Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0691 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/09/2023

                       
 
HB 691  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0691-00 
Page 1 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A	T I V E S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to the recycling of covered electronic 2 
devices; creating s. 403.71853, F.S.; defining terms; 3 
establishing the statewide Covered Electronic Device 4 
Recovery Program within the Department of 5 
Environmental Protection; authorizing the department 6 
to use specified funds to administer the program; 7 
specifying requirements for a statewide plan for the 8 
recycling of covered electronic devices; requiring 9 
counties to submit a specified plan for the disposal 10 
of covered electronic devices by a specified date; 11 
requiring the owners or operators of certain 12 
facilities to dispose of such facilities' covered 13 
electronic devices in a permitted reclamation facility 14 
beginning on a specified date; prohibiting any person 15 
from disposing of covered electronic devices except at 16 
a permitted reclamation facility beginning on a 17 
specified date; providing civil penalties; authorizing 18 
such penalties to be waived under certain conditions ; 19 
providing applicability; requiring the department to 20 
deposit any funds received pursuant to the program 21 
into the Solid Waste Management Trust Fund to be used 22 
for specified purposes; requiring the department to 23 
adopt rules that meet certain requirements b y a 24 
specified date; providing an effective date. 25     
 
HB 691  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0691-00 
Page 2 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A	T I V E S 
 
 
 
 26 
 WHEREAS, it is recognized that China presents the broadest, 27 
most active and persistent cyber espionage threat to the United 28 
States Government and private sector networks, and 29 
 WHEREAS, the technology p roducts and services most 30 
vulnerable to malicious foreign exploitation are sold by 31 
companies that the Chinese Government influences through whole 32 
or partial ownership, direct funding, or members placed in high -33 
ranking company positions, and 34 
 WHEREAS, it is the intent of the Legislature to incentivize 35 
and provide the necessary infrastructure to recycle electronic 36 
and technology products in the state in order to reduce our 37 
economic reliance on such products made in China, NOW, 38 
THEREFORE, 39 
 40 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 41 
 42 
 Section 1.  Section 403.71853, Florida Statutes, is created 43 
to read: 44 
 403.71853  Recycling of covered electronic devices. — 45 
 (1)  DEFINITIONS.—As used in this section, the term: 46 
 (a)  "Covered electronic device" mea ns a computer, portable 47 
computer, computer monitor, or television, whether it has a 48 
cathode ray tube or flat panel based on any technology, with a 49 
screen size greater than 4 inches measured diagonally. The term 50     
 
HB 691  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0691-00 
Page 3 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A	T I V E S 
 
 
 
does not include an electronic device that is : 51 
 1.  A part of a motor vehicle or any component part of a 52 
motor vehicle assembled by or for a vehicle manufacturer or 53 
franchised dealer, including, but not limited to, replacement 54 
parts for use in a motor vehicle; 55 
 2.  Functionally or physically a part o f a larger piece of 56 
equipment designed and intended for use in an industrial, 57 
commercial, or medical setting, including, but not limited to, 58 
diagnostic, monitoring, or control equipment; 59 
 3.  Contained within a clothes washer, clothes dryer, 60 
refrigerator, refrigerator and freezer, microwave oven, 61 
conventional oven or range, dishwasher, room air conditioner, 62 
dehumidifier, or air purifier; or 63 
 4.  A telephone of any type. 64 
 (b)  "Reclamation facility" means a site permitted by the 65 
department where equipment is used to handle, process, 66 
disassemble, dismantle, shred, recapture, or store recoverable 67 
materials. The term includes, but is not limited to, composting 68 
or remediation facilities. 69 
 (2)  STATEWIDE COVERED ELECTRONIC DEVICE RECOVERY PROGRAM. —70 
The statewide Covered Electronic Device Recovery Program is 71 
established within the Department of Environmental Protection. 72 
The department may use funds from the Solid Waste Management 73 
Trust Fund to administer the program. The purpose of the program 74 
is to create a statewid e plan for the recycling of covered 75     
 
HB 691  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0691-00 
Page 4 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A	T I V E S 
 
 
 
electronic devices. In creating the statewide plan, the 76 
department must consider all of the following: 77 
 (a)  Existing collection and consolidation infrastructure 78 
for collecting covered electronic devices. 79 
 (b)  Convenience standards for each county or solid waste 80 
authority serving one or more counties. 81 
 (c)  County population statistics and data of residents. 82 
 (d)  Administrative costs and other authorized expenses 83 
necessary to prevent the disposal of covered electric dev ices in 84 
landfills. 85 
 (3)  COMPLIANCE TIMELINE. — 86 
 (a)  By January 1, 2025, each county must submit a plan to 87 
the department for ensuring the county will appropriately 88 
dispose of covered electronic devices at a permitted reclamation 89 
facility. 90 
 (b)  Effective January 1, 2026, any person who owns or 91 
operates an industrial, institutional, or commercial facility in 92 
this state shall dispose of that facility's covered electronic 93 
devices in a permitted reclamation facility. 94 
 (c)  Effective January 1, 2028, it is unla wful for any 95 
person to dispose of covered electronic devices in this state 96 
except at a permitted reclamation facility. 97 
 (4)  CIVIL PENALTY.—A person who engages in an unlawful act 98 
as provided in this section or who violates the rules of the 99 
department adopted pursuant to this section is liable for 100     
 
HB 691  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0691-00 
Page 5 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A	T I V E S 
 
 
 
damages and subject to civil penalties under s. 403.141. The 101 
penalty may be waived if the person has previously taken 102 
appropriate corrective action to remedy the actual damages, if 103 
any, caused by the unlawful act or rule violation. Section 104 
403.161 does not apply to this section. 105 
 (5)  PROGRAM FUNDS.—The department shall dep osit any funds 106 
received pursuant to this section into the Solid Waste 107 
Management Trust Fund and shall account for such funds 108 
separately within the fund. The funds may be used upon 109 
appropriation to provide grants to local governments and other 110 
public and private entities to develop and operate regional 111 
covered electronic device recycling programs and for 112 
administrative costs and other authorized expenses necessary to 113 
carry out the responsibilities of this section. 114 
 (6)  RULES.—By July 1, 2024, the department shall adopt 115 
rules to carry out this section. Such rules must include all of 116 
the following: 117 
 (a)  Criteria and procedures for obtaining a reclamation 118 
facility permit. 119 
 (b)  Standards for reclamation facilities and associated 120 
collection centers and standard s for the storage of covered 121 
electronic devices. 122 
 (c)  Requirements for the collection of data on the amounts 123 
of precious metals recovered through the program. 124 
 Section 2.  This act shall take effect July 1, 2023. 125