIRED?  Yes [] No [X]