Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0617 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/16/2023

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0617a.LFS 
DATE: 3/16/2023 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: CS/HB 617    Private Property for Motor Vehicle Parking 
SPONSOR(S): Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee, Lopez, V. and others 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 694 
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special 
Districts Subcommittee 
17 Y, 0 N, As CS Mwakyanjala Darden 
2) State Affairs Committee    
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
Current law authorizes the owner or operator of private property used for motor vehicle parking facility to 
establish rules and rates that govern private persons parking at the facility. These rates may include parking 
charges for violating the property owner or operator’s rules. Any rules or rates must be posted and clearly 
visible to those parking at the facility. Invoices for parking charges must contain specified information to show 
the charges are not being levied by a governmental entity. Counties and municipalities are prohibited from 
enacting an ordinance or regulation restricting or prohibiting the right of a private property owner or operator to 
establish such rules and rates. Any ordinance or regulation that violates the prohibition is null and void. 
 
The bill: 
 Requires invoices for parking charges to be sent to the registered owner of the vehicle by certified mail; 
 Prohibits owners or operators of privately-owned parking facilities from assessing a late fee for at least 
30 days after the postmarked date of mailing; 
 Prohibits counties and municipalities from enacting ordinances or regulations restricting in any manner 
the parking rates charged by property owners and operators of privately-owned parking facilities, 
including parking charges for violating the property owner’s or operator’s rules; 
 Prohibits counties and municipalities from enacting ordinances or regulations restricting parking 
charges for violating the rules established by the owner or operator of privately-owned parking facilities. 
 Establishes a ten-minute grace period in which owners and operators of privately-owned parking 
facilities may not charge vehicle operators that enter the parking property, if the vehicle does not park. 
 
 
   STORAGE NAME: h0617a.LFS 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/16/2023 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Present Situation 
 
Regulation of Vehicles Parked on Private Property 
 
Current law expressly authorizes the owner or operator of private property used as a motor vehicle 
parking facility to establish rules and rates that govern private persons parking at the facility.
1
 As part of 
establishing rules and rates, property owners or operators may also set parking charges for violating 
the parking facility’s rules. Any rules and rates must be posted and clearly visible to persons parking 
motor vehicles on the property. If the owner or operator of the property issues an invoice for any 
parking charges, that invoice must include the following statement in uppercase type: 
 
THIS INVOICE IS PRIVATELY ISSUED, IS NOT ISSUED BY A GOVERNMENTAL 
AUTHORITY, AND IS NOT SUBJECT TO CRIMINAL PENALTIES. 
 
Counties and municipalities are prohibited from enacting an ordinance or regulation restricting or 
prohibiting the right of a private property owner or operator to establish rules and rates.
2
 Any ordinance 
or regulation that violates this prohibition is null and void. 
 
In 2019, before the passage of the current law, the City of Miami passed an emergency ordinance 
banning the operators of privately-owned parking facilities in the city from issuing citations for violations 
of facility rules, claiming that such citations caused confusion for the recipients who sometimes thought 
the citations were city-issued and could lead to civil or criminal penalties.
3
 In 2021, the City of Miami 
amended the ordinance to authorize the issuance of private parking citations if they are not called a 
“violation, citation, or ticket” and include a notice informing the recipient that “[t]his invoice is privately 
issued, is not issued by a governmental authority, and is not subject to civil or criminal penalties.”
4
 That 
same year, Broward County enacted an ordinance making it “unlawful for any person, including a 
parking facility operator or agent, to issue a private ticket to a motor vehicle or to the owner of any such 
vehicle.”
5
 
 
Effect of Proposed Changes 
 
The bill requires invoices for parking charges to be sent to the registered owner of the vehicle by 
certified mail and prohibits the owner or operator of a privately-owned parking facility from assessing a 
late fee for at least 30 days after the postmarked date of the mailing. 
 
The bill revises the preemption concerning of a county or municipality’s ability to enact an ordinance or 
regulation restricting or prohibiting the rights of a private property owner or operator to apply to the local 
government’s ability to restrict in any manner the parking rates charged by the property owner or 
operator, including parking charges for violating the property owner or operator’s rules. 
 
The bill establishes a ten-minute grace period in which owners and operators of privately-owned 
parking facilities may not charge vehicle operators that enter the private property, if the vehicle does 
not park.  
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
                                                
1
 S. 715.075(1), F.S. 
2
 S. 715.075(2), F.S. 
3
 City of Miami, Fla. Ord. No. 13840 (enacted May 23, 2019); S. 25-292, City of Miami, Fla. Code of Ordinances.  
4
 City of Miami, Fla. Ord. No. 13990 (enacted April 22, 2021); S. 25-292, City of Miami, Fla. Code of Ordinances.  
5
 Broward County, Fla. Ord. No. 2021-43 (enacted Sept. 21, 2021); S. 20-164.2, Broward County, Fla. Code of Ordinances.   STORAGE NAME: h0617a.LFS 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/16/2023 
  
Section 1: Amends s. 715.075, F.S., relating to the use of private property for motor vehicle 
parking. 
 
Section 2: Provides an effective date of July 1, 2023. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STA TEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
The requirement to send invoices by certified mail, a 30-day waiting period before assessing late fees, 
and the ten-minute grace period may reduce the revenue of the owners and operators of privately-
owned parking facilities.  
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None. 
 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
Not Applicable. This bill does not appear to require counties or municipalities to spend funds or take 
action requiring the expenditures of funds; reduce the authority that counties or municipalities have 
to raise revenues in the aggregate; or reduce the percentage of state tax shared with counties or 
municipalities. 
 
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
The bill neither provides authority for nor requires rulemaking by executive branch agencies. 
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None.   STORAGE NAME: h0617a.LFS 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 3/16/2023 
  
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
On March 15, 2023, the Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee adopted a 
strike-all amendment and reported the bill favorably as a committee substitute. The committee substitute:  
 Requires invoices for parking charges issued to be sent to the registered owner of the vehicle by 
certified mail and prohibits owners or operators of privately-owned parking facilities from assessing 
a late fee for at least 30 days after the postmarked date of mailing; 
 Prohibits counties and municipalities from enacting ordinances or regulations restricting in any 
manner the parking rates charged by owners and operators of privately-owned parking facilities, 
including parking charges for violation of facility rules. 
 Establishes a ten-minute grace period in which owners and operators of privately-owned parking 
facilities may not charge vehicle operators that enter the property so long as the vehicle does not 
park. 
 
This analysis is drafted to the committee substitute as passed by the Local Administration, Federal 
Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee.