Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0935 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/28/2023

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0935a.CRG 
DATE: 3/28/2023 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: CS/HB 935    Chiefs of Police 
SPONSOR(S): Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee, Jacques and 
others 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 998 
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & 
Government Operations Subcommittee 
12 Y, 0 N, As CS Wagoner Miller 
2) Criminal Justice Subcommittee    
3) State Affairs Committee    
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
The chief of a municipal law enforcement agency has certain powers, duties and obligations, including the 
requirement to establish communications and assistance with other law enforcement agencies. The governing 
body of a municipality may hire or appoint, and terminate, a police chief directly or may delegate such authority 
to the mayor or the city manager. 
 
The bill defines a “Chief of Police” to mean a person, other than an elected official, who is appointed or 
employed full time by the state or any political subdivision who is the chief law enforcement officer of a law 
enforcement agency. 
 
The bill creates a new section of statute entitled the “Rights of Chiefs of Police.” The bill provides certain 
protections when the municipality seeks to terminate the chief’s employment or appointment. The bill provides 
that a person employed or appointed as a chief of police may not be terminated by the employing municipality 
without written notice. If a chief of police is employed by an elected governing body, the chief must be placed 
on the next regularly scheduled meeting and allowed to make a full response to the termination. 
 
The bill may have an indeterminate but negative impact on local governments that employ police chiefs. See 
Fiscal Comments. 
   STORAGE NAME: h0935a.CRG 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/28/2023 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Present Situation 
 
Municipalities are constitutionally granted all governmental, corporate, and proprietary powers 
necessary to conduct municipal government, perform municipal functions, and render municipal 
services. Additionally, municipalities are constitutionally authorized to exercise any power for municipal 
purposes except when expressly prohibited by general or special law.
1
 Municipalities may create, fund, 
operate, and determine the employment and personnel policies for police departments,
2
 including the 
hiring and termination of law enforcement officers and the chief of police. A law enforcement officer is 
any person who is elected, appointed, or employed full time by any municipality or the state and vested 
with authority to bear arms and to make arrests, and whose primary responsibility is the prevention and 
detection of crime, or enforcement of the laws of the state.
3
  
 
Every municipal law enforcement agency has certain powers, duties, and obligations. Police chiefs 
must schedule at least two law enforcement officers to be on duty at all times and either provide for 
their ability to communicate directly, communicate with the sheriff’s office, or provide a mutual aid 
agreement with other municipal police departments for on-duty officers to request assistance.
4
 Every 
municipal law enforcement agency is required to incorporate antidiscriminatory policies into the 
agency’s operational practices. The policies and practices utilize the Florida Police Chief’s Association 
model policy as a guide.
5
   
 
Some municipalities authorize a city manager to employ or appoint a chief of police but reserve final 
authority to dismiss the chief to the governing body.
6
 Other municipalities vest executive authority in the 
mayor, with full authority to appoint or remove the chief of police.
7
 
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
The bill defines a “Chief of Police” as a person, other than an elected official who is appointed or 
employed full time by the state or any political subdivision thereof as the chief law enforcement officer 
of a law enforcement agency. The definition excludes state law enforcement executives whose 
appointment or employment is governed by other provisions of law. The bill defines “employing agency” 
to have the same meaning as provided in s. 943.10(4), Florida Statutes. The bill creates s. 112.5321, 
F.S., entitled “Rights of Chiefs of Police.” The bill provides that a police chief may not be terminated by 
the employing agency without written notice. If a chief of police is employed by an elected governing 
body, the chief must be placed on the next regularly scheduled public meeting and be allowed to make 
a full and complete response to the termination. 
 
The protections provided to chiefs of police are not superseded by any written employment contract or 
agreement that provides employment, discipline, or termination standards, including any agreement of 
non-disclosure.  
  
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Section 1 renumbers and amends s. 112.531, F.S. relating to definitions.  
                                                
1
 Art. VIII, s. 2(b), Fla. Const. See s. 166.021, F.S. 
2
 See ss. 166.049, 166.0493, 166.0495, F.S. See, e.g., Municipal Charter of the City of Tampa, art. V, s. 5.01(d). 
3
 S. 943.10(1), F.S. 
4
 S. 166.049, F.S. 
5
 S. 166.0493, F.S. 
6
 City of Miami, Code of Ordinances, ch. 42, s. 42-2, at 
https://library.municode.com/fl/miami/codes/code_of_ordinances?nodeId=PTIITHCO_CH42PO_ARTIINGE_S42-
2APDIPODE (last visited March 23, 2023);  
7
 Municipal Charter for the City of Pensacola, art. I, s. 4.01(1)(a); Municipal Charter for the City of Tampa, art. VI, s. 6.03.  STORAGE NAME: h0935a.CRG 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/28/2023 
  
 
Section 2 creates s. 112.5321, F.S. relating to the rights of chiefs of police.  
 
Section 3 provides and effective date of July 1, 2023.  
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
The bill may have an indeterminate but negative impact on local governments that employ a chief of 
police. See Fiscal Comments.  
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
The requirement to terminate the employment of a chief of police only after providing written notice and 
then providing the chief with the opportunity to make a public presentation at the next regularly 
scheduled public hearing of the municipality governing body may create additional expenditures of 
public funds by municipalities. However, such expenditures are incurred only in the event a local 
government terminates the employment of a chief of police and may not be significant. 
 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
Not Applicable. This bill does not appear to require counties or municipalities to spend funds or take 
action requiring the expenditures of funds; reduce the authority that counties or municipalities have to 
raise revenues in the aggregate; or reduce the percentage of state tax shared with counties or 
municipalities. 
 
 2. Other: 
 None.  
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
The bill neither requires nor provides authority for executive branch rulemaking.  
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None.   STORAGE NAME: h0935a.CRG 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 3/28/2023 
  
 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
 
On March 28, 2023, the Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee 
adopted one amendment and reported the bill favorably as a committee substitute. The amendment 
clarified that a chief of police must receive written notice if the municipality terminates the chief’s 
employment. If a chief of police is employed by an elected governing body, the chief must be placed on 
the agenda of the next regularly scheduled meeting and be allowed to make a full response to the 
termination. The bill also provides that these protections are not superseded by written employment or 
non-disclosure agreements. 
 
This analysis is drawn to the bill as amended by the Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government 
Operations Subcommittee.