Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1319 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/20/2023

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h1319a.LFS 
DATE: 3/20/2023 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HM 1319    United States Military Meritocracy 
SPONSOR(S): Gregory and others 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SM 1382 
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special 
Districts Subcommittee 
11 Y, 4 N Mwakyanjala Darden 
2) State Affairs Committee    
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
Concerns have been raised about various policies affecting military readiness, including: 
 Mandatory vaccinations the Department of Defense (DoD) has required for certain infectious diseases, 
including COVID-19 and for anthrax. 
 Policies encouraging the use of person-centered and gender-neutral language when describing 
individuals, including a 2022 presentation given at the United States Air Force Academy. 
 The United States Army was 15,000 recruits short of its recruitment goal of 60,000 military recruits for 
the Fiscal Year 2022.  
 
The memorial urges the United States Congress to prohibit cited social practices and return to a merit-based 
system for military force development and composition. 
 
Legislative memorials are not subject to the Governor’s veto powers and are not presented to the Governor for 
review. Memorials have no force of law, as they are mechanisms for formally petitioning the federal 
government to act on a particular subject.  
 
This memorial does not have a fiscal impact on the state or local governments.   STORAGE NAME: h1319a.LFS 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/20/2023 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Present Situation 
 
Department of Defense (DoD) Vaccination Mandates 
 
COVID-19 
 
On August 24, 2021, the Secretary of Defense issued a mandate requiring mandatory COVID-19 
vaccinations for all members of the Armed Forces under DoD authority on active duty or in the Ready 
Reserve, including the National Guard.
1
 The mandate forced more than 8,400 troops out of the armed 
forces for refusing to comply with the order. Thousands more sought religious and medical 
exemptions.
2
 The mandate was rescinded on January 10, 2023.
3
 
 
Anthrax 
 
The DoD began compulsory anthrax vaccination in 1998 with the goal of inoculating 2.4 million troops. 
1.2 million Armed Forces members were vaccinated before the U.S. District Court for the District of 
Columbia ordered the DoD’s vaccination mandate to halt, citing the violation of the Food and Drug 
Administration’s own rules for failure to seek public comment before approving the vaccine. Before the 
halt of the vaccination mandate, more than 500 members of the Armed Forces were disciplined or 
court-martialed for refusing inoculation.
4
  
 
Use of Language 
 
In 2022, a presentation given at the United States Air Force Academy entitled, Diversity & Inclusion: 
What it is, why we care & what we can do, was forwarded to Rep. Mike Waltz of Florida by concerned 
cadets and their families.
5
 The presentation contained material advising cadets to use person-centered 
and gender-neutral language when describing individuals. Materials reportedly recommended against 
the use of the terms “mom” and “dad,” stating that some families do not reflect all families, and instead 
recommending the use of “parent” or “caregiver.” The presentation advocated that “cadets be color 
conscious” and stating that “We see Color/Patterns AND VALUE people for their uniqueness.” 
 
DoD Recruitment 
 
The United States Army was 15,000 short of its recruitment goal of 60,000 military recruits for the 
Fiscal Year 2022.
6
 Army officials stated the problem with recruitment does not stem from a lack of 
interest in service, but rather the difficulty for recruiters to find qualified candidates who can meet 
Armed Forces fitness standards or perform adequately on the military’s entrance exam. Anthony M. 
Kurta, the undersecretary of defense for personnel and readiness, stated that only about 2 percent of 
the 20.6 million 17- to 21-year-olds in the United States are eligible, of high academic quality, and have 
                                                
1
 Dept. of Defense, Memorandum for Mandatory Coronavirus Disease 2019 Vaccination of Department of Defense Service Members, 
available at https://media.defense.gov/2021/Aug/25/2002838826/-1/-1/0/MEMORANDUM-FOR-MANDATORY-CORONAVIRUS -
DISEASE-2019-VACCINATION-OF-DEPARTMENT-OF-DEFENSE-SERVICE-MEMBERS.PDF (last visited Mar. 16, 2023). 
2
 Associated Press, Politico, Pentagon drops Covid-10 vaccine mandate for troops, 
https://www.politico.com/news/2023/01/10/pentagon-drops-covid-19-vaccine-mandate-for-troops-00077364 (last visited Mar. 16, 2023). 
3
 Dept. of Defense, DOD Rescinds COVID-19 Vaccination Mandate, 
https://www.defense.gov/News/Releases/Release/Article/3264323/dod-rescinds-covid-19-vaccination-mandate/ (last visited Mar. 16, 
2023). 
4
 National Library of Medicine, U.S. judge halts compulsory anthrax vaccination for soldiers, 
https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC526141/ (last visited Mar. 16, 2023). 
5
 Forbes, Air Force Academy’s ‘Diversity & Inclusion’ Training Angers Conservatives, 
https://www.forbes.com/sites/erictegler/2022/11/09/as-the-air-forces-credibility-wanes-its-academy-devotes-time-to-diversity--inclusion-
training/?sh=707c94502849 (last visited Mar. 16, 2023). 
6
 Military.com, Army Sees Signs It Might Hit Recruiting Target This Year, https://www.military.com/daily-news/2023/01/20/army-sees-
signs-it-might-hit-recruiting-target-year.html (last visited Mar. 16, 2023).  STORAGE NAME: h1319a.LFS 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/20/2023 
  
a propensity to serve.
7
 As of January 20, 2023, Maj. Gen. Johnny Davis stated that the Army had 
recruited roughly 18,500 soldiers and another 13,000 recruits were in various stages of the recruiting 
process. If the Army continues at such a pace, it will meet its recruitment goal, 65,000 new soldiers, for 
Fiscal Year 2023.
8
 
 
Effect of the Memorial 
 
The memorial cites examples of social practices and mandates by the United States Armed Forces and 
states these practices and mandates are harmful for military preparedness, effectiveness, and 
operation. 
 
The memorial urges the United States Congress to prohibit the cited social practices and return to a 
merit-based system for military force development and composition. 
 
The memorial calls for copies of the memorial to be dispatched to the President of the United States, 
the President of the United States Senate, the Speaker of the United States House of Representatives, 
the United States Secretary of State, and each member of the Florida delegation to the United States 
Congress.  
 
Legislative memorials are not subject to the Governor’s veto powers and are not presented to the 
Governor for review. Memorials have no force of law, as they are mechanisms for formally petitioning 
the federal government to act on a particular subject. 
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Not applicable. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None. 
                                                
7
 Dept. of Defense, DOD Official Cites Widening Military-Civilian Gap, https://www.defense.gov/News/News-
Stories/Article/Article/1850344/dod-official-cites-widening-military-civilian-gap/ (last visited Mar. 16, 2023). 
8
 Military.com, Army Sees Signs It Might Hit Recruiting Target This Year, https://www.military.com/daily-news/2023/01/20/army-sees-
signs-it-might-hit-recruiting-target-year.html (last visited Mar. 16, 2023).  STORAGE NAME: h1319a.LFS 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 3/20/2023 
  
 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
Not applicable. This memorial does not appear to affect county or municipal governments. 
 
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
The memorial neither authorizes nor requires executive branch rulemaking. 
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None. 
 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
None.